Goldfarb v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Beth Ann Goldfarb
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2021cv01560
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 INITIAL ORDER: Parties have 14 days from the date of this Order to file their Disclosure Statement (if not already filed) and, additionally to notify the Court of a related action by filing a Notice of Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 9/22/2021. (counsel emailed/copy mailed to plaintiff)(AKC) Modified on 9/23/2021 (AKC).
September 22, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (ALL)
September 22, 2021 Filing 43 TRANSFER IN from the District of South Carolina. Case assigned to District Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New Case Number: 6:21-cv-01560-GKS-DCI. (ALL)
September 22, 2021 Filing 42 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 8:21-cv-00885. File received electronically
September 21, 2021 Filing 41 JUDGMENT. The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is accepted and this case is transferred to the Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division. (arut) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION accepting #33 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 9/21/21. (arut) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security Administration re #31 Answer/Electronic Certified Administrative Record, (Bowens, Barbara) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Change of Address by Beth Ann Goldfarb. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(arut) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 37 ***DOCUMENT MAILED Name and Address Update Form placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Beth Ann Goldfarb 1069 Ellen Court Melbourne, FL 32935 (arut) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Filing 35 REPLY by Commissioner of Social Security Administration to #33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint - Social Security,, filed by Beth Ann Goldfarb . (Bowens, Barbara) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 34 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Beth Ann Goldfarb, 2265 Coastal Lane, West Melbourne, FL 32904 (arut) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint - Social Security, filed by Beth Ann Goldfarb. It is recommended that the Court transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Objections to R&R due by 7/27/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/12/2021. (arut) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
July 12, 2021 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security Administration re #31 Answer/Electronic Certified Administrative Record, (Bowens, Barbara) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER/ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Brief due by 8/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10)(Gaughan, Katie) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 29 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 28 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Beth Ann Goldfarb 2265 Coastal Lane West Melbourne, FL 32904 (gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's #26 Motion for extension of time. Plaintiff has until June 30, 2021 to bring this case into proper form. No further extensions will be granted in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 6/11/21.(gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time by Beth Ann Goldfarb. Response to Motion due by 6/18/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 25 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #24 Proper Form Order, 23 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Social Security Complaint form, Copy of #1 Plaintiff's Complaint, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Beth Ann Goldfarb 2265 Coastal Lane West Melbourne, FL 32904 (gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROPER FORM ORDER directing the plaintiff to notify the court in writing of any change of address. Case to be brought into proper form by 6/10/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 5/20/2021. (gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 5/20/2021.(gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
May 4, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time by Beth Ann Goldfarb. Response to Motion due by 5/18/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
April 29, 2021 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 17 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Beth Ann Goldfarb 2265 Coastal Lane West Melbourne, FL 32904 (gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER directing Plaintiff not to contact the Office of the Clerk of Court by telephone about this case. The undersigned has been made aware of Plaintiff's telephone calls to the Office of the Clerk of Court requesting information about this case, lodging complaints, and talking over the clerk. Any further contact with the Court by Plaintiff must be made in writing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 4/29/2021. (gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Proper Form Order, Copy of #1 Complaint - Social Security, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Beth Ann Goldfarb 2265 Coastal Lane West Melbourne, FL 32904 (gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Proper Form Order, Summonses, USM Forms, Complaint, 26.01 Interrogatories form placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Beth Ann Goldfarb 2265 Coastal Lane, West Melbourne, FL 32904 (alew, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPER FORM ORDER. Case to be brought into proper form by 5/11/2021. Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 4/20/21. (alew, ) Modified on 4/20/2021 to edit text (alew, ). [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time by Beth Ann Goldfarb. Response to Motion due by 5/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Beth Ann Goldfarb. Address updated. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED (second time) 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Proper Form Order, Copy of #1 Complaint - Social Security to be completed,3 Summonses, 3 USM 285, Complaint, Local Rule 26.01 interrogatories, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Beth Goldfarb at current address 2265 Coastal Lane, West Melbourne FL 32904. (gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/31/2021.(gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #1 Complaint, #5 Proper Form Order, 3 Summonses, 3 USM 285, Complaint, Local Rule 26.01 forms placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Beth Ann Goldfarb 301 North Gum Street Summerville, SC 29483; and USPS 1551 US-1 Vero Beach, FL 32960 (alew, ) Modified on 3/31/2021 to edit text (alew, ). [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 4/21/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/30/21. (alew, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Beth Ann Goldfarb. Response to Motion due by 4/8/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, ) [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Beth Ann Goldfarb. Service due by 6/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Social Security Administration Correspondence (gpre, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2021: #2 Complaint, #3 Additional Attachment to Complaint, #4 Envelope) (arut, ). [Transferred from scd on 9/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldfarb v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Ann Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Katie M Gaughan
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?