Davis v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Robin Davis
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 6:2021cv01371
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Robin Davis. (Silverman, Raymond)
September 24, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie H. Muhlstock on behalf of Robin Davis (Muhlstock, Melanie)
September 24, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison Macy Biggs on behalf of Robin Davis (Biggs, Harrison)
September 14, 2021 Filing 39 Member Case BRIEF by Robin Davis. (Silverman, Raymond) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (TNP).
September 14, 2021 Filing 38 BRIEF on Case Status in Davis by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Johnston, Robert) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (TNP).
September 14, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond C. Silverman on behalf of Robin Davis (Silverman, Raymond)
September 14, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Carl Oxx on behalf of Robin Davis (Oxx, Christopher)
September 14, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Gregory Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Joe)
September 13, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Johnston on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Johnston, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Reissaus on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Reissaus, Andrew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Grant)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Status Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. All motions pending as of the date of this Order are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Parties seeking relief should renew any motions by refiling them in the individual member cases or in the lead case as appropriate. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/31/2021. Associated Cases: 6:21-md-03006-RBD-DAB et al.(BIA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (BIA).
August 20, 2021 Filing 30 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: 3006 Receipt of original record from the Middle District of North Carolina, case number: 1:20-cv-01127-CCE-JEP. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:21-cv-01371-RBD-DAB. (ALL)
August 20, 2021 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:20-cv-01127. File received electronically
August 20, 2021 Filing 28 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record. re: Transfer Order transferring this action to MDFL. (Taylor, Abby) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 27 TRANSFER ORDER re: MDL 3006 transferring this action to the Middle District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order. Received and Filed on 08/10/2021. (Taylor, Abby) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 07/22/2021, as set out herein.(Taylor, Abby) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 07/22/2021, that the Joint Local Rule 5.5 Report [Doc. #17] is adopted as further set out herein, and that the Confidentiality and Protective Order [Doc.#17-1] is adopted as supplemented by the Stipulated Protective Order filed contemporaneously herewith. FURTHER that the Motion for a Rule 502(d) Order [Doc. #18] is GRANTED and the Parties' proposal is adopted as set out above, and the attorney-client privilege and/or work- production protection applicable to any written or electronic documents or communications produced in discovery in this matter is not waived by any production or disclosure that occurs in the context of the pending litigation before this Court. FURTHER that Plaintiff's Motion to Stay [Doc. #20] is GRANTED IN PART, and Plaintiff have until September 3, 2021 to file any motion to compel regarding the Novartis document production disputes discussed in the briefing. Other case-specific discovery may proceed, but if Defendant seeks discovery that would be affected by the disputed document production, or if Plaintiff contends that the document production issue must be resolved before particular discovery can proceed, Plaintiff may further address those issues in a Motion for Protective Order or in response to a Motion to Compel as to specific discovery requests if the Parties are unable to agree.(Taylor, Abby) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
July 12, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #17 L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties; #18 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Entry of 502(d) Order, and #20 MOTION to Stay , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff ROBIN DAVIS, to Response to #20 MOTION to Stay filed by ROBIN DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BUCHANAN, BRIAN) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Stay filed by ROBIN DAVIS filed by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION. Replies due by 7/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit email, #2 Exhibit responses)(JONES, KELLY) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE by ROBIN DAVIS re #21 Memorandum Certificate of Word Count (BUCHANAN, BRIAN) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 6/30/2021. If defendant objects to the motion to stay, a response must be filed by July 7, 2021. If any reply is needed, it shall be filed no later than July 9, 2021. See Doc. 4 paragraph 9; Doc. 19 paragraph 9.(Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff ROBIN DAVIS re #20 MOTION to Stay filed by ROBIN DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(BUCHANAN, BRIAN) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay by ROBIN DAVIS. Response to Motion due by 7/20/2021 (BUCHANAN, BRIAN) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 19 REVISED STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES(Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Set/Response Deadline: re #18 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Entry of 502(d) Order : Responses due by 6/28/2021. (Taylor, Abby) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Entry of 502(d) Order by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed 502(d) Order)(JONES, KELLY) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective and Confidentiality Order)(JONES, KELLY) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Appointing RENE STEMPLE TREHY, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Bond, Melisa) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 05/24/2021, that the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report [Doc. #14 is approved as modified herein. All discovery (including expert discovery and damages-related discovery) must be completed by March 4, 2022, and that deadline may not be altered by agreement of the parties absent a Court Order. FURTHER that the Parties must file a separate Local Rule 5.5 Report within 14 days, and the Court will determine whether a telephone hearing is necessary to address the filing of sealed documents in this case. The parties agree that the appropriate plan for this case is that designated in LR 26.1(a) as Exceptional. The parties agree that the mediator shall be Rene Stemple Trehy. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2021. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2021. Discovery due by 3/4/2022. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 10/4/2021. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 11/4/2021.Parties do not consent to a magistrate judge. Trial of the action is expected to take approximately 10 to 15 days. A jury trial has been demanded. (Taylor, Abby) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
May 24, 2021 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 3/4/2022. (Bond, Melisa) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Motions Referred: RE: #14 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 14 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION.(JONES, KELLY) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION.(JONES, KELLY) Modified on 5/14/2021 requested amended report with dates certain(Garrett, Kim). [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney BRIAN A. BUCHANAN on behalf of Plaintiff ROBIN DAVIS ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3047412.) (BUCHANAN, BRIAN) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 5/20/2021 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney SUSAN P. MCWILLIAMS on behalf of Defendant NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3016766.) (MCWILLIAMS, SUSAN) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CAITLIN A. MITCHELL on behalf of Defendant NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION (MITCHELL, CAITLIN) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MARGUERITE S. WILLIS on behalf of Defendant NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION (WILLIS, MARGUERITE) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION. (JONES, KELLY) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION. (JONES, KELLY) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (BUCHANAN, BRIAN) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-2949846.), filed by ROBIN DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BUCHANAN, BRIAN) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]
December 15, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 8/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Davis
Represented By: Brian A. Buchanan
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Kelly Brooks Jones
Represented By: Caitlin A. Mitchell
Represented By: Marguerite S. Willis
Represented By: Susan P. McWilliams
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Represented By: Andrew L. Reissaus
Represented By: Grant Hollingsworth
Represented By: Robert E. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?