Costa Marques v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security and Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 6:2021cv01897
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close this case re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint which the Court construes as a voluntary dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/3/2022. (MEH) ctp
December 23, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques. (Rice, Angelica) Modified text on 12/23/2021 (ARJ).
December 10, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques. Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/24/2021, answer due 1/24/2022; Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security served on 11/24/2021, answer due 1/24/2022. (ARJ)
December 9, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF of service as to the U.S. Attorney's Office by Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques (Rice, Angelica) Modified text on 12/10/2021 (ARJ).
December 9, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF of service as to the Office of the Attorney General by Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques (Rice, Angelica) Modified text on 12/10/2021 (ARJ).
December 9, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques (Rice, Angelica)
December 9, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques (Rice, Angelica)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/9/2021. (MEH) ctp
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/9/2021. (MEH) ctp
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ARJ)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques. (Rice, Angelica)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques. (Rice, Angelica)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security.(ARJ)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques. (Rice, Angelica)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques. (Rice, Angelica)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-1897-CEM-GJK. (MLJ)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Applications against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18917430) filed by Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit All Complaint Exhibits A - F)(Rice, Angelica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Costa Marques v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estevam Luiz Del Nero Costa Marques
Represented By: Angelica Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?