Sapp v. Deal et al
Plaintiff: Bobbie Fischer Sapp
Defendant: Michael Deal, Jeffrey Marcum, John Bologna, Jessica Eller, Daniel Pushor, Dean Richard Johnson and City of Winter Park
Case Number: 6:2021cv01515
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 19 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Bobbie Fischer Sapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Intent)(Hill, Farnita) Modified text on 11/8/2021 (TNP).
November 4, 2021 Filing 18 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (TNP)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 12/22/2021 Joinder of Parties due by 12/22/2021 Discovery due by 11/1/2022 Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2022 Pretrial statement due by 3/20/2023 All other motions due by 3/27/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 9/1/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/3/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron Jury Trial set for 5/1/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 11/14/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/4/2021. (GNB) ctp
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mari, Frank)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See Order Granting Motion for Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/22/2021. (CPH)
October 21, 2021 Set deadline: Amended Complaint due by 11/5/2021 (TNP)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for More Definite Statement. On or before November 5, 2021, Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint that remedies the deficiencies identified in the Motion. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order within the allotted time may result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/21/2021. (RN)
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Michael Deal. (Mari, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 6, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by John Bologna, Jessica Eller, Jeffrey Marcum, Daniel Pushor. (Mari, Frank) Modified text on 10/7/2021 (MEJ).
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Bobbie Fischer Sapp Related Case(s): Yes (Hill, Farnita) Modified text on 10/5/2021 (MEJ).
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Bobbie Fischer Sapp. (Hill, Farnita)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 10/6/2021, Defendants Michael Deal, Jeffrey Marcum, John Bologna,Jessica Eller, and Daniel Pushor shall respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/22/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Amended Complaint by John Bologna, Michael Deal, Jessica Eller, Jeffrey Marcum, Daniel Pushor. (Mari, Frank) Text modified on 9/22/2021 (RDO).
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Initial Order by John Bologna, Michael Deal, Jessica Eller, Jeffrey Marcum, Daniel Pushor. (Mari, Frank) Modified on 9/22/2021 (RDO).
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by John Bologna, Michael Deal, Jessica Eller, Jeffrey Marcum, Daniel Pushor. Related case(s): Yes (Mari, Frank)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/20/2021. (GNB) ctp
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Daniel Tessitore on behalf of John Bologna, Michael Deal, Jessica Eller, Jeffrey Marcum, Daniel Pushor (Tessitore, Joseph)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-1515-PGB-DCI. (SJB)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit, in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2021-CA-8142-O filed in State Court on 08/12/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18707621 filed by Daniel Pushor, John Bologna, Jeffrey Marcum, Michael Deal, Jessica Eller. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Amended Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mari, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sapp v. Deal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Fischer Sapp
Represented By: Farnita Saunders Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Deal
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Tessitore
Represented By: Frank Mari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Marcum
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Tessitore
Represented By: Frank Mari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bologna
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Tessitore
Represented By: Frank Mari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Eller
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Tessitore
Represented By: Frank Mari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Pushor
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Tessitore
Represented By: Frank Mari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Richard Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Winter Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?