Alterna Capital Solutions, LLC v. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alterna Capital Solutions, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: The Original Swimwear Company, LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv02131
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE by Alterna Capital Solutions, LLC Regarding Trial Length (Byrd, Tucker)
February 11, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on August 18, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Richard F. Joyce. (Byrd, Tucker)
February 9, 2022 Filing 23 SUMMONS issued as to The Original Swimwear Company, LLC. (TNP)
February 8, 2022 Filing 22 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Marsh, Kristina)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying without prejudice #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Counsel may re-file with new dates once the Original Swimwear Company LLC appears in the case. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/3/2022. (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC)
February 2, 2022 Filing 20 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Marsh, Kristina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Text modified on 2/3/2022 (RDO).
January 28, 2022 Filing 19 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against The Orginal Swimwear Company filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Marsh, Kristina) Modified text on 1/28/2022 (TNP).
January 28, 2022 Filing 18 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Lead counsel shall contact opposing counsel and mediator, select a mediation date, and file a notice within 14 days from the date of this order advising the court of the selected mediation date. (counsel emailed) (AKC)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 4/29/2022 Discovery due by 9/2/2022 Dispositive motions due by 9/14/2022 Pretrial statement due by 1/24/2023 All other motions due by 10/14/2022 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 7/1/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/1/2022 Jury Trial set for the trial term which commences on 3/1/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 A before Judge Anne C. Conway. COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO FILE A NOTICE WITHIN 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER ADVISING THE COURT OF THE ESTIMATED NUMBER OF TRIAL DAYS THEY ARE REQUESTING. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/14/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/27/2022. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
January 21, 2022 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Byrd, Tucker)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Order to Show Cause [Doc. 11] is discharged. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/20/2022. (Conway, Anne)
January 18, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.(Marsh, Kristina) Modified text on 1/19/2022 (TNP).
January 18, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #11 Order to show cause filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marsh, Kristina)
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action Amended per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Marsh, Kristina)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to show cause as to Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. why the case should not be remanded for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. Show Cause Response due by 1/20/2022. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/6/2022. (EC1)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. (Marsh, Kristina) Modified text on 1/5/2022 (TNP).
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Marsh, Kristina)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Alterna Capital Solutions, LLC. (Byrd, Tucker)
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Alterna Capital Solutions, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Byrd, Tucker)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., may have until and through January 18, 2022, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/23/2021. (Kidd, Embry)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Marsh, Kristina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL CASE ORDER for both Plaintiff and Defendant - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/22/2021. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/22/2021. (PML) ctp
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-2131-ACC-EJK. (SJB)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Clerk of Court, case number 2021-CA-011075-O filed in State Court on 11/18/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19048536 filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 State Court COMPLAINT, #11 State Court Docket Sheet, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marsh, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alterna Capital Solutions, LLC v. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alterna Capital Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Scottie McPherson
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
Represented By: Kristina Lynn Marsh
Represented By: Christina M. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Original Swimwear Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?