Baylor v. Eto
Plaintiff: Christopher Gary Baylor
Defendant: Ayano Eto, Ayano Eto Baylor, Ayance, MilkTea, Ice Cream Princess and Roza
Case Number: 6:2021cv01636
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Objection to Defendant's Exhibits A, B, C & E re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the case. (BD)
November 23, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Gary Baylor re: #25 Response to order to show cause by Christopher Gary Baylor. (BD)
November 23, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #20 Order to show cause filed by Christopher Gary Baylor. (BD)
November 18, 2021 Reset deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 12/1/2021 (KNC)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the Order to Show Cause (Doc. #20) is extended up to and including December 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/17/2021. (TYI)
November 15, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of service by Christopher Gary Baylor re #22 Expedited Petition for Extension of Time as to #20 Order to show cause. (BD)
November 15, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION titled "Expedited Petition for Extension of Time" as to #20 Order to show cause by Christopher Gary Baylor. (BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
November 12, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled "Petition to Disqualify District Court Judge Roy B. Dalton Jr for evaluation by Chief Judge Timothy Corrigan" by Christopher Gary Baylor. (RLK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: By Friday, November 19, 2021, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE via written response why the Amended Complaint should not be dismissed and this case closed for failure to establish subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to timely and adequately respond may result in this action being closed without further notice. All pending motions are TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT until the jurisdictional issue is resolved. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/5/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #17 Motion. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/5/2021. (LLM)
November 4, 2021 Filing 18 OBJECTION to Defendant's Exhibit D re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the case. (RLK)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to suspend application of rule 3.01(g) and for order Nunc Pro Tunc by Christopher Gary Baylor. (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying without prejudice #11 Motion to Dismiss. The parties are both DIRECTED to review the Local Rules and the Court's Pro se Order (Doc. #6) prior to making any further filings. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/2/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
November 1, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the case filed by Christopher Gary Baylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(RLK)
October 28, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Ayano Eto regarding Income and Assets. (RDO)
October 28, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of service by Ayano Eto re #12 Pro Se Notice of Appearance, #11 MOTION to Dismiss. (RDO)
October 28, 2021 Filing 12 PRO SE NOTICE of Appearance by Ayano Eto. (RDO)
October 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Ayano Eto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Mailing Envelope)(RDO)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 Remark: Doc. #8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/26/2021. (LLM)
October 24, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 10/6/2021 by Christopher Gary Baylor as to Ayano Eto. (LAB)
October 24, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Christopher Gary Baylor. (LAB)
October 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Christopher Gary Baylor. Related case(s): Yes. (LAB)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO SE ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/13/2021. (BIA) (CTP)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/13/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ayano Eto with Jury Demand. filed by Christopher Gary Baylor. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Christopher Gary Baylor.(HAI)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Wednesday, October 20, 2021, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint correcting the deficiency identified in this Order. Failure to timely file will result in this action being closed without further notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/6/2021. (BIA)(ctp)
October 6, 2021 Set deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 10/20/2021 (KNC)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Ayano Eto. (KNC)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ayano Eto with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ORL100501 filed by Christopher Gary Baylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A & B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baylor v. Eto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayano Eto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayano Eto Baylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MilkTea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ice Cream Princess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gary Baylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?