Simmons v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shamona M. Simmons
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2021cv01748
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF of service by Shamona M. Simmons as to Regional Chief Counsel. (SPM)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF of service by Shamona M. Simmons as to the Attorney General. (SPM)
November 18, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Shamona M. Simmons. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/28/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (SPM)
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement re #6 Interested persons order by Shamona M. Simmons. (Chambers, Amy) Modified on 11/3/2021 (SPM).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Amy C. Chambers). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 10/29/2021. (SC)
October 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SPM)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 US Marshal 285 form (Attachments: #1 285 form, #2 285 form)(Kurbatova, Katerina)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Amy C. Chambers to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18858785 for $150 by Shamona M. Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation, #2 consent of local counsel, #3 Special admissions, #4 consent certification)(Kurbatova, Katerina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's counsel shall obtain the required forms on the Court's website, and return the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s) to the Clerk on or before November 5, 2021. The Clerk is directed to provide the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s) to the United States Marshal. Upon receipt of the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s), the United States Marshal is directed to serve the summonses without cost to Plaintiff. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/21/2021. (RN)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER: Parties have 14 days from the date of this Order to file their Disclosure Statement (if not already filed) and, additionally to notify the Court of a related action by filing a Notice of Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 10/21/2021. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (SPM)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-1748-GKS-DCI. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (SJB)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Shamona Simmons. (Kurbatova, Katerina)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Shamona Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kurbatova, Katerina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamona M. Simmons
Represented By: Katerina Kurbatova
Represented By: Amy Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?