Henderson et al v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Reese and Katherin Flury
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC, University City Development Partners Ltd., Vervicia Henderson, Craig Henderson, Deborah Y Reese, Marie Outing, Richard Eidemiller, Christine Eidemiller, Patricia Ramsey, Brenda Jackson, Jr. Clifford Reynolds, Emilio San Martin, Eric Rutledge, Wendy Stone, Kevin Kiely, Kristen Sheen, Brendan Havens, Jeff Kozak, Tom Stone, Brian Slusarz, Kristi Hujik, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Eric Saperstein, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Andrew Ebert, Brenda White, Donald Goertz, Jennifer Johnson, Drew Johnson, Benjamin Johnson, Patricia Anderson, Arthur Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Meredith Brunelle, Justin Brunelle, Donna DeMilt, Victor Goldschmidt, Elaine Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Michael L Iacovino, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Morgan Innes, Kelly Kemp, Naoyuki Komatsu, Naho Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Michael McGarry, Ann McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Renee Ross, William Siegrist, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Andrew Innes and Brian Kemp
Case Number: 6:2021cv01363
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 380 NOTICE of supplemental authority by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 379 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on October 11, 2023, before Judge Daniel C. Irick. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Nikki Peters, RMR, CRR, CRC. Email address: courttranscripts@outlook.com. Telephone number: 407-917-0813. NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely available to the public without redaction after ninety (90) calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 11/29/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2024. (NLP)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER denying #365 Motion to Compel Production of Documents Concerning Hexavalent Chromium, and for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/16/2023. (LDJ)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick: MOTION HEARING held on 10/11/2023 re #365 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Concderning Hexavalent Chromium, and for Sanctions filed by Arthur Anderson, Jennifer Johnson, Ana Saperstein, Naoyuki Komatsu, Victor Goldschmidt, Adam Brackett, Jeff Kozak, Laura Juda, Eric Saperstein, Katherin Flury, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Eric Rutledge, Jeffrey Muddell, John Tosti, Emilio San Martin, Mark Juda, Theodora Turk, Morgan Innes, Elaine Goldschmidt, Tom Stone, Andrew Innes, Brenda Jackson, Jordan Schursky, Brian Slusarz, Aubrey Carp, Jack Turk, Kelly Kemp, Patricia Ramsey, Helen Tosti, Logan Goodson, Renee Ross, Naho Komatsu, Kristen Sheen, Patricia Anderson, Donna DeMilt, Wendy Stone, Andrew Ebert, Stephanie Muddell, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Amanda Siegrist, Ari Saperstein, Vervicia Henderson, Deborah Reese, David A. Berry, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Richard Eidemiller, Brenda White, Ryo Komatsu, Brian Kemp, Justin Brunelle, Elizabeth Brackett, Michael L Iacovino, Ann McGarry, Cristina Turk, Meredith Brunelle, Donald Goertz, William Siegrist, Brendan Havens, Michael McGarry, Kristi Hujik, Kevin Kiely, Austin Siegrist. (Digital) (TNP)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Joint NOTICE re 371 Notice of hearing on motion of Ongoing Conferral by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Albanis, Panagiotis) Modified on 10/10/2023 to edit docket text (AJS).
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 374 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re #370 Order on Motion in Limine Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 373 DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL Global Causation Brief re #370 Order filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Modified text on 10/3/2023 (BD).
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 372 NOTICE of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's #373 Supplemental Global Causation Brief by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Smith, et al. 2009, #2 Exhibit Kumar 2021, #3 Exhibit Rossman 2003, #4 Exhibit Tsai, et al. 1999, #5 Exhibit Marciniak 2020, #6 Exhibit Liu, et al. 2015, #7 Exhibit Baris, et al. 2016, #8 Exhibit Saint-Jacques, et al. 2014, #9 Exhibit Chiou, et al. 2001, #10 Exhibit Aballaya, et al. 2012, #11 Exhibit Smith 1998, #12 Exhibit Roh, et al. 2017, #13 Exhibit Mostafa 2013, #14 Exhibit Hopenhayn-Rich 1998, #15 Exhibit Leonardi, et al. 2012, #16 Exhibit Wang 2014, #17 Exhibit Liaw 2008, #18 Exhibit Chen, et al. 2010, #19 Exhibit Shridhar, et al., #20 Exhibit Gansan, et al. 2020, #21 Exhibit Costa 1997, #22 Exhibit Batyrova 2021, #23 Exhibit Coyle 2005, #24 Exhibit Linos 2011, #25 Exhibit Tseng 2019, #26 Exhibit Deng 2019, #27 Exhibit Sedman, et al. 2006, #28 Exhibit Beaumont 2008, #29 Exhibit Luo, et al. 2011, #30 Exhibit Kogevinas 1994, #31 Exhibit Kogevinas, et al. 1993, #32 Exhibit Kolstad 1994, #33 Exhibit Christensen 2017, #34 Exhibit Lemenetal-1990, #35 Exhibit Nissenetal-2018, #36 Exhibit Bertkeetal-2018, #37 Exhibit Matanoski, et al. 1997, #38 Exhibit Loomis 2019, #39 Exhibit Huff 2011, #40 Exhibit Christensen 2018, #41 Exhibit Blanc-lapierre, et al. 2018, #42 Exhibit Niehoff, et al. 2019, #43 Exhibit Henschler 1995, #44 Exhibit Andrew, et al. 2022, #45 Exhibit Kim, et al. 2014, #46 Exhibit Alanee 2015, #47 Exhibit Sungetal-2007, #48 Exhibit Pedersenetral-2020, #49 Exhibit Laouali, et al. 2018, #50 Exhibit Odutola, et al. 2021, #51 Exhibit Coccoetal-2013, #52 Exhibit Purdue 2011, #53 Exhibit Anttila 1995, #54 Exhibit Hadkhale 2016, #55 Exhibit Blair, et al. 1979, #56 Exhibit Goldetal-2011, #57 Exhibit Carton, et al. 2017, #58 Exhibit Kayishunge, et al. 2022, #59 Exhibit Clough, et al. 2020, #60 Exhibit Cohnetal 1994, #61 Exhibit Aschengrau 2003, #62 Exhibit Aschengrauetal-1998, #63 Exhibit Calvert, et al. 2011, #64 Exhibit Talibov 2017, #65 Exhibit Ma, et al. 2009, #66 Exhibit Gallagher 2011, #67 Exhibit Vlaanderen 2013, #68 Exhibit Barul, et al. 2017)(Weinstein, David) Modified text on 10/3/2023 (BD).
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 371 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #365 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Concerning Hexavalent Chromium, and for Sanctions. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. The parties shall file a joint notice three days before the hearing certifying ongoing conferral and stating which issues, if any, have been resolved. (TNP)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 370 It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the parties' general causation motions (Docs. #139, #140, #141, #142, #144, #146, #148, #151, #152) are TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively terminate these motions. The Court will rule on them together with the specific causation motions. Plaintiffs' motion to exclude certain opinions of Lockheed's experts on specific causation that they believe to contain belated general causation testimony is DENIED. (Doc. #258.) By Monday, October 2, 2023, Plaintiffs and Lockheed may each file a supplemental brief of no more than seven pages addressing any issues they wish the Court to consider in connection with the Court's joint resolution of general and specific causation, with the caveat set forth above. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/15/2023. (ALL)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 369 RESPONSE in Opposition re #365 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Concerning Hexavalent Chromium, and for Sanctions filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Hopper, Ryan) Modified on 9/18/2023 as to docket text (ARL).
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ENDORSED ORDER granting #367 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Lockheed Martin must respond to the #365 Motion to Compel by 9/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/5/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #365 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Concerning Hexavalent Chromium, and for Sanctions by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 9/5/2023 (CTR).
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 366 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #365 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS CONCERNING HEXAVALENT CHROMIUM, AND FOR SANCTIONS by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 01 - June 12, 2007 Email [LM 00577707], #2 Exhibit Ex. 02 - Charter For Chrome Reduction Team [LM 00577708], #3 Exhibit Ex. 03 - Jan 1, 2008 Email [LM_00741726], #4 Exhibit Ex. 04 - Jan 3, 2008 Memo [LM 00741727], #5 Exhibit Ex. 05 - Apr 22, 2008 Email [LM_00579035], #6 Exhibit Ex. 06 - Hex Chrom Elimination PPT, #7 Exhibit Ex. 07 - May 7, 2009 Email [LM_00581460], #8 Exhibit Ex. 08 - 2011 Draft CR6 corporate wide [LM_00436550], #9 Exhibit Ex. 09 - Plaintiffs' 1st Set of RFP to LM (Grayson), #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - LM Responses to 1st Set of RFP (Grayson), #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Apr 23, 2021 Letter, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - June 10, 2021 Email, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13 - Jul 23-25, 2021 Emails, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14 - Jul 23-Aug 25, 2021 Emails, #15 Exhibit Ex. 15 - List of Search Terms, #16 Exhibit Ex. 16 - Sep 14, 2021 Email [134-8], #17 Exhibit Ex. 17 - Plfs Short Form MTC, #18 Exhibit Ex. 18 - Nov 10, 2021 Hearing Transcript, #19 Exhibit Ex. 19 - Nov 10, 2021 Order, #20 Exhibit Ex. 20 - Dec 2021 Emails, #21 Exhibit Ex. 21 - Jan 13, 2022 Hearing Transcript, #22 Exhibit Ex. 22 - Plfs' MTC More Than 1 Million Wrongfully Withheld Docs, #23 Exhibit Ex. 23 - Plfs' Reply to MTC 1 Million Wrongfully Withheld Docs, #24 Exhibit Ex. 24 - Order Denying MTC More than 1 Million Docs, #25 Exhibit Ex. 25 - Sahu Specific Causation Report, #26 Exhibit Ex. 26 - Panigrahy Specific Causation Report, #27 Exhibit Ex. 27 - Plfs' MTC Add'l Hex Chrome Docs, #28 Exhibit Ex. 28 - LMC's Opp to Ps' MTC Add'l Hex Chrome Docs, #29 Exhibit Ex. 29 - Jul 26, 2023 Status Conference Transcript)(Morgan, Timothy)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS CONCERNING HEXAVALENT CHROMIUM, AND FOR SANCTIONS by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 364 THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 4/12/2024, All other motions due by 4/1/2024, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for term commencing 5/6/2024 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/22/2023. (ALL)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ENDORSED ORDER granting #361 Motion. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/18/2023. (LLM)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ENDORSED ORDER granting #359 Motion to Amend. An amended CMSO will follow by separate notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/18/2023. (LLM)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Time-Sensitive Treatment of Joint Motion to Extended Bellwether Group 1 Deadlines and Stay Bellwether Groups 2 and 3 by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 8/18/2023 (JK).
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 360 TRANSCRIPT of status conference held on 7/26/23 before Judge Daniel C. Irick. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Sabo. Email address: Rebecca_Sabo@flmd.uscourts.gov. Telephone number: 14068556410. NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely available to the public without redaction after ninety (90) calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 9/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2023. (RMS)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Joint MOTION to Modify #245 Case Management Scheduling Order to Extend Bellwether Group 1 Deadlines and Stay Bellwether Groups 2 and 3 by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/26/2023. (Digital) (TNP)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 356 REPLY to Response to Motion re #318 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Specific-Causation and Other Issues filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 355 NOTICE of Appearance by Josh Autry on behalf of Vervicia Henderson (Autry, Josh)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ENDORSED ORDER granting #353 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Josh Autry is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/24/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Amended MOTION for Josh Autry to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Morgan, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ENDORSED ORDER denying #351 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission to Practice on Behalf of Josh Autry. See Local Rule 2.01(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/21/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MOTION for Josh Autry to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21066272 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morgan, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 7/24/2023 (KME).
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 350 RESPONSE in Opposition re #305 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony of Rene Salazar, Ph.D Pursuant To Fed. R. Evid. 702 filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Torres, Christopher)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 349 RESPONSE in Opposition re #304 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony of Kristine Davies Pursuant To Fed. R. Evid. 702 filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Torres, Christopher)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 348 RESPONSE in Opposition re #301 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony of Michael Ballenger Pursuant To Fed. R. Evid. 702 filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Torres, Christopher)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 347 RESPONSE in Opposition re #307 MOTION To Exclude Expert Report and Testimony of Stephen Emsbo-Mattingly Pursuant To Fed. R. Evid. 702 and Incorporated Legal Memorandum filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Torres, Christopher)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 346 RESPONSE in Opposition re #314 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony of Shahrokh Rouhani, Ph.D., P.E. Pursuant To Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Torres, Christopher)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 345 RESPONSE in Opposition re #287 MOTION To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony of Dr. Fred Lublin And Incorporated Legal Memorandum, #296 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. John Graham Pursuant to FRE 702, #289 MOTION To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony of Dr. Nelson J. Chao And Incorporated Legal Memorandum, #292 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Eun-Sil Shelley Hwang Pursuant To Fed. R. Evid. 702, #294 MOTION To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony of Dr. Philippe Spiess and Incorporated Legal Memorandum filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Hopper, Ryan)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 344 RESPONSE in Opposition re #283 Motion To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Mundt filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Hopper, Ryan)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 343 RESPONSE in Opposition re #299 MOTION To Exclude Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Robert James Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 and Incorporated Legal Memorandum filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Hopper, Ryan)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 342 RESPONSE in Opposition re #311 MOTION to Exclude the Proffered Specific-Causation Opinions of Dr. Judy Schmidt filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 341 RESPONSE to Motion re #317 MOTION to Exclude the Proffered Specific-Causation Opinions of Dr. Charles Cowan filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 340 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #339 Response to motion by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--Donna DeMilt Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2--Brian Kemp Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3--Naoyuki Komatsu Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit 4--Naho Komatsu Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit 5--Michael McGarry Deposition Transcript, #6 Exhibit 6--Eric Rutledge Deposition Transcript, #7 Exhibit 7--Ana Saperstein Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit 8--Eric Saperstein Deposition Transcript, #9 Exhibit 9--Kirsten Sheen Deposition Transcript, #10 Exhibit 10--Wendy Stone Deposition Transcript)(Morgan, Timothy)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 339 RESPONSE to Motion re #318 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Specific-Causation and Other Issues filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 338 RESPONSE in Opposition re #312 MOTION to Exclude the Proffered Specific-Causation Opinions of Dr. David Warburton filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 337 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #336 Response in Opposition to Motion by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Turner 30b6 dep 2-8-23)(Morgan, Timothy)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 336 RESPONSE in Opposition re #316 MOTION to Exclude the Proffered Specific-Causation Opinions of Dr. Ranajit Sahu filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 335 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #334 Memorandum in opposition by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - Panigrahy GC Expert Report, #2 Exhibit 02 - Panigrahy GC Rebuttal Report, #3 Exhibit 03 - James 8.8.22 Transcript)(Morgan, Timothy)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #310 Motion In Limine filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 333 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #332 Memorandum in opposition by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - Expert Report of Daniel Kantor)(Morgan, Timothy)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #309 Motion In Limine filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #345 Response in Opposition of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Omnibus Response to Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude Testimony of Drs. Lublin, Chao, Hwang, Spiess, and Graham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. Philippe Spiess, #2 Exhibit Transcript of the Deposition of Dr. Philippe Spiess, #3 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. Nelson Chao, #4 Exhibit Transcript of the Deposition of Dr. Nelson Chao, #5 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. E. Shelley Hwang, #6 Exhibit Transcript of the Deposition of Dr. Hwang, #7 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. Fred D. Lublin, #8 Exhibit Transcript of the Deposition of Dr. Lublin, #9 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. John Graham, #10 Exhibit Transcript of the Deposition of Dr. Graham)(Hopper, Ryan)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ENDORSED ORDER granting #327 Motion for Leave to File Omnibus Response to Five Daubert Motions. Defendant Lockheed may file one combined response of no more than 40 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/10/2023. (TBS)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 329 RESPONSE in Opposition re #327 MOTION for Leave To File Omnibus Response to Five Daubert Motions Titled "Time sensitive" filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Albanis, Panagiotis)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file an expedited response to #327 Motion To File Omnibus Response to Five Daubert Motions. Plaintiffs shall file a response to the motion providing a factual and legal basis for their opposition on or before 9:30 a.m. on 7/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/7/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MOTION for Leave To File Omnibus Response to Five Daubert Motions Titled "Time sensitive"> by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Hopper, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified to edit motion text on 7/7/2023 (HAI).
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #262 Plaintiffs' Short Form Motion to Compel Additional Hexavalent Chromium Documents; granting in part and denying in part #271 Defendant Lockheed Martin's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses Regarding Model Prepared by Dr. James Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/28/2023. (JEB)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick: MOTION HEARING held on 6/28/2023 re #262 MOTION to Compel Additional Hexavalent Chromium Documents filed by All Plaintiffs, #316 MOTION to Exclude the Proffered Specific-Causation Opinions of Dr. Ranajit Sahu filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Court Reporter: Amie First. (LDJ)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE of Ongoing Conferral by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #271 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Regarding Model Prepared by Dr. James Clark of Ongoing Conferral (White, Christopher) Modified on 6/28/2023 to add text. (LD).
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Joint NOTICE of Ongoing Conferral by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/27/2023 to edit text (ABC).
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 322 OBJECTION re #319 REQUEST for oral argument . (Morgan, Timothy)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ENDORSED ORDER granting #320 Request for Oral Argument. The Court will hear argument on the #271 Motion to Compel at the June 28, 2023 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/26/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Request for Oral Argument by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Request for Oral Argument by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Torres, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Specific-Causation and Other Issues by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MOTION to Exclude the Proffered Specific-Causation Opinions of Dr. Charles Cowan by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Torres, Christopher) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MOTION to Exclude the Proffered Specific-Causation Opinions of Dr. Ranajit Sahu by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Torres, Christopher) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 315 CERTIFICATE of counsel in Support re #314 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Shahrokh Rouhani, Ph.D., P.E. Pursuant To Federal Rule of Evidence 702 by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rouhani Dep. 2023, #2 Exhibit Rouhani Report 2023, #3 Exhibit Sahu Rebuttal, #4 Exhibit Emsbo-Mattingly Rebuttal, #5 Exhibit Emsbo Mattingly Dep. 2023, #6 Exhibit Emsbo Mattingly Dep. 2022, #7 Exhibit Rouhani Initial Rpt., #8 Exhibit Rouhani Dep. Vol. I, #9 Exhibit Cowan Report, #10 Exhibit Cowan Rebuttal Report, #11 Exhibit Rouhani Dep. Vol. II, #12 Exhibit Wells Rebuttal Rpt, #13 Exhibit Kendall Dep. Vol II)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Shahrokh Rouhani, Ph.D., P.E. Pursuant To Federal Rule of Evidence 702 by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 313 CERTIFICATE of counsel in Support re #304 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Kristine Davies Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of Kristine Davies, #2 Exhibit Expert Report of Ranajit Sahu 2-13-23, #3 Exhibit 30b6 Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit Email from Attorney White, #5 Exhibit Expert Rebuttal Report of Ranajit Sahu 5-1-23)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MOTION to Exclude the Proffered Specific-Causation Opinions of Dr. David Warburton by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MOTION to Exclude the Proffered Specific-Causation Opinions of Dr. Judy Schmidt by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MOTION to Exclude the Proffered Specific-Causation Opinions of Dr. Dipak Panigrahy by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MOTION to Exclude the Proffered Specific-Causation Opinions of Dr. Daniel Kantor by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 308 CERTIFICATE of counsel in Support re #307 MOTION To Exclude Expert Report and Testimony Of Stephen Emsbo-Mattingly Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 and Incorporated Legal Memorandum by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Rpt. of SEM dated 4-14-23, #2 Exhibit Reference Guide on Exposure Science, #3 Exhibit Tr. of SEM dated 5-19-23, #4 Exhibit Tr. of SEM dated 9-21-22, #5 Exhibit USGS 2003 Study, #6 Exhibit PAHS, #7 Exhibit EPA Region 4 Operating Procedures, #8 Exhibit Egan Excerpt, #9 Exhibit Screenshot, #10 Exhibit NIH Pilot Studies Common Uses and Misuses)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MOTION To Exclude Expert Report and Testimony Of Stephen Emsbo-Mattingly Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 and Incorporated Legal Memorandum by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 306 CERTIFICATE of counsel in Support re #305 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Rene Salazar, Ph.D Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Salazar Report, #2 Exhibit Salazar Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit Sahu Rebuttal Report)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Rene Salazar, Ph.D Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Kristine Davies Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 303 CERTIFICATE of counsel in Support re #301 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Michael Ballenger Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ballenger Expert Report, #2 Exhibit Sahu Expert Rebuttal Report 5-1-23, #3 Exhibit 30b6 Deposition Transcript)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Glossary of Scientific and Technical Terms and Acronyms in Support of Motions to Exclude Proffered Specific Causation Opinions and Summary Judgment Motions (Torres, Christopher)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Michael Ballenger Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 300 CERTIFICATE of counsel in Support re #299 MOTION To Exclude Expert Report and Testimony Of Dr. Robert James Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 and Incorporated Legal Memorandum by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit James 8.8.22 Depo Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2023.04.14 - Dr. James Specific Causation Report, #3 Exhibit James 5.25.23 Depo Transcript, #4 Exhibit Rebuttal Report of Dr. Ron Sahu, #5 Exhibit Intro to Env. Forensics (Ex. 3 to James), #6 Exhibit Hartwell TEAM study, 1987 (James Ex. 7), #7 Exhibit Wallace et al. (1986), #8 Exhibit Clayton (James Ex 8), #9 Exhibit Spreadsheet (James Ex. 5), #10 Exhibit Rebuttal Report of Dr. Dipak Panigrahy)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MOTION To Exclude Expert Report and Testimony Of Dr. Robert James Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 and Incorporated Legal Memorandum by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 298 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation First Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude The Proffered Testimony of Dr. Charles Cowan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Dr. Charles Cowan (Aug. 24, 2022), #2 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 1: Report of Dr. Cowan (June 1, 2022), #3 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 2: Rebuttal Report of Dr. Cowan (Aug. 1, 2022), #4 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Composite Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Cowan Deposition Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit Tyler VanderWeele & Maya Mathur, Some Desirable Properties of the Bonferroni Correction, #24 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Dr. Martin Wells (Sept. 16, 2022))(Torres, Christopher)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 297 CERTIFICATE of counsel in Support re #296 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Eun-Sil Shelley Hwang Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of John Graham)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. John Graham Purusant to FRE 702 by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 295 CERTIFICATE of counsel in Support re #294 MOTION To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony Of Dr. Philippe Spiess and Incorporated Legal Memorandum by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spiess Report, #2 Exhibit Spiess Transcript)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MOTION To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony Of Dr. Philippe Spiess and Incorporated Legal Memorandum by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 293 CERTIFICATE of counsel in Support re #292 MOTION To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony Of Dr. Eun-Sil Shelley Hwang Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Hwang Expert Report, #2 Exhibit Dr. Hwang Deposition Transcript)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Eun-Sil Shelley Hwang Pursuant TO FED. R. EVID. 702 by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 291 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Second Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude The Proffered Testimony of Dr. Ranajit Sahu (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Dr. Ranajit Sahu (May 29, 2023), #2 Exhibit Dr. Ranajit Sahu's Curriculum Vitae, #3 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Dr. Andrew Gray (May 8, 2023), #4 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Kenneth Bryan Baker (March 29, 2023), #5 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Donna DeMilt (May 24, 2023))(Torres, Christopher)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 290 CERTIFICATE of counsel in Support re #289 MOTION To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony Of Dr. Nelson J. Chao And Incorporated Legal Memorandum by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chao Specific Causation Report, #2 Exhibit Chao Transcript)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MOTION To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony Of Dr. Nelson J. Chao And Incorporated Legal Memorandum by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 288 CERTIFICATE of counsel in Support re #287 MOTION To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony Of Dr. Fred Lublin And Incorporated Legal Memorandum by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Rpt., #2 Exhibit Lublin Depo Tr.)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MOTION To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony Of Dr. Fred Lublin And Incorporated Legal Memorandum by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motions to Exclude Plaintiffs' Proffered Experts and Motions for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Allen Turner (June 20, 2023), #2 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 1: 1986 RCRA Facility Assessment Report, #3 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 2: 1997 Purchase Agreement between Lockheed Martin Corporation and Universal City Property Management Company II, #4 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 3: 1997 Due Diligence Evaluation by Golder Associates, #5 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 4: 1997 Due Diligence Evaluation by Rust, #6 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 5: 1981-82 Letters from Geraghty & Miller, Inc., #7 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 6: 1985 FDEP Consent Order for Sites 3 & 6, #8 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 7: 1985 FDEP Consent Order for Landfill Site 4, #9 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 8: 1985 FDEP Consent Order for Site 5, #10 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 9: 1985 FDEP Consent Order for MEC Building, #11 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 10: 1999 RCRA Corrective Action - Documentation of Environmental Indicator Determination, #12 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 11: 1983 RCRA Temporary Operating Permit, #13 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 12: 1985 EPA and FDEP RCRA Permit, #14 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 13: 1999 EPA RCRA Permit, #15 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 14: 2003 HSWA RCRA Permit Renewal, #16 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 15: 2009 HSWA RCRA Permit Renewal, #17 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 16: 2013 HSWA RCRA Permit Renewal, #18 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 17: 1986 RCRA Facility Assessment Report, #19 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 18: 2021 HSW Annual Effectiveness Report on Corrective Measures, #20 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 19: 1998 AOR, #21 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 20: 2000 AOR, #22 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 21: 2003 AOR, #23 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 22: 2004 AOR, #24 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 23: 2005 AOR, #25 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 24: 2006 AOR, #26 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 25: 2007 AOR, #27 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 26: 2008 AOR, #28 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 27: 2009 AOR, #29 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 28: 2010 AOR, #30 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 29: 2011 AOR, #31 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 30: 2012 AOR, #32 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 31: 2014 AOR, #33 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 32: 2015 AOR, #34 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 33: 2016 AOR, #35 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 34: 2017 AOR, #36 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 35: 2018 AOR, #37 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 36: 2019 AOR, #38 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 37: 2020 AOR, #39 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 38: 1996 FDEP FESOP Permit, #40 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 39: 1996 Notice to Permit Files re FESOP, #41 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 40: 1996 Letter Withdrawing Title V Application, #42 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 41: 2023 Air Operation Final Permit, #43 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 42: 1997 Ambient Air Impact Analysis by Golder Associates, #44 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 43: 1997 Draft Ambient Air Impact Analysis by Golder Associates, #45 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 44: 1998 Ambient Air Impact Analysis by Golder Associates, #46 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 45:1998 Letter to FDEP re Universal Sale and FARC Limits, #47 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 46: 2001 Generic Emissions Unit Exemption for SVEs, #48 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 47: 2020 FDEP Approval of Remediation System Modifications, #49 Exhibit Turner Dec. Ex. 48: 2020 Briefing Sheet for Meeting with Mayor, #50 Exhibit Declaration of Derek Huston, P.E., #51 Exhibit Court Hearing Transcript (Oct. 26, 2021))(Torres, Christopher)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 285 RESPONSE to Motion re #271 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Regarding Model Prepared by Dr. James Clark filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morgan, Timothy)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 284 CERTIFICATE of counsel in Support re #283 MOTION To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony Of Dr. Kenneth Mundt by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mundt Henderson Report - 2023.04.14, #2 Exhibit Mundt Rule 26(a)(2)(B) Report - 2022.07.01, #3 Exhibit Mundt Dep Transcript, #4 Exhibit Boice Study (1999), #5 Exhibit Lipworth Study (2011), #6 Exhibit Rhomberg Study (2011), #7 Exhibit Bogen Study (2016), #8 Exhibit Arsenic Science Task Force 2013 Tax Filing, #9 Exhibit Bevan Study (2017), #10 Exhibit Paul Harrison ICMJE COI Form)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION To Exclude The Case-Specific Expert Report And Testimony Of Dr. Kenneth Mundt by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 6/20/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Second Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Warburton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Warburton Deposition Transcript (May 20, 2023), #2 Exhibit Dr. Graham Specific Causation Report, #3 Exhibit Dr. Sahu Deposition Transcript Excerpt (May 29, 2023))(Weinstein, David)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Second Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Schmidt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Schmidt Deposition Transcript (May 18, 2023), #2 Exhibit Dr. James Specific Causation Report (Davis, Henderson, Vandestreek), #3 Exhibit Dr. Cowan General Causation Report (Davis, Henderson, Vandestreek), #4 Exhibit Gleicher 2013, #5 Exhibit Wendy Stone Deposition Transcript Excerpt, #6 Exhibit Naoyuki Komatsu Deposition Transcript Excerpt)(Weinstein, David)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 280 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Second Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Panigrahy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Panigrahy Deposition Transcript (May 30, 2023), #2 Exhibit Dr. James Specific Causation Report)(Weinstein, David)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Second Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Kantor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Kantor Deposition Transcript (May 18, 2023), #2 Exhibit Dr. Lublin Specific Causation Expert Report, #3 Exhibit Dr. Sahu Deposition Transcript Excerpt (May 29, 2023))(Weinstein, David)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation First Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Kantor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 1 - Notice of Deposition, #2 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 2 - Specific Causation Report (Henderson), #3 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 3 - Curriculum Vitae, #4 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 4 - Testimony History, #5 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 5 - Rate Sheet, #6 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 6 - Materials Considered, #7 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 7 - Specific Causation Report (Davis), #8 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 8 - Rebuttal Report (Davis and Henderson), #9 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 9 - General Causation Deposition Transcript Vol. I, #10 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 10 - General Causation Deposition Transcript Vol. II, #11 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 11 - Dr. Sahu Specific Causation Report (Henderson), #12 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 12 - Dr. Sahu Table 20, #13 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 13 - Dr. Sahu Specific Causation Report (Davis), #14 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 14 - Dr. James Specific Causation Report (Henderson, Davis, and Vandestreek), #15 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 15 - Table 1 (Dr. James's Reproduction of Table 20), #16 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 16 - Dr. Sahu's Avg. Modeled Concentrations vs. EPA's Reference Concentrations, #17 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 17 - Nourbakhsh 2019, #18 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 18 - Goldman 2023, #19 Exhibit Kantor Deposition Exhibit 19 - Dr. Cowan General Causation Expert Report (Grayson, Henderson, Davis, and Vandestreek))(Hopper, Ryan)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation First Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Warburton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 1 - Amended Notice of Deposition, #2 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 2 - Specific Causation Report, #3 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 3 - Curriculum Vitae, #4 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 4 - Rate Sheet, #5 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 5 - Materials Considered, #6 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 6 - Rebuttal Report, #7 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 7 - Dr. Sahu Specific Causation Report (Henderson), #8 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 8 - Dr. Sahu's Table 20, #9 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 9 - Dr. James Specific Causation Report (Davis, Henderson, and Vandestreek), #10 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 10 - Table 1 (Dr. James's Reproduction of Table 20), #11 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 11 - Dr. Sahu's Avg. Modeled Concentrations v. EPA's Reference Concentrations, #12 Exhibit Intentionally Omitted, #13 Exhibit Intentionally Omitted, #14 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 14 - Plagiarism, #15 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 15 - Mayo Clinic: DiGeorge Syndrome, #16 Exhibit Warburton Deposition Exhibit 16 - MedScape: Ectodermal Dysplasia)(Hopper, Ryan)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation First Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Schmidt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schmidt Deposition Exhibit 1 - Notice of Deposition, #2 Exhibit Schmidt Deposition Exhibit 2 - Specific Causation Report (Henderson), #3 Exhibit Schmidt Deposition Exhibit 3 - Curriculum Vitae, #4 Exhibit Schmidt Deposition Exhibit 4 - Testimony History, #5 Exhibit Schmidt Deposition Exhibit 5 - Rate Sheet, #6 Exhibit Schmidt Deposition Exhibit 6 - Materials Considered, #7 Exhibit Schmidt Deposition Exhibit 7 - Rebuttal Report, #8 Exhibit Schmidt Deposition Exhibit 8 - Dr. Sahu Specific Causation Report (Henderson), #9 Exhibit Schmidt Deposition Exhibit 9 - Dr. Sahu's Table 20, #10 Exhibit Schmidt Deposition Exhibit 10 - WHO Global Health Risks, #11 Exhibit Schmidt Deposition Exhibit 11 - Dr. James Specific Causation Report (Davis, Henderson, and Vandestreek), #12 Exhibit Schmidt Deposition Exhibit 12 - WHO IARC List of Classifications by Cancer Sites with Sufficient or Limited Evidence in Humans)(Hopper, Ryan)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation First Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Panigrahy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 1 - Notice of Deposition, #2 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 2 - Specific Causation Report (Henderson), #3 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 3 - Curriculum Vitae, #4 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 4 - Testimony History, #5 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 5 - Rate Sheet, #6 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 6 - Materials Considered, #7 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 7 - Supplemental Rebuttal Report, #8 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 8 - Dr. Sahu Specific Causation Report (Henderson), #9 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 9 - Dr. Sahu's Table 20, #10 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 10 - WHO IARC List of Classifications by Cancer Sites with Sufficient or Limited Evidence in Humans, #11 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 11 - Axelson 1978, #12 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 12 - Summary of Study-Specific Reported Exposure Concentrations (Axelson 1978), #13 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 13 - Boice 1999, #14 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 14 - Lipworth 2011, #15 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 15 - Marano 2000, #16 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 16 - Summary of Study-Specific Reported Exposure Concentrations (Marano 2000), #17 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 17 - Callahan 2019, #18 Exhibit Intentionally Omitted, #19 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 19 - Summary of Study-Specific Reported Exposure Concentrations (Callahan 2019), #20 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 20 - Raaschou-Nielsen 2003, #21 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 21 - Summary of Study-Specific Reported Exposure Concentrations (Raaschou-Nielsen 2003), #22 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 22 - Bertke 2018, #23 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 23 - Summary of Study-Specific Reported Exposure Concentrations (Bertke 2018), #24 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 24 - Christensen 2018, #25 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 25 - Christensen 2017, #26 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 26 - Kolstad 1995, #27 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 27 - Kolstad 1994, #28 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 28 - Kolstad 1993, #29 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 29 - Summary of Study-Specific Reported Exposure Concentrations (Christensen 2018), #30 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 30 - Loomis 2018, #31 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 31 - Kogevinas 1994, #32 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 32 - Summary of Study-Specific Reported Exposure Concentrations (Loomis 2018), #33 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 33 - Collins 2013, #34 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 34 - Summary of Study-Specific Reported Exposure Concentrations (Collins 2013), #35 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 35 - Graff 2005, #36 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 36 - Summary of Study-Specific Reported Exposure Concentrations (Graff 2005), #37 Exhibit Panigrahy Deposition Exhibit 37 - Aschengrau 2003)(Hopper, Ryan)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 274 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation First Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude The Proffered Testimony of Dr. Andrew Gray (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gray Deposition Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Gray Deposition Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Gray Deposition Exhibit 3)(Torres, Christopher)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation First Notice of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude The Proffered Testimony of Dr. Ranajit Sahu (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Sahu Deposition Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Ranajit Sahu Expert Report (Grayson June 1, 2022), #22 Exhibit AirToxScreen Limitations)(Torres, Christopher)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Filing Expert Reports in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motions to Exclude Plaintiffs' Proffered Experts and Motion for Summary Judgment on Specific Causation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michael Ballenger's Expert Report (April 14, 2023), #2 Exhibit Technical Support Document EPA's Air Toxics Screening, #3 Exhibit Revisions to the Guideline on Air Quality Models, #4 Exhibit Kristine Davies Expert Report (April 14, 2023), #5 Exhibit Stephen Emsbo-Mattingly Expert Report (April 14, 2023), #6 Exhibit Report Attachment 1 - Stephen Emsbo-Emsbo-Mattingly CV, #7 Exhibit Report Attachment 2 - Stephen Emsbo-Mattingly Testimony, #8 Exhibit Report Attachment 3 - Reliance Documents, #9 Exhibit Report Attachment 4 - Sample Location Information, #10 Exhibit Report Attachment 5 (Part 1) - Chemistry Database, #11 Exhibit Report Attachment 5 (Part 2) - Chemistry Database, #12 Exhibit Report Attachment 6 - FSP QAPP, #13 Exhibit Report Attachment 7a - Alpha L2214936, #14 Exhibit Report Attachment 7b - Alpha L2215281, #15 Exhibit Report Attachment 7c - Alpha L2217634, #16 Exhibit Report Attachment 7d - Alpha L2217948, #17 Exhibit Report Attachment 7e - Alpha L2219126, #18 Exhibit Report Attachment 7f - Alpha L2219252, #19 Exhibit Report Attachment 7g - Alpha L2219991, #20 Exhibit Report Attachment 7h - Alpha L2220525, #21 Exhibit Report Attachment 7i - Alpha L2221614, #22 Exhibit Report Attachment 7j - Alpha L2221866, #23 Exhibit Report Attachment 7k - Alpha L2221973, #24 Exhibit Report Attachment 7l - Alpha L2223047, #25 Exhibit Report Attachment 7m - Alpha L2223367, #26 Exhibit Report Attachment 7n - Alpha L2224270, #27 Exhibit Report Attachment 7o - Alpha L2225444, #28 Exhibit Report Attachment 7p - Alpha L2226546, #29 Exhibit Report Attachment 7q - Alpha L2227622, #30 Exhibit Report Attachment 7r - Alpha L2229649, #31 Exhibit Report Attachment 8 - Soil HAP Gradients v FDEP SCTLs, #32 Exhibit Report Attachment 9 - PAH SHC Fingerprints, #33 Exhibit Report Attachment 10 - PCA Soil VOC MET PAH, #34 Exhibit Report Attachment 11 - Air COC Gradients, #35 Exhibit Report Attachment 12 - AA PIANO Histograms, #36 Exhibit Report Attachment 13 - PCA Air, #37 Exhibit Report Attachment 14 - Alternative Sources, #38 Exhibit Report Attachment 15 - McAuley VC Surrogates, #39 Exhibit Shahrokh Rouhani Expert Report (April 14, 2023), #40 Exhibit Rene Salazar Expert Report (April 14, 2023))(Torres, Christopher)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Regarding Model Prepared by Dr. James Clark by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Plaintiffs' Response to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B) Plaintiffs' Response to Request for Production, #3 Exhibit C) Nov. 11, 2022 - Hearing before Judge Irick Transcript, #4 Exhibit D) Dec. 7, 2022 - Hearing before Judge Dalton Transcript)(Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ENDORSED ORDER granting #269 Joint Time-Sensitive Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions. The deadlines that previously fell on 6/19/2023 are extended to 6/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/12/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions (Time Sensitive) by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 268 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #262 MOTION to Compel Additional Hexavalent Chromium Documents. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2023 at 01:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. The parties shall file a joint notice three days before the hearing certifying ongoing conferral and stating which issues, if any, have been resolved.(TBS)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 267 RESPONSE to Motion re #262 MOTION to Compel Additional Hexavalent Chromium Documents filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 266 RESPONSE in Opposition re #258 MOTION to Exclude Untimely General Causation Opinions filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Hopper, Ryan)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE of Filing Materials in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2023.04.14 - Mundt Expert Report (Henderson), #2 Exhibit 2 - 2023.04.14 - Robert James Expert Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2023.04.14 - Shahrokh Rouhani Expert Report (compressed), #4 Exhibit 4 - Expert Report of Dr. Dipak Panigrahy (Henderson), #5 Exhibit 5 - Expert Report of Dr. Judy Schmidt (Henderson), #6 Exhibit 6 - Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Kantor (Henderson), #7 Exhibit 7 - Expert Report of Dr. David Warburton (Henderson), #8 Exhibit 8 - Expert Report of Dr. Ranajit Sahu Report (Henderson), #9 Exhibit 9 - Callahan 2019, #10 Exhibit 10 - Callahan 2019 - Supplemental Tables, #11 Exhibit 11 - Collinsetal-2013, #12 Exhibit 12 - loomisetal-2019)(Hopper, Ryan) Modified on 5/15/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #257 Motion to Sever filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #252 Motion for Leave to Serve Additional Discovery such that Defendant is granted leave to serve discovery regarding Model. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 5/11/2023. (JEB)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MOTION to Compel Additional Hexavalent Chromium Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rocha, Rene) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 5/10/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Dustin Moore on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Moore, Joshua)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 260 CERTIFICATE of counsel In Support of #258 MOTION to Exclude Untimely General Causation Opinions by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 5/1/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 259 REQUEST for oral argument re #258 Motion to Exclude Untimely General Causation Opinions by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 5/1/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MOTION to Exclude Untimely General Causation Opinions by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 5/1/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION for Severance for Trial by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Modified on 4/28/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by Eitan Ebrahimi on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Ebrahimi, Eitan)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ENDORSED ORDER granting #254 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Irina Khasin is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 4/24/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Unopposed MOTION for Irina Khasin to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20751784 for $150 by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Third NOTICE of Supplemental Persuasive Authority by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Modified on 4/20/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to Serve Additional Discovery by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 251 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on January 24, 2023, before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Court Reporter: Amie R. First, RDR, CRR, CRC, CPE. Email address: AmieFirst.CourtReporter@gmail.com. Telephone number: 407-494-3882. NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely available to the public without redaction after ninety (90) calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/21/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2023. (ARF)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ENDORSED ORDER granting #249 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Shawn Kenneth Jarecki is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 3/23/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Unopposed MOTION for Shawn Kenneth Jarecki to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20639775 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Morgan, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Nichole Winn on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Winn, Jennifer)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by David Barnett Weinstein on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation. Lead Counsel: David B. Weinstein. (Weinstein, David)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE of Filing Amended General Causation Studies and Other Publications by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IARC Monograph - Arsenic, #2 Exhibit IARC Monograph - Styrene, #3 Exhibit NRC 2009, #4 Exhibit Nermann 2009, #5 Exhibit Parks 2014, #6 Exhibit Purdue 2017, #7 Exhibit Sun 2022, #8 Exhibit Talbott 2015, #9 Exhibit Pendersen 2020, #10 Exhibit Wang 2014)(Hopper, Ryan) Modified on 3/15/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 245 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/2/2023, Dispositive motions due by 6/19/2023, Pretrial statement due by 12/14/2023, All other motions due by 11/30/2023, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 4/14/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for term commencing 1/2/2024 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/14/2023. (ALL)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. Lead Counsel: T. Michael Morgan. (Morgan, Timothy)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE TO Plaintiffs' and Lockheed Martin Corporation COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #224 Motion to Compel Rule 26(a) Disclosures. On or before April 3, 2023, Plaintiffs shall disclose to Defendant each witness Plaintiffs may use to support their damages claims for Bellwether Group 1. On or before April 3, 2023, Plaintiffs shall disclose to Defendant individualized computations of Plaintiffs' claimed damages for Bellwether Group 1 and any supporting documents. The Motion (Doc. 224) is DENIED in all other respects, including as to Defendant's request for attorney fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 3/13/2023. (TNP)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick: MOTION HEARING held on 3/13/2023 re #224 MOTION to Compel Mandatory Rule 26(a) Damages Disclosures filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Digital) (TNP)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 239 RESPONSE to Motion re #224 MOTION to Compel Mandatory Rule 26(a) Damages Disclosures filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Amended Sixth NOTICE of Filing General Causation Studies and Other Publications by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ban 2003, #2 Exhibit Bastlova 1995, #3 Exhibit Bull 1990, #4 Exhibit Cederberg 2010, #5 Exhibit Chakrabo 1993, #6 Exhibit Chanda 2006, #7 Exhibit Deangelo 2008, #8 Exhibit Gambelu 2006, #9 Exhibit Guyton 2014, #10 Exhibit Hu 2008, #11 Exhibit Hu 2022, #12 Exhibit Jantunen 1986, #13 Exhibit Keen 2020, #14 Exhibit Khanjani 2017, #15 Exhibit Khattak 1999, #16 Exhibit Kogevinas 1994, #17 Exhibit Kolstad 1993)(Hopper, Ryan) Modified on 3/10/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Amended Fifth NOTICE of Filing General Causation Studies and Other Publications by Lockheed Martin Corporation o (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pedersen 2020, #2 Exhibit Peng 2019, #3 Exhibit Tsai 1999, #4 Exhibit Tseng 1968, #5 Exhibit Tsuchiya 1988, #6 Exhibit Summary on Tetrachloroethylene, #7 Exhibit Review of Trichloroethylene, #8 Exhibit Van Rooji 2005, #9 Exhibit Viera 2005, #10 Exhibit Vlaanderen 2013, #11 Exhibit Von Ehrenstein, #12 Exhibit Wang 2014, #13 Exhibit Wartenberg 2000, #14 Exhibit Werder 2018, #15 Exhibit Werder 2019, #16 Exhibit White 2009, #17 Exhibit Wigle 2005, #18 Exhibit Windham 2006, #19 Exhibit Wu 1989, #20 Exhibit Yauck 2004)(Hopper, Ryan) Modified on 3/10/2023 to edit docket text and notified Attorney Hooper that some pages are sideways (SRD).
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Amended Fourth NOTICE of Filing General Causation Studies and Other Publications by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marciniak 2021, #2 Exhibit McCanlies 2012, #3 Exhibit McCanlies 2019, #4 Exhibit McMartin 1998, #5 Exhibit NRC 2009, #6 Exhibit NTP Rep on Carcinogens - Arsenic, #7 Exhibit NTP Rep. on Carcinogens - Trichloroethylene, #8 Exhibit Neumann et al. 2009, #9 Exhibit Niehoff 2019, #10 Exhibit Nielsen 2021, #11 Exhibit Oddon 2013, #12 Exhibit Palin 2015, #13 Exhibit Pals 2003, #14 Exhibit Parks 2014, #15 Exhibit Paulu 1999, #16 Exhibit Pesch 2000, #17 Exhibit Pezzoli 2013, #18 Exhibit Pottenger 2011, #19 Exhibit Purdue 2011, #20 Exhibit Purdue 2017, #21 Exhibit Raaschou-Nielsen 2003, #22 Exhibit Riise 2002, #23 Exhibit Rivara 1997, #24 Exhibit Ruckart 2015, #25 Exhibit Ruder 1994, #26 Exhibit Scott 2006, #27 Exhibit Scott 2011, #28 Exhibit Schreiber 2002, #29 Exhibit Selden 2011, #30 Exhibit Smargiassi 1998, #31 Exhibit Smith 1998, #32 Exhibit Storm 2011, #33 Exhibit Sun 2022, #34 Exhibit Talbott 2015, #35 Exhibit Tikkanen 1989, #36 Exhibit Tikkanen 1991)(Hopper, Ryan) Modified on 3/10/2023 to edit docket text and notified Attorney Hooper that some pages are sideways (SRD).
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Sixth Notice of Filing General Causation Studies and Other Publications (Hopper, Ryan)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Fifth Notice of Filing General Causation Studies and Other Publications (Hopper, Ryan)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Fourth Notice of Filing General Causation Studies and Other Publications (Hopper, Ryan)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Third Notice of Filing General Causation Studies and Other Publications (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Keen 2020, #2 Exhibit Khanjani 2017, #3 Exhibit Khattak 1999, #4 Exhibit Kogevinas 1994, #5 Exhibit Kolstad 1993, #6 Exhibit Kolstad 1994, #7 Exhibit Kolstad 1995, #8 Exhibit Kumar 2021, #9 Exhibit Lan 2010, #10 Exhibit Landtblom 1996, #11 Exhibit Lanphear 2017, #12 Exhibit Lash 2001, #13 Exhibit Laumon 1996, #14 Exhibit Lehmann 2002, #15 Exhibit Liaw 2008, #16 Exhibit Linos 2011, #17 Exhibit Lipworth 2011, #18 Exhibit Liu 2018, #19 Exhibit Liu-Mares 2013, #20 Exhibit Logman 2005, #21 Exhibit Loomis 2018, #22 Exhibit Lorente 2000, #23 Exhibit Lutz 2001, #24 Exhibit Lynge 1997, #25 Exhibit Lynge 2006, #26 Exhibit Mandel 1995)(Hopper, Ryan)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Second Notice of Filing General Causation Studies and Other Publications (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gilboa (2011), #2 Exhibit Goldman (2012), #3 Exhibit Gomez-Tomas (2019), #4 Exhibit Gong (2017), #5 Exhibit Guha (2012), #6 Exhibit Hansen (2001), #7 Exhibit Hansen (2013), #8 Exhibit Hornung (2014), #9 Exhibit Hopenhayn-Rich (1998), #10 Exhibit Hao (1995), #11 Exhibit Hedstrom (2018), #12 Exhibit Henschler (1995), #13 Exhibit Hjortebjerg (2012), #14 Exhibit Hooiveld (2006), #15 Exhibit Hopenhayn-Rich (1996), #16 Exhibit Hseuh (1995), #17 Exhibit Hseuh (1997), #18 Exhibit Huff (2011), #19 Exhibit IARC Hex. Chrome, #20 Exhibit IARC TCE PCE, #21 Exhibit IARC Styrene, #22 Exhibit Jaafarzadeh (2022), #23 Exhibit Kalkbrenner (2018), #24 Exhibit Karami (2012), #25 Exhibit Karami (2013))(Hopper, Ryan)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #221 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, Notice of Filing General Causation Study and Publication Summary Tables (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Hopper, Ryan)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation First Notice of Filing General Causation Studies and Other Publications (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alanee 2015, #2 Exhibit Alexander 2007, #3 Exhibit Ali 2014, #4 Exhibit Altmann 1995, #5 Exhibit Amaral 2012, #6 Exhibit Anttila 1995, #7 Exhibit Aschengrau 1993, #8 Exhibit Aschengrau 1998, #9 Exhibit Aschengrau 2003, #10 Exhibit Aschengrau 2009, #11 Exhibit Aschengrau et al. (2020), #12 Exhibit ATSDR Exerpt, #13 Exhibit ATSDR 2018, #14 Exhibit ATSDR 2002, #15 Exhibit ATSDR 2006, #16 Exhibit Axelson 1978, #17 Exhibit Barragan0Martinez 2012, #18 Exhibit Batyrova 2021, #19 Exhibit Bergamaschi 2016, #20 Exhibit Benignus et al. 2009, #21 Exhibit Boice 1999, #22 Exhibit Bond 1990, #23 Exhibit Bostrom 2019, #24 Exhibit Bove 1995, #25 Exhibit Brender 2008, #26 Exhibit Brender 2014, #27 Exhibit Bruning 2003, #28 Exhibit Buhagen 2016, #29 Exhibit Burg 1999, #30 Exhibit Callahan 2019, #31 Exhibit Cantor 1995, #32 Exhibit Charbotel 2006, #33 Exhibit Chen 1986, #34 Exhibit Chen 1988, #35 Exhibit Chen 1990, #36 Exhibit Chevrier 2006, #37 Exhibit Christensen 2017, #38 Exhibit Christensen 2018, #39 Exhibit Cocco 2010, #40 Exhibit Cordier 2012, #41 Exhibit Coyle 2005, #42 Exhibit Deng 2019, #43 Exhibit DesRosiers 2012, #44 Exhibit Diodovich, #45 Exhibit Fevotte 2006, #46 Exhibit Flodin 1986, #47 Exhibit Forand 2012, #48 Exhibit Gallagher 2011, #49 Exhibit Garcia-esquinas 2013, #50 Exhibit Gerhardsson 2021)(Hopper, Ryan)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 228 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on December 7, 2022, before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Court Reporter: Amie R. First, RDR, CRR, CRC, CPE. Email address: AmieFirst.CourtReporter@gmail.com. Telephone number: 407-494-3882. NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely available to the public without redaction after ninety (90) calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 3/28/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2023. (ARF)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #224 MOTION to Compel Mandatory Rule 26(a) Damages Disclosures. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2023 at 02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. The parties shall file a joint notice three days before the hearing certifying ongoing conferral and stating which issues, if any, have been resolved. (TNP)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 226 It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Lockheed's Motion to Modify Case Management Scheduling Order (Doc. #218) is GRANTED. An amended Case Management and Scheduling Order will follow separately. Lockheed's accompanying motion to expedite the instant ruling (Doc. #223) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/7/2023. (ALL)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE of supplemental authority by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MOTION to Compel Mandatory Rule 26(a) Damages Disclosures by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial Rule 26(a) Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B - Supp. Rule 26(a) Disclosures)(Hopper, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on #218 MOTION to Modify #202 Case Management Scheduling Order by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 3/7/2023 (LDJ).
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 222 RESPONSE to Motion re #218 MOTION to Modify #202 Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dr. Sahu's Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - 30b6 Dep Exhibit, #3 Exhibit 3 - 30b6 Dep Transcript, #4 Exhibit 4 - Expert Report of Dr. Dipak Panigrahy, #5 Exhibit 5 - Expert Report of Dr. Judy Schmidt, #6 Exhibit 6 - Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Kantor (Henderson), #7 Exhibit 7 - Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Kantor (Davis), #8 Exhibit 8 - Expert Report of Dr. David Warburton)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified text on 3/7/2023 (LDJ).
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 221 It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Lockheed's Summaries Motion (Doc. #212) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED in that, by Thursday, March 9, 2023, Lockheed may file copies of the publications and the proposed table. The Motion is DENIED as to the request to file a brief accompanying these filings and in all other respects. Lockheed's Plagiarism Motion (Doc. #213) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/26/2023. (ALL)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER re #219 Stipulation of Dismissal. Plaintiff Richard Eidemiller's individual claims and action against Defendants Lockheed Martin Corporation and Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Plaintiff Richard Eidemiller as a party to this action. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/26/2023. (ALL)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 219 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Richard Eidemiller. (Rocha, Rene)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION to Modify #202 Case Management Scheduling Order, by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weinstein, David)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER to STRIKE #215 Notice of voluntary dismissal filed by Richard Eidemiller. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/22/2023. (ALL)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 216 RESPONSE to Motion re #213 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Evidence and Analysis of Dr. Panigrahy's Plagiarism in Other Litigation filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal with prejudice by Richard Eidemiller. (Rocha, Rene) Modified text and filers on 2/17/2023 (ALL).
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 214 RESPONSE to Motion re #212 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :reply to evidence summaries filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Evidence and Analysis of Dr. Panigrahy's Plagiarism in Other Litigation by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Hopper, Ryan)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :reply to evidence summaries by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's Evidence Summary and Evidence Summary Table by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Evidence Summary PowerPoint Presentation, #2 Exhibit Evidence Summary Table)(Rocha, Rene) Modified text on 2/6/2023 (LDJ).
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #209 Motion Hearing, Notice of Filing January 24, 2023 Hearing Presentation and Video Deposition Excerpts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Presentation)(Weinstein, David)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.: MOTION HEARING held on 1/24/2023 re #139 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Panigrahy filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation, #140 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Kantor filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation, #141 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Mattison filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation, #142 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to General Causation, #144 MOTION In Limine to Exclude Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Robert James filed by Vervicia Henderson, #146 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Mundt filed by Vervicia Henderson, #148 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Shahrokh Rouhani, Ph.D., P.E. filed by Vervicia Henderson, #151 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert, Dr. Ronald J. Kendall filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation, #152 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Establish General Causation filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Court Reporter: Amie First (GNB)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Amended NOTICE OF HEARING: NON-EVIDENTIARY HEARING set for 1/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. (Time and date unchanged.) To clarify, the Court will take argument on the pending summary judgment and Daubert motions re: #139, #140, #141, #142, #144, #146, #148, #151, #152.(ALL)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ENDORSED ORDER granting #205 Motion to Allow Electronic Equipment; granting #206 Motion to Allow Electronic Equipment. Permitted devices shall not be used to record, video, or photograph any court proceedings taking place within the building. At any time, the United States Marshals Service and/or the Court Security Officers assigned to this facility may revoke the permission granted in this Order. No cell phones will be allowed in the courtroom. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/17/2023. (ALL)
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Unopposed MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment, specifically Hearing Laptops, Hearing Tablets, Portable Monitor, Portable Speaker, Adapters, Peripherals, Cabling, Cellphone by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Hopper, Ryan)
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Unopposed MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment, specifically Hearing laptops, iPad/Tablets, Adapters, Mouse and Laptop Peripherals, Cabling by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 204 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #139 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Panigrahy, #141 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Mattison, #140 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Kantor Second Notice of Supplemental Persuasive Authority by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #139 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Panigrahy, #141 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Mattison, #140 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Kantor First Notice of Supplemental Persuasive Authority by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 202 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Bellwether Group 1: Discovery due by 5/3/2023, Dispositive motions due by 5/19/2023, Pretrial statement due by 10/12/2023, All other motions due by 9/28/2023, Plaintiff (air modeler and dependent) disclosure of expert report due by 2/15/2023, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/15/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for term commencing 11/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. See Order for further deadlines related to Bellwether Group 2 and 3. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/11/2023. (ALL)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE of hearing: NON-EVIDENTIARY HEARING re: Joint Status Report set for 1/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. (ALL)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Joint Status Report re #199 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, (Weinstein, David) Modified on 12/20/2022 to edit docket text (SRD).
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER UNREFERRING and granting in part (189) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 6:21-cv-1363-RBD-DCI; granting in part (137) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 6:21-cv-1570-RBD-DCI; granting in part (100) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 6:22-cv-00081-RBD-DCI. Plaintiffs' motion seeking to dispense with conferrals and appoint a special master (Henderson, Doc. #185; Davis, Doc. 96) is UNREFERRED and DENIED. By Monday, December 19, 2022, the parties are DIRECTED to file a joint status report identifying their respective positions on the issues listed in this Order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/15/2022. (ALL)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Set deadline: Status Report due by 12/19/2022. (LDJ)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble. (SLT)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 11/22/2022 before Judge Daniel C. Irick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Suzanne L. Trimble, trimblecourtreporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 1/3/2023 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2023 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2023. (SLT)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Minute Entry for In Person Proceedings held before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.: MOTION HEARING held on 12/7/2022. Court Reporter: Amie First. (ALL)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ENDORSED ORDER granting #194 Motion to Allow Electronic Equipment. Plaintiff's counsel is permitted to bring the listed items into the Courthouse. No cell phones or cameras will be permitted in the courtroom. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/7/2022. (ALL)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment, specifically Hearing Laptops, Adapters, Mouse and Laptop Peripherals, Cabling by All Plaintiffs. (Rocha, Rene)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ENDORSED ORDER granting #190 Motion to Allow Electronic Equipment. Lonny Mead is permitted to bring the listed items into the Courthouse. No cell phones or cameras will be permitted in the courtroom. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/6/2022. (ALL)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 RESPONSE in Opposition re #185 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion to Dispense with Conferrals and Request to Appoint a Special Master for Discovery filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment, specifically Hearing Laptops, Portable Monitors, Adapters, Mouse and Laptop Peripherals, Cabling, and 1 Cellphone by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Hopper, Ryan)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Morgan, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #176 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part #180 Motion to Extend the December 1, 2022 Expert Disclosure Deadline. The Rule 30(b)(6) deposition is rescheduled to December 12, 2022. Plaintiffs' obligation to comply with their December 1, 2022 expert report disclosure deadline is temporarily and partially STAYED pending further order of the Court as set forth in this Order. See Order PDF for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 11/23/2022. (TNP)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick: MOTION HEARING held on 11/22/2022 re #180 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery AS TO THE DECEMBER 1, 2022 EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE filed by all plaintiffs, #176 MOTION for Protective Order Against Unilaterally Noticed Rule 30(b)(6) and Fact Witness Deposition filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Digital) (TNP)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion to Dispense with Conferrals and Request to Appoint a Special Master for Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 RESPONSE in Opposition re #180 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery AS TO THE DECEMBER 1, 2022 EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Weinstein, David)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Porter on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Porter, Brian)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend (Weinstein, David)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #180 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery AS TO THE DECEMBER 1, 2022 EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE, #176 MOTION for Protective Order Against Unilaterally Noticed Rule 30(b)(6) and Fact Witness Deposition. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2022 at 11:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. The parties shall file a joint notice three days before the hearing certifying ongoing conferral and stating which issues, if any, have been resolved. (TNP)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery AS TO THE DECEMBER 1, 2022 EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Ron Sahu)(Morgan, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 RESPONSE to Motion re #176 MOTION for Protective Order Against Unilaterally Noticed Rule 30(b)(6) and Fact Witness Deposition filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Morgan, Timothy)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 REPLY to Response to Motion re #152 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Establish General Causation filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 REPLY to Response to Motion re #142 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to General Causation and Supporting Legal Memorandum filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Morgan, Timothy)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION for Protective Order Against Unilaterally Noticed Rule 30(b)(6) and Fact Witness Deposition by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Torres, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of hearing on motions. MOTION HEARING set for 12/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. The parties should be prepared to discuss all pending motions across all cases, scheduling, and the status of Perrotti v. Lockheed Martin Corporation (6:22-cv-1338-RBD-DAB).(ALL)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #173 Response in Opposition to Motion by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Vervicia Henderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Morgan, Timothy)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re #139 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Panigrahy filed by Vervicia Henderson. (Morgan, Timothy)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #171 Response in Opposition to Motion by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Vervicia Henderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Morgan, Timothy)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 RESPONSE in Opposition re #141 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Mattison filed by Vervicia Henderson. (Morgan, Timothy)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #169 Response in Opposition to Motion by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Vervicia Henderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Morgan, Timothy)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 RESPONSE in Opposition re #151 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert, Dr. Ronald J. Kendall filed by Vervicia Henderson. (Morgan, Timothy)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #167 Response in Opposition to Motion by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Vervicia Henderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Morgan, Timothy)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 RESPONSE in Opposition re #140 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Kantor filed by Vervicia Henderson. (Morgan, Timothy)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #165 Response in Opposition to Motion by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Vervicia Henderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morgan, Timothy)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 RESPONSE in Opposition re #152 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Establish General Causation filed by Vervicia Henderson. (Morgan, Timothy)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 RESPONSE in Opposition re #142 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to General Causation and Supporting Legal Memorandum filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RESPONSE in Opposition re #148 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Shahrokh Rouhani, Ph.D., P.E. filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Torres, Christopher)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed's Response on Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Shahrokh Rouhani (Attachments: #1 Hearing Transcript Oct. 26, 2021, #2 Hearing Transcript Spet. 20, 2022, #3 Report of Shahrokh Rouhani, #4 Email, #5 Rouhani Dep Exhibit 14, #6 Report of Stephen Mattingly, #7 Mattingly Depo Transcript, #8 Paper, #9 Expert Report of Ballenger, #10 Report of Charles Cowan, #11 Deposition Transcript of Cowan, #12 Cowan Dep Exhibit 6, #13 Cowan Depo Exhibit 9, #14 Cowan Dep Exhibit 10, #15 Cowan Dep Exhibit 11, #16 Cowan Dep Exhibit 12, #17 Paper, #18 Wells Depo Transcript)(Torres, Christopher) Modified text on 11/2/2022 (LDJ).
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of Materials filed in Support by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #65 Order Reassigning Case to Another Judge w/in Division, (Attachments: #1 Dr James Expert Report, #2 Appendix A - Principles of Toxicology, #3 Appendix B - Dose Reconstruction, #4 Appendix C - Regulatory RAs, #5 Appendix D - Alternative Exposures and Risks, #6 Appendix E - Medical Monitoring Issues, #7 Appendix F - Causation Methods, #8 CV of Robert James PhD, #9 Dr James Transcript)(Weinstein, David) Modified text on 11/2/2022 (LDJ).
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION In Limine to Exclude Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Robert James filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Materials filed in Support by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #144 MOTION In Limine to Exclude Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Robert James (Attachments: #1 Dr James Expert Report, #2 Appendix A - Principles of Toxicology, #3 Appendix B - Dose Reconstruction, #4 Appendix C - Regulatory RAs, #5 Appendix D - Alternative Exposures and Risks, #6 Appendix E - Medical Monitoring Issues, #7 Appendix F - Causation Methods, #8 CV of Robert James PhD, #9 Dr James Transcript)(Weinstein, David) Modified text on 11/2/2022 (LDJ).
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation Glossary of Scientific and Technical Terms (Torres, Christopher)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 RESPONSE in Opposition re #146 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Mundt filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE of Materials filed in Support by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #146 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Mundt (Attachments: #1 Mundt Expert Report, #2 Dr. Mundt's depo transcript, #3 Kantor Exhibit 5, #4 Depo except Dr Kantor, #5 Mundt Exhibit 31, #6 Mundt Exhibit 30, #7 Mundt Exhibit 32, #8 Mundt Exhibit 33, #9 Mundt Exhibit 7, #10 Mundt Exhibit 8, #11 Mundt Exhibit 12)(Weinstein, David) Modified text on 11/2/2022 (LDJ).
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #134 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Jackson and Reynolds for Failure to Complete Fact Sheets. The claims of Plaintiffs Brenda Jackson and Clifton Reynolds Jr. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Jackson and Reynolds as parties to this case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/25/2022. (ALL)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ENDORSED ORDER granting #153 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Heidi Marie Mitchell, Aizaz M. Chaudhary, and James Edward Cheek, III are terminated as counsel in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/13/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Unopposed MOTION for James Edward Cheek, III, Esq. and Heidi M. Mitchell, Esq. of the law firm of Winderweedle, Haines, Ward & Woodman, P.A., and Aizaz M. Chaudhary, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant, Universal City Property Management III, LLC by Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC. (Cheek, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Establish General Causation by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Sahu Dep. Transcript Excerpts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Amended Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Stipulation regarding PFS Answers & Expert Designations)(Weinstein, David)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert, Dr. Ronald J. Kendall by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Kendall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kendall Expert Report, #2 Exhibit Kendall Rebuttal Report, #3 Exhibit Kendall Depo Transcript, #4 Exhibit Kendall Depo Transcript (cont.), #5 Exhibit Cowan Expert Report)(Weinstein, David)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #148 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Shahrokh Rouhani, Ph.D., P.E. by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Vervicia Henderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 10/12/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Shahrokh Rouhani, Ph.D., P.E. by Vervicia Henderson. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 10/12/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #146 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Mundt by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Vervicia Henderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 10/12/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Mundt by Vervicia Henderson. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 10/12/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #144 MOTION In Limine to Exclude Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Robert Jame by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Vervicia Henderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 10/12/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION In Limine to Exclude Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Robert James by Vervicia Henderson. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 10/12/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #142 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to General Causation and Supporting Legal Memorandum by Timothy Michael Morgan on behalf of Vervicia Henderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 10/12/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to General Causation and Supporting Legal Memorandum by Vervicia Henderson. (Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 10/12/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Mattison by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Kantor by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert, Dr. Panigrahy by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Kantor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kantor Expert Report, #2 Exhibit Kantor Rebuttal Report, #3 Exhibit Kantor Depo Transcript, #4 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 21, #5 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 18, #9 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 17)(Weinstein, David)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Fidrych on behalf of Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC (Fidrych, Michael)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion for Summary Judgment on General Causation and Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Panigrahy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Panigrahy Report, #2 Exhibit Rebuttal Report, #3 Exhibit Highlighted Dep Transcript, #4 Exhibit Annotated Report, #5 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 12, #9 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 13, #10 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 17, #14 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 18, #15 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 19, #16 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 20, #17 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 21, #18 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 22, #19 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 23, #20 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 24, #21 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 25, #22 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 26, #23 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 27, #24 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 28, #25 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 29, #26 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 30, #27 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 31, #28 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 32, #29 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 33, #30 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 34, #31 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 35, #32 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 36, #33 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 37, #34 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 38, #35 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 39, #36 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 40, #37 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 41, #38 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 42, #39 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 43, #40 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 44, #41 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 45, #42 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 46, #43 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 47, #44 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 48, #45 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 49, #46 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 50, #47 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 51, #48 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 52, #49 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 53, #50 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 54, #51 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 55, #52 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 56, #53 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 57, #54 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 58, #55 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 59, #56 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 60, #57 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 61, #58 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 62, #59 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 63, #60 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 64, #61 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 65, #62 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 66, #63 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 67, #64 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 68, #65 Exhibit Panigrahy Dep Exhibit 69, #66 Exhibit Boice 1999, #67 Exhibit Lipworth et al. 2011, #68 Exhibit Deng 2019)(Weinstein, David)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation of Materials Filed in Support of Lockheed Martin's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Mattison (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report, #2 Exhibit Rebuttal Report, #3 Exhibit Highlighted Dep Transcript, #4 Exhibit Highlighted Dep Transcript, #5 Exhibit Brender 2007, #6 Exhibit Liu 2017)(Weinstein, David)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION to Dismiss Jackson and Reynolds for Failure to Complete Fact Sheets by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weinstein, David)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Dispositive motions due by 10/11/2022. (LMF)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ENDORSED ORDER granting #132 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines as a Result of Hurricane Ian. Due to the unique circumstances of this case and the recent hearing, the General Causation Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions Deadline and the Deadline for Serving Supplemental Plaintiff Fact Sheet responses are both extended to 10/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/26/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Extension of Deadlines as a Result of Hurricane Ian by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Torres, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Heather Suarez. (HLS)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 09/20/2022 before Judge Daniel C. Irick. *Transcriber's Note: Amended as to page 7, lines 18-19. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Suarez, RPR, FCRR, CRR, FPR; Telephone number (407) 801-8921; E-mail: heathersuarez.usocr@gmail.com. Tape Number: Electronic Hearing. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 10/13/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2022. (HLS)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Heather Suarez. (HLS)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 09/20/2022 before Judge Daniel C. Irick. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Suarez, RPR, FCRR, CRR, FPR; Telephone number: (407) 801-8921; E-mail: heathersuarez.usocr@gmail.com. Tape Number: Electronic Recording. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 10/13/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2022. (HLS)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER re: #113 Joint Notice Regarding Plaintiff Fact Sheets and Request for Hearing. It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before October 4, 2022, each Plaintiff shall provide supplemental responses to Questions 27(a)(iii),(iv); (b)(iii),(iv); and (c)(iii),(iv). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/20/2022. (TNP)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick: Discovery Hearing held on 9/20/2022. (Digital) (TNP)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ENDORSED ORDER granting #124 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Pamela Cordova Papasov is terminated as counsel in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/7/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION for Pamela Papasov to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Papasov, Pamela) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ENDORSED ORDER granting #122 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jillian Margaret Askren is terminated as counsel in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/2/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION for Jillian Askren to Withdraw as Attorney by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Askren, Jillian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Panagiotis V. Albanis on behalf of Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Albanis, Panagiotis)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ENDORSED ORDER granting #115 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, due to the agreement and good cause set forth in the Joint Notice. The general-causation discovery deadline is extended to 9/14/2022 for the sole purpose of allowing Plaintiffs' counsel to complete their cross-examination and Defendants' counsel to complete any redirect of general-causation witnesses whose depositions began or will begin on or before the 9/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/29/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Discovery Hearing hearing previously scheduled for 8/30/2022 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Discovery Hearing set for 9/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (TNP)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE canceling Motion Hearing hearing scheduled for 8/25/2022 (TNP)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 JOINT NOTICE by parties re #115 EMERGENCY MOTION for Limited Extension of General Causation Discovery Deadline (Hopper, Ryan) Text modified on 8/25/2022 (RDO).
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #115 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadline. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2022 at 09:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. The parties shall file a joint notice if the requested relief is unopposed.(TNP) Text modified on 8/24/2022 (RDO).
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadline by All Plaintiffs. (Rocha, Rene) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Text modified on 8/24/2022 (RDO).
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of hearing: re: #113 Joint NOTICE Regarding Plaintiff Fact Sheets and Request for Hearing. Discovery Hearing set for 8/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (TNP)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 JOINT NOTICE Regarding Plaintiff Fact Sheet and Request for Hearing by all parties. (Weinstein, David) Text modified on 8/17/2022 (RDO).
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ENDORSED ORDER granting #111 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline to Serve Rebuttal Reports Addressing the Expert Report of Robert C. James. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/13/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/8/22 to File Rebuttal Reports Addressing the Expert Report of Robert C. James by All Plaintiffs. (Rocha, Rene) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 7/13/2022 (LDJ).
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ENDORSED ORDER granting #109 Unopposed Motion by Lockheed Martin for Extension of Deadline to Serve Toxicologist's Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/30/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Toxicologist's Expert Report by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re Notice Regarding Deposition Hours and Discovery Consolidation. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/10/2022. (YG)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #98 Motion. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/6/2022. (YG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2022: #1 Exhibit 1) (YG).
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #102 Motion for Protective Order. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 4/26/2022. (RN)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick: MOTION HEARING held on 4/26/2022 re #102 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Arthur Anderson, Jennifer Johnson, Ana Saperstein, Naoyuki Komatsu, Victor Goldschmidt, Adam Brackett, Jeff Kozak, Laura Juda, Eric Saperstein, Katherin Flury, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Eric Rutledge, Jeffrey Muddell, John Tosti, Emilio San Martin, Mark Juda, Theodora Turk, Morgan Innes, Elaine Goldschmidt, Tom Stone, Andrew Innes, Brenda Jackson, Jordan Schursky, Brian Slusarz, Aubrey Carp, Jack Turk, Kelly Kemp, Patricia Ramsey, Helen Tosti, Logan Goodson, Renee Ross, Naho Komatsu, Kristen Sheen, Patricia Anderson, Donna DeMilt, Wendy Stone, Andrew Ebert, Stephanie Muddell, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Amanda Siegrist, Ari Saperstein, Vervicia Henderson, Deborah Reese, David A. Berry, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Richard Eidemiller, Brenda White, Ryo Komatsu, Brian Kemp, Justin Brunelle, Elizabeth Brackett, Michael L Iacovino, Ann McGarry, Cristina Turk, Meredith Brunelle, Donald Goertz, William Siegrist, Brendan Havens, Michael McGarry, Kristi Hujik, Kevin Kiely, Austin Siegrist. (Digital) (RN)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #102 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hopper, Ryan)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Rocha, Rene) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Amie First. (ARF)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on March 9, 2022 before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Court Reporter Amie R. First, RDR, CRR, CRC, CPE, AmieFirst.CourtReporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 5/6/2022 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2022 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2022. (ARF)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Joint NOTICE Regarding Deposition Hours and Discovery Consolidation by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #92 Order pdf (Weinstein, David) Modified text on 3/31/2022 (LDJ).
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Implementation of Defendants' Proposed Plaintiff Fact Sheet by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE Regarding Plaintiff Fact Sheets by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Richard Eidemiller, Katherin Flury, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Fact Sheet)(Rocha, Rene) Modified text on 3/31/2022 (LDJ).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ENDORSED ORDER granting #95 Joint Motion for Additional Time to Report to the Court. The deadlines in the Court's 3/14/2022 Order are extended from 3/23/2022 to 3/30/2022. Counsel are cautioned against filing a motion to extend a deadline on the date of the deadline sought to be extended. Filing such a motion does not toll the expiration of the deadline at issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 3/25/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Notice Pursuant to the Court's March 14, 2022 Order by All Plaintiffs. (Rocha, Rene) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #89 Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Weinstein, David)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #89 Amended Complaint by Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC.(Mitchell, Heidi)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to cross-notice all depositions in each of the cases. No witness may be deposed more than once across all four cases. By Wednesday, March 23, 2022, the parties are DIRECTED to meet and- confer and file a joint notice advising the Court of their positions on the consolidated number of hours of depositions appropriate for each side, encompassing all four cases. The notice should also advise their positions on whether discovery requests and responses in one case should apply across all four cases. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/14/2022. (YG)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/9/2022. Court Reporter: Amie First (YG)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE to counsel Marie N. Appel Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies emailed)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Rocha, Rene)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ENDORSED ORDER granting #85 Unopposed Motion to Amend. Plaintiff is directed to enter the Fourth Amended Complaint on the docket as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/2/2022. (Dalton, Jr., Roy)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opposition by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #86 Notice (Other) (Hopper, Ryan) Modified text on 3/2/2022 (LDJ).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Opposition by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #85 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint (Hopper, Ryan) Modified text on 2/22/2022 (LDJ).
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fourth Amended Complaint)(Rocha, Rene)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on October 18, 2022 10:00 am before John Freud. (Weinstein, David)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of hearing: Status Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. (YG)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (LDJ)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2022 Discovery due by 9/1/2022 Dispositive motions due by 10/3/2022 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/1/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/1/2022. BELLWETHER GROUP 1: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 9/4/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/3/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. BELLWETHER GROUP 2: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 5/6/2024 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. BELLWETHER GROUP 3: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 7/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/27/2022. (YG)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying #34 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/10/2022. (YG)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Weinstein, David)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand (Re: Third Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 74)) by Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC.(Mitchell, Heidi)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Joint Case Management Proposal by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Weinstein, David) Modified text on 11/16/2021 (LDJ).
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE to counsel Pamela C. Papasov of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies emailed)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE to counsel Marie N. Appel Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies emailed)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Petosa, Frank)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ENDORSED ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/5/2021. (LLM)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Amie First. (ARF)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Amie First. (ARF)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on October 26, 2021, before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Court Reporter Amie R. First, RDR, CRR, CRC, CPE, AmieFirst.CourtReporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 11/26/2021 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2021 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2022. (ARF)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/15/21 to File Notice Concerning Case Management Proposals by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 11/5/2021 (LDJ).
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #26 Motion ; denying as moot #28 Motion for Joinder; denying #35 Motion to Stay. By Friday, November 5, 2021, the parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer and then file one joint submission with a case management plan encompassing joint deadlines in all three cases.1 The parties may note any disagreements in the joint submission. By Tuesday, November 9, 2021, Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file a third amended complaint. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/28/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Set deadline: Third Amended Complaint due by 11/9/2021 (LDJ)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/26/2021. Court Reporter: Amie First (YG)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-01363-RBD-DCI. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: In light of U.S. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly's recusal (Doc. #61), and pursuant to Local Rule 1.05(a), the Court REASSIGNS this case to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick, for consideration alongside Case Nos. 6:20-cv-1770 and 6:21-cv-1570. The Undersigned will remain the presiding judge. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/14/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ENTERED IN ERROR - ASSIGNMENT VOIDED- Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-01363-RBD-LRH. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (ALL) Modified on 10/14/2021 (ALL).
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENDORSED ORDER denying #60 Motion for Leave to File Document. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/14/2021. (LLM)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE to counsel Pamela C. Papasov of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies emailed)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER of recusal. Judge Kelly has recused himself from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/14/2021. (KRR)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :REPLY TO LOCKHEED MARTIN'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND by All Plaintiffs. (Petosa, Frank)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Remark: Doc. #53 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/13/2021. (LLM)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #25 Motion to Dismiss, #28 Motion for Joinder filed by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Petosa, Frank)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-01363-RBD-GJK. Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Davis Decl.)(Weinstein, David)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Heidi Mitchell, Esq. Appearance by James Edward Cheek, III on behalf of Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC (Cheek, James)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Cheek, James)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Order by Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC for Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC. (Cheek, James)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 1.05(a), this case is REASSIGNED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly for consideration with Case Nos. 6:20-cv-1770-RBD-GJK and 6:21-cv-1570-RBD-GJK. The Undersigned will continue to be the presiding judge. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/8/2021. (BIA)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of hearing: re: #45 Case Management Report. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. *The Court has set aside One (1) hour and Thirty (30) minutes for this hearing*(BIA)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ENDORSED ORDER granting #49 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file response to #25 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 10/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/6/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Petosa, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 MOTION to Stay and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Stay and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Beaudine, Michael)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER directing compliance to #9 Initial Order. On or before October 14, 2021, the Defendant Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC is DIRECTED to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement that comply with the Court's order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/30/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Weinstein, David)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ENDORSED ORDER granting #43 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #34 Motion to Remand to State Court. Response due by 10/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/27/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re #40 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant University City Development Partners LTD. as a party to this action. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/23/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 **DOCKET IN ERROR** Modified on 9/23/2021 (BIA).
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal of University City Development Partners Ltd. ONLY by Arthur Anderson, Patricia Anderson, David A. Berry, Adam Brackett, Elizabeth Brackett, Justin Brunelle, Meredith Brunelle, Aubrey Carp, Harrison Carp-Schursky, Donna DeMilt, Andrew Ebert, Richard Eidemiller, Donald Goertz, Elaine Goldschmidt, Victor Goldschmidt, Logan Goodson, Brendan Havens, Vervicia Henderson, Kristi Hujik, Dawn Iacovino, Michael D Iacovino, Michael L Iacovino, Andrew Innes, Morgan Innes, Brenda Jackson, Benjamin Johnson, Drew Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White (Petosa, Frank) Modified text on 9/22/2021 (LDJ).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Remark: Doc. #36 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/20/2021. (LLM)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE to counsel Pamela C. Papasov of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies emailed)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE to counsel Marie N. Appel Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies emailed)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #27 Order directing compliance, #9 Order by Laura Juda, Mark Juda, Brian Kemp, Kelly Kemp, Kevin Kiely, Naho Komatsu, Naoyuki Komatsu, Ryo Komatsu, Jeff Kozak, Ann McGarry, Michael McGarry, Jeffrey Muddell, Stephanie Muddell, Patricia Ramsey, Deborah Reese, Renee Ross, Eric Rutledge, Emilio San Martin, Ana Saperstein, Ari Saperstein, Eric Saperstein, Jordan Schursky, Kristen Sheen, Amanda Siegrist, Austin Siegrist, William Siegrist, Brian Slusarz, Tom Stone, Wendy Stone, Helen Tosti, John Tosti, Cristina Turk, Jack Turk, Theodora Turk, Brenda White. (Petosa, Frank)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Stay and Supporting Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Petosa, Frank)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Petosa, Frank)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Francis A. Citera and Gretchen N. Miller are granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/16/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Gretchen N. Miller to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18714182 for $150 by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hopper, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Francis A. Citera to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18714093 for $150 by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hopper, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE to counsel Francis A. Citera and Gretchen N. Miller Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies emailed)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Weinstein, David)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Joinder in Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC. (Cheek, James)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER directing compliance to #9 Initial Order. On or before September 29, 2021, the Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement that comply with the Court's order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/15/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Request for Judicial Notice #25 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by NBCUniversal Media, LLC, University City Development Partners Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Beaudine, Michael) Modified text on 9/16/2021 (LDJ).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by NBCUniversal Media, LLC, University City Development Partners Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Beaudine, Michael)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Remark: Doc. #20 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/9/2021. (LLM)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by James Edward Cheek, III on behalf of Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC (Cheek, James)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Remark: Doc. #19 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/8/2021. (LLM)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by NBCUniversal Media, LLC, University City Development Partners Ltd.. Related case(s): Yes (Beaudine, Michael)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Order by NBCUniversal Media, LLC, University City Development Partners Ltd.. (Beaudine, Michael)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Order by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. New case number: 6:21-cv-01363-RBD-DCI. Judge Paul G. Byron no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Honorable Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., with his consent, pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a), Middle District of Florida. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/26/2021. (SJB)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 9/15/2021, Defendants Lockheed Martin Corporation, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, and University City Development Partners Ltd. shall respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/26/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by NBCUniversal Media, LLC, University City Development Partners Ltd.. (Beaudine, Michael)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Beaudine on behalf of NBCUniversal Media, LLC, University City Development Partners Ltd. (Beaudine, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/15/21 to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Weinstein, David) Modified text on 8/25/2021 (MEJ).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE to counsel Rene Fernandez Rocha; Michael F. Ram Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE to counsel T. Michael Morgan; Pamela Papasov of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/23/2021. (GNB) ctp
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Ronald White on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (White, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond D. Jackson on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Jackson, Raymond)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian Margaret Askren on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Askren, Jillian)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Thomas Hopper on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Hopper, Ryan)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Torres on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Torres, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Weinstein, David)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-1363-PGB-DCI. (LRB)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2021-ca-004019-O filed in State Court on April 19, 2021. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18612963) filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 State Court Second Amended COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weinstein, David) Modified text on 8/27/2021 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson et al v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: David Barnett Weinstein
Represented By: Christopher Torres
Represented By: Christopher Ronald White
Represented By: Francis A. Citera
Represented By: Gretchen N. Miller
Represented By: Jillian Margaret Askren
Represented By: Raymond D. Jackson
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Hopper
Represented By: Brian C. Porter
Represented By: Irina Khasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Beaudine
Represented By: Christina Y. Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. McLoone
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal City Property Management Company III, LLC
Represented By: Aizaz M. Chaudhary
Represented By: Heidi Marie Mitchell
Represented By: James Edward Cheek, III
Represented By: Michael R. Fidrych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University City Development Partners Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. Beaudine
Represented By: Christina Y. Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. McLoone
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vervicia Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Y Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Outing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Eidemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Eidemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jr. Clifford Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilio San Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Sheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Slusarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Hujik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Tosti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tosti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Saperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Saperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari Saperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Schursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aubrey Carp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison Carp-Schursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Juda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Juda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Ebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Goertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Brunelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Brunelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna DeMilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Goldschmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Goldschmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Goodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L Iacovino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Iacovino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Iacovino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Innes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naoyuki Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naho Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryo Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Muddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Muddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Siegrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Siegrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Siegrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristina Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodora Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Innes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Reese
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Represented By: Michael F. Ram
Represented By: Pamela Papasov
Represented By: Rene Fernandez Rocha
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Represented By: Pamela Cordova Papasov
Represented By: Rene F Rocha, III
Represented By: Timothy Michael Morgan
Represented By: Panagiotis V. Albanis
Represented By: Jennifer Nichole Winn
Represented By: Shawn Kenneth Jarecki
Represented By: Eitan Ebrahimi
Represented By: Eitan Goldrosen
Represented By: Joshua Dustin Moore
Represented By: Josh Autry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherin Flury
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Represented By: Michael F. Ram
Represented By: Pamela Cordova Papasov
Represented By: Rene F Rocha, III
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Morgan
Represented By: Panagiotis V. Albanis
Represented By: Jennifer Nichole Winn
Represented By: Shawn Kenneth Jarecki
Represented By: Eitan Ebrahimi
Represented By: Eitan Goldrosen
Represented By: Joshua Dustin Moore
Represented By: Josh Autry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?