Fekeith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Danielle Renee Fekeith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2021cv01631
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF of service by Danielle Renee Fekeith as to the Attorney General on 10/22/2021. (SPM)
November 1, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF of service by Danielle Renee Fekeith as to the Office of Regional Chief Counsel on 10/21/2021. (SPM)
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Danielle Renee Fekeith. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/14/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (SPM)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ARJ)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Danielle Renee Fekeith. (Keeter, James)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Danielle Renee Fekeith. Related case(s): Yes (Keeter, James)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/5/2021. (KRR)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER: Parties have 14 days from the date of this Order to file their Disclosure Statement (if not already filed) and, additionally to notify the Court of a related action by filing a Notice of Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 10/4/2021. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (ARJ)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-1631-GKS-GJK. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 First MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (SJB)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Danielle Renee Fekeith. (Keeter, James)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Danielle Renee Fekeith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keeter, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fekeith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Renee Fekeith
Represented By: James Wilson Keeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?