Colella v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Sheila Colella
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 6:2021cv01327
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
2 Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Sheila Colella. (Silverman, Raymond)
October 8, 2021 Filing 87 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Originally filed in 6:21-md-3006-RBD-DAB) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2014 Tasigna Label, #2 Exhibit B - 2015 Tasigna Label, #3 Exhibit C - 2017 Tasigna Label, #4 Exhibit D - 2012 Canadian Tasigna Label)(ALL)
September 24, 2021 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie H. Muhlstock on behalf of Sheila Colella (Muhlstock, Melanie)
September 24, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison Macy Biggs on behalf of Sheila Colella (Biggs, Harrison)
September 14, 2021 Filing 84 Member Case BRIEF by Sheila Colella. (Silverman, Raymond) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (TNP).
September 14, 2021 Filing 83 BRIEF on Case Status in Colella by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Johnston, Robert) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (TNP).
September 14, 2021 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond C. Silverman on behalf of Sheila Colella (Silverman, Raymond)
September 14, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Carl Oxx on behalf of Sheila Colella (Oxx, Christopher)
September 14, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Gregory Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Joe)
September 13, 2021 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Johnston on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Johnston, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Reissaus on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Reissaus, Andrew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Grant)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Status Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. All motions pending as of the date of this Order are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Parties seeking relief should renew any motions by refiling them in the individual member cases or in the lead case as appropriate. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/31/2021. Associated Cases: 6:21-md-03006-RBD-DAB et al.(BIA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (BIA).
August 17, 2021 Filing 75 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A Baker per Order at Doc. 2 in case 6:21-md-3006-RBD-DAB. New case number: 6:21-cv-01327-RBD-DAB. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
August 16, 2021 Filing 74 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: 3006 Receipt of original record from the District of Connecticut, case number: 3:20-cv-00367-JAM. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:21-cv-01327-RBD-GJK. (ALL)
August 16, 2021 Filing 73 Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:20-cv-00367. File received electronically
August 10, 2021 Filing 72 MDL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to the Middle District of Florida. Signed by Clerk Karen K. Caldwell, MDL Panel on 8/10/2021.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 10, 2021 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 71 REPLY to Response to #66 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Johnston, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Oral argument on the motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. #66) is set for 10/19/2021 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer.For cases involving parties who are represented by counsel, Judge Meyer ordinarily expects that the parties themselves will be present for hearings on any dispositive motions (i.e., motions to dismiss and for summary judgment). If an individual party (or party representative in the case of a company/entity party) is not present, Judge Meyer will inquire of counsel why the party or party representative has chosen not to attend the hearing and may require the filing of a signed waiver of presence with a statement of reasons. If the argument is scheduled to proceed in full or in part by means of a video link, then the parties or party representatives are welcome to attend the argument by video. (Barry, Donna) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Filing 69 Memorandum in Opposition re #66 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Sheila Colella. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY (Doc. #64). The Court DENIES plaintiff's motion to stay without prejudice on the ground that it is speculative whether this action will be subject to MDL. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/01/21. (Barry, Donna) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 67 Memorandum in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Stay filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Johnston, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 66 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.Responses due by 7/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Johnston, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER. Defendant may file any objection or other response to the motion to stay (Doc. #64) by June 30, 2021. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on June 23, 2021.(Barry, Donna) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION to Stay by Sheila Colella.Responses due by 7/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #54 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher Oxx to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $400 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6428891) by Sheila Colella. (Oxx, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #55 MOTION for Attorney(s) Harrison M. Biggs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Sheila Colella. (Biggs, Harrison) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
April 27, 2021 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #59 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elyse A. Shimada to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6484718) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Attorney Elyse A. Shimada to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/26/2021. Signed by Clerk on 4/27/2021. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elyse A. Shimada to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6484718) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Elyse A. Shimada)(Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 2/24/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/2022; Joint Trial Memorandum due by 3/26/2022 Status Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 4:00 PM. (Gutierrez, Y.) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER and AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' joint motion for modification of the scheduling order (Doc. #57) is GRANTED. The Court's current scheduling order (Doc. #51) is hereby AMENDED as provided by this order. Fact discovery shall be completed by October 15, 2021. The parties shall designate all trial experts and provide opposing counsel with reports from retained experts pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on any issues on which they bear the burden of proof by January 12, 2022. Depositions of any such experts shall be completed by December 22, 2021. The parties shall designate all trial experts and provide opposing counsel with reports from retained experts pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on any issues on which they do not bear the burden of proof by January 26, 2022. All discovery shall be completed by February 24, 2022. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by March 25, 2022, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by April 26, 2022. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by March 26, 2022, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. The telephonic status conference is rescheduled to November 19, 2021 at 4:00 PM. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/22/2021. (DeBot, B.) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 57 Joint MOTION Modification of Sched. Order by Sheila Colella.Responses due by 4/9/2021 Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Virgulto, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/11/2021. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2021. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION for Attorney(s) Harrison M. Biggs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Sheila Colella. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Virgulto, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher Oxx to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $400 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6428891) by Sheila Colella. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Virgulto, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Attorney(s) Grant W. Hollingsworth to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6428367) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A - Declaration of Grant W. Hollingsworth)(Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 11, 2021 Docket Annotation re #55 MOTION for Attorney(s) Harrison M. Biggs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice #54 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher Oxx to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - duplicate fee accidentally paid for motion #54. Filer was directed to bypass payment screen for the second motion #54. (Bauer, J.) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. On November 5, 2020, Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer referred this matter to the undersigned for the discovery dispute raised in the parties' letter briefs filed on November 4, 2020 (Docs. #44, #45). See Docs. #46, #47. After receiving the parties' responsive briefing (Docs. #48, #49), the undersigned scheduled a telephonic discovery conference for today, November 17, 2020, at 11:00AM. See Doc. #50. The calendar for that call specifically directed counsel to "meet and confer by telephone, videoconference, or in person, in a good faith effort to resolve or narrow the discovery dispute raised in" their briefing. Id. (emphases removed). This morning, counsel for plaintiff, Raymond C. Silverman, and counsel for defendant, Mark Kean Ostrowski, jointly contacted chambers to report that the parties had reached an agreement on the discovery dispute raised in their briefing, and accordingly, today's telephonic discovery conference to address that dispute would not be necessary. In light of the joint report of counsel, the telephonic discovery conference scheduled for today, November 17, 2020, at 11:00AM is CANCELED. The Court thanks counsel for their efforts to amicably resolve the discovery dispute without further intervention of the Court.It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 11/17/2020. (Katz, S.) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court's current scheduling order (Doc. #24) is hereby AMENDED as provided by this order. The court adopts the interim discovery dates proposed by the plaintiff in the parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #23). Fact discovery shall be completed by April 1, 2021. The parties shall designate all trial experts and provide opposing counsel with reports from retained experts pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on any issues on which they bear the burden of proof by May 15, 2021. Depositions of any such experts shall be completed by June 26, 2021. The parties shall designate all trial experts and provide opposing counsel with reports from retained experts pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on any issues on which they do not bear the burden of proof by July 26, 2021. All discovery shall be completed by August 26, 2021. All other deadlines in the court's prior scheduling order (Doc. #24) remain in effect. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/16/2020. (DeBot, B.) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Discovery Conference set for Tuesday, November 17, 2020, at 11:00AM before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. This call will be held on the record. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (888)278-0296; Access Code: 2280867. During the telephonic discovery conference counsel should be prepared to address the dispute raised in the letter briefs filed on November 4, 2020, and November 6, 2020. See Docs. #44, #45, #48, #49. However, before that conference, counsel shall meet and confer by telephone, videoconference, or in person, in a good faith effort to resolve or narrow the discovery dispute raised in those documents. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 37. The Court will begin that conference by asking counsel to describe the efforts they have made to resolve or narrow the current dispute. (Katz, S.) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE re #45 Response, Reply Brief re Discovery Dispute filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reissaus, Andrew) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE re #44 Response filed by Sheila Colella. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for Discovery Dispute. The Court REFERS this discovery dispute to Judge Merriam. The parties should promptly contact Judge Merriam's chambers for any necessary scheduling. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/5/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER OF REFERRAL OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. On November 2, 2020, the parties contacted chambers concerning a discovery dispute. The Court entered a briefing schedule and stated that it would either schedule a telephonic conference or refer the dispute to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Based on the Court's review of the parties' initial submissions, the Court decides to REFER this discovery dispute to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Clerk of Court shall randomly assign a U.S. Magistrate Judge, and the parties should promptly contact the judge once assigned for any necessary scheduling. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/5/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 45 RESPONSE re 43 Order,,, Letter Brief re 30(b)(6) Depositions filed by Sheila Colella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service)(Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE re 43 Order,,, Letter Brief re 30(b)(6) Depositions filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corp. Org. Notice, #2 Exhibit 10/8/20 Notice, #3 Exhibit 9/29/20 Letter)(Reissaus, Andrew) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. In accordance with Judge Meyer's Instructions for Discovery Disputes, counsel for the parties have contacted Chambers regarding a discovery dispute. The parties shall each file letter briefs, no longer than five pages single-spaced in length, stating their respective positions with regard to the discovery dispute by 5:00 pm on Wednesday, November 4, 2020. Any response shall be filed by the opposing party by 5:00 pm Friday, November 6, 2020 and must be no longer than five pages single-spaced in length. Upon reviewing the parties' submissions, the Court will schedule a telephonic conference or refer the dispute to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/2/2020. (DeBot, B.) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER APPROVING #41 Joint Stipulation filed by Sheila Colella. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/31/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 41 Joint STIPULATION re #26 Proposed Order REGARDING ESI AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION PROTOCOL by Sheila Colella. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. In accordance with Judge Meyer's Instructions for Discovery Disputes, counsel for the parties have contacted Chambers regarding a discovery dispute. The parties shall each file letter briefs, no longer than eight pages single-spaced in length, stating their respective positions with regard to the discovery dispute by 12:00 pm on Friday, August 28, 2020. Any response shall be filed by the opposing party by 12:00 pm Tuesday, September 1, 2020 and must be no longer than eight pages single-spaced in length. Upon reviewing the parties' submissions, the Court will schedule a telephonic conference or refer the dispute to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/26/2020. (DeBot, B.) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until August 28, 2020 to submit a proposed ESI protocol, or in the alternative, briefing of any issues that cannot be agreed upon. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/21/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until August 28, 2020 to submit a proposed ESI protocol, or in the alternative, briefing of any issues that cannot be agreed upon. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Johnston on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp (Johnston, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Robertson McMinn on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp (McMinn, Donald) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Reissaus on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp (Reissaus, Andrew) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until August 21, 2020 to submit a proposed ESI protocol, or in the alternative, briefing of any issues that cannot be agreed upon.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/14/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until August 21, 2020 to submit a proposed ESI protocol, or in the alternative, briefing of any issues that cannot be agreed upon. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until August 14, 2020 to submit a proposed ESI protocol, or in the alternative, briefing of any issues that cannot be agreed upon.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/5/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until August 14, 2020 to submit a proposed ESI protocol, or in the alternative, briefing of any issues that cannot be agreed upon. by Sheila Colella. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time until 08/07/2020. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/13/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/07/2020 to submit a proposed ESI protocol, or in the alternative, briefing of any issues that cannot be agreed upon, which is currently set for July 10, 2020 by Sheila Colella. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/10/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Raymond C. Silverman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5870301) by Sheila Colella. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order And Confidentiality Order by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.Responses due by 7/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 28, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 8/26/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 9/26/2021; Joint Trial Memorandum due by 9/26/2021: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 4:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer (Gutierrez, Y.) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #23) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by August 26, 2021, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by September 26, 2021, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by October 26, 2021. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by September 26, 2021, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on May 14, 2021 at 4:00pm. Plaintiff shall initiate call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 773-2105. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/27/2020. (Mahler-Haug, A) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew L. Reissaus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5870270) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Donald R. McMinn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5870244) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert E. Johnston to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5870240) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher R. Drury terminated. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/22/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificates of Good Standing due by 7/21/2020. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/22/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Christopher R. Drury to Withdraw as Attorney by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Raymond C. Silverman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5870301) by Sheila Colella. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Virgulto, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew L. Reissaus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5870270) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Andrew L. Reissaus)(Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Donald R. McMinn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5870244) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Donald R. McMinn)(Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert E. Johnston to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5870240) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert E. Johnston)(Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Dlugoszewski on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp (Dlugoszewski, Sarah) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Kean Ostrowski on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp (Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/25/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.(Drury, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Finance Corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Holding, AC, Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Drury, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Drury on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp (Drury, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheila Colella. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp served on 3/20/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. (Virgulto, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas A. Virgulto* *Hill & Hill, LLC* *2E Samson Rock Drive, Meigswood* *Madison, CT 06443*. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Sheila Colella, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/17/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/17/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/17/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/16/2020; Discovery due by 9/16/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/17/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp (Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5754733.), filed by Sheila Colella. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anastasio, F.) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 17, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 17, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Virgulto, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]
March 17, 2020 ENTERED IN ERROR - Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Sheila Colella. (Virgulto, Thomas) Modified to enter in error per attorney on 3/18/2020 (Anastasio, F.). [Transferred from ctd on 8/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colella v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Colella
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Represented By: Thomas A. Virgulto
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Andrew L. Reissaus
Represented By: Christopher R. Drury
Represented By: Donald R. McMinn
Represented By: Mark Kean Ostrowski
Represented By: Robert E. Johnston
Represented By: Sarah E. Dlugoszewski
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Represented By: Grant Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?