In Re: Tasigna (Nilotinib) Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Robert Merced, Robert Witt, Teresa Gustin, Pamela Gustin, Charlotte Dean, Randy Poitra, Douglas Isaacson, Jeffrey Giancaspro, Ronald Hurd, Allen Garland, Annette Schimming, Estate of Gerald Mielke, Debra Craig, Curtis Pederson, Bruce Becker, Sheila Colella, Ronald Tonge, Stephen Lally, Robin Davis, Roger Burke, Billy Miller, Lisa Pinson and Emily Riley
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
In Re: Tasigna (Nilotinib) Products Liability Litigation
Case Number: 6:2021md03006
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
2 Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for parties and non-speaking counsel to appear telephonically by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Johnston, Robert)
October 20, 2021 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment, specifically Laptops by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Johnston, Robert)
October 20, 2021 Filing 40 Remark: Doc. #34 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/15/2021. (LLM)
October 19, 2021 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Finance Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Holding, AG, a Swiss company, Corporate Parent Novartis AG, a Swiss company, whose shares are publicly traded on the SIX Swiss Exchange, and whose American Depository Shares are publicly traded on the New York Stock Exchange for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.. (Johnston, Robert) Modified text on 10/20/2021 (ALL).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER to STRIKE Doc. 37, Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is in the wrong form. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove it from the docket. Defendant is DIRECTED to refile a compliant form. (See Doc. #23, p. 3.) Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/19/2021. (LLM)
October 18, 2021 Filing 37 (STRICKEN PER ORDER AT 38)CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Finance Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Holding, AG, a Swiss company, Corporate Parent Novartis AG, a Swiss company, whose shares are publicly traded on the SIX Swiss Exchange, and whose American Depository Shares are publicly traded on the New York Stock Exchange for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.. (Johnston, Robert) Modified text and removed document per order on 10/19/2021 (ALL).
October 18, 2021 Filing 36 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Johnston, Robert)
October 18, 2021 Filing 35 REPLY re #31 Memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' proposed search terms and custodians filed by Sheila Colella, Robin Davis, Charlotte Dean, Jeffrey Giancaspro, Pamela Gustin, Teresa Gustin, Ronald Hurd, Douglas Isaacson, Stephen Lally, Robert Merced, Billy Miller, Curtis Pederson, Lisa Pinson, Randy Poitra. (Silverman, Raymond) Modified text on 10/19/2021 (ALL).
October 14, 2021 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #23 Order pdf by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Finance Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Holding, AG, a Swiss company, Corporate Parent Novartis AG, a Swiss company, whose shares are publicly traded on the SIX Swiss Exchange, and whose American Depository Shares are publicly traded on the New York Stock Exchange for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Johnston, Robert)
October 12, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Nikki L. Peters. (NLP)
October 12, 2021 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on September 28, 2021 before Judge Roy B. Dalton Jr. and David A. Baker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Nikki Peters, RPR, CRR, CRC,Telephone number 407-443-0144, courttranscripts@outlook.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 11/2/2021 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2021 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2022. (NLP)
October 11, 2021 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #25 Notice of Filing Discovery Submissions Regarding Custodians and Search Terms filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Johnston, Robert) Modified link and text on 10/12/2021 (ALL).
October 8, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation of NPC's Proposed Plaintiff Fact Sheet and Joint Proposed Implementing Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NPC Proposed PFS, #2 Exhibit 2 - Joint Proposed PFS Implementing Order)(Johnston, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE by Bruce Becker, Roger Burke, Sheila Colella, Debra Craig, Robin Davis, Charlotte Dean, Estate of Gerald Mielke, Allen Garland, Jeffrey Giancaspro, Pamela Gustin, Teresa Gustin, Ronald Hurd, Douglas Isaacson, Stephen Lally, Robert Merced, Billy Miller, Curtis Pederson, Lisa Pinson, Randy Poitra, Emily Riley, Annette Schimming, Ronald Tonge, Robert Witt of Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Plaintiffs' Fact Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silverman, Raymond)
October 8, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE by Bruce Becker, Roger Burke, Sheila Colella, Debra Craig, Robin Davis, Charlotte Dean, Estate of Gerald Mielke, Allen Garland, Jeffrey Giancaspro, Pamela Gustin, Teresa Gustin, Ronald Hurd, Douglas Isaacson, Stephen Lally, Robert Merced, Billy Miller, Curtis Pederson, Lisa Pinson, Randy Poitra, Emily Riley, Annette Schimming, Ronald Tonge, Robert Witt of JOINT Submission Regarding Defendant Fact Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Silverman, Raymond)
October 8, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2014 Tasigna Label, #2 Exhibit B - 2015 Tasigna Label, #3 Exhibit C - 2017 Tasigna Label, #4 Exhibit D - 2012 Canadian Tasigna Label)(Johnston, Robert)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2: Status Conference set for 10/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Discovery due by 11/18/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/19/2022, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/16/2022 Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/4/2021. (BIA)
October 1, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing of Discovery Submissions Regarding Custodians and Search Terms by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Judge Harz on 7-1-2021, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to Judge Harz on 7-16-2021, #3 Exhibit C - Letter to Judge Harz on 8-4-2021)(Johnston, Robert) Modified on 10/4/2021 (ALL).
October 1, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Discovery Briefing by Bruce Becker, Roger Burke, Sheila Colella, Debra Craig, Robin Davis, Charlotte Dean, Estate of Gerald Mielke, Allen Garland, Jeffrey Giancaspro, Pamela Gustin, Teresa Gustin, Ronald Hurd, Douglas Isaacson, Stephen Lally, Robert Merced, Billy Miller, Curtis Pederson, Lisa Pinson, Randy Poitra, Emily Riley, Annette Schimming, Ronald Tonge, Robert Witt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Elias, Richard)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/30/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
September 28, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/28/2021. Court Reporter: Nikki L. Peters (BIA)
September 23, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie H. Muhlstock on behalf of Sheila Colella, Robin Davis, Charlotte Dean, Jeffrey Giancaspro, Pamela Gustin, Teresa Gustin, Ronald Hurd, Douglas Isaacson, Stephen Lally, Robert Merced, Billy Miller, Curtis Pederson, Randy Poitra (Muhlstock, Melanie)
September 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison Macy Biggs on behalf of Sheila Colella, Robin Davis, Charlotte Dean, Jeffrey Giancaspro, Pamela Gustin, Teresa Gustin, Ronald Hurd, Douglas Isaacson, Stephen Lally, Robert Merced, Billy Miller, Curtis Pederson, Randy Poitra (Biggs, Harrison)
September 22, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren DeWeil Brooks on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Brooks, Lauren)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Parties who are not required to be present in person (non-speaking parties and counsel) shall call 1-888-684-8852, access code 5851307, security code 092821 for the hearing. Counsel for the parties are instructed to call in AT LEAST ten minutes prior to the hearing start time. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/17/2021. (BIA)
September 16, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for parties and non-speaking counsel to appear telephonically by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Johnston, Robert)
September 14, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Raymond C. Silverman on behalf of Bruce Becker, Roger Burke, Sheila Colella, Debra Craig, Robin Davis, Charlotte Dean, Estate of Gerald Mielke, Allen Garland, Jeffrey Giancaspro, Pamela Gustin, Teresa Gustin, Ronald Hurd, Douglas Isaacson, Stephen Lally, Robert Merced, Billy Miller, Curtis Pederson, Lisa Pinson, Randy Poitra, Emily Riley, Annette Schimming, Ronald Tonge, Robert Witt. Lead Counsel: Joe G. Hollingsworth; and Robert E. Johnston; and Andrew Reissaus; and Raymond C. Silverman; and Richard M. Elias; and Lawana S. Wichmann; and Christopher Oxx. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tasigna MDL - Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation Leadership Application with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2- Raymond C. Silverman Application for Co-Lead Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Richard M. Elias Application for Co-Lead Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4 - Lawana S. Wichmann Application for Co-Lead Counsel, #5 Exhibit 5 - Christopher Oxx Application for Liaison Counsel)(Silverman, Raymond)
September 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by Richard Milton Elias on behalf of Bruce Becker, Roger Burke, Debra Craig, Allen Garland, Emily Riley, Annette Schimming, Ronald Tonge, Robert Witt (Elias, Richard)
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT Submission on Related State Court Proceedings by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case List)(Johnston, Robert) Modified on 9/15/2021 (ALL).
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawana Sue Wichmann on behalf of Bruce Becker, Roger Burke, Debra Craig, Allen Garland, Emily Riley, Annette Schimming, Ronald Tonge, Robert Witt (Wichmann, Lawana)
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond C. Silverman on behalf of Sheila Colella, Robin Davis, Charlotte Dean, Jeffrey Giancaspro, Pamela Gustin, Teresa Gustin, Ronald Hurd, Douglas Isaacson, Stephen Lally, Robert Merced, Billy Miller, Curtis Pederson, Randy Poitra (Silverman, Raymond)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Carl Oxx on behalf of Sheila Colella, Robin Davis, Charlotte Dean, Jeffrey Giancaspro, Pamela Gustin, Teresa Gustin, Ronald Hurd, Douglas Isaacson, Stephen Lally, Robert Merced, Billy Miller, Curtis Pederson, Randy Poitra (Oxx, Christopher)
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Gregory Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Joe)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Johnston on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Johnston, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Grant)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Reissaus on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Reissaus, Andrew)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Status Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. All motions pending as of the date of this Order are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Parties seeking relief should renew any motions by refiling them in the individual member cases or in the lead case as appropriate. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/31/2021. Associated Cases: 6:21-md-03006-RBD-DAB et al.(BIA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (BIA).
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1): transferring listed action (from the Eastern District of Arkansas) to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. Signed and entered on 8/24/2021 by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (ALL)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action 8:21-cv-979-SCB-SPF per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Emily Riley. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Transfer)(Friedman, Todd)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A Baker. New case number: 6:21-md-03006-RBD-DAB. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 ENDORSED ORDER reassigning the assigned Magistrate Judge on this case from U.S. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly to U.S. Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. (LLM)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring listed actions and those pending outside the Middle District of Florida, as listed in Schedule A, to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and entered on 8/10/2021. (ALL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Tasigna (Nilotinib) Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Tasigna (Nilotinib) Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Merced
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Francisco Antonio Albites
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Witt
Represented By: Craig M Silverman
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Represented By: Richard Milton Elias
Represented By: Todd R. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Gustin
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Gustin
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Dean
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Poitra
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Isaacson
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Giancaspro
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Francisco Antonio Albites
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Hurd
Represented By: Caren I Friedman
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Justin Ross Kaufman
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Represented By: Rosalind Bienvenu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Garland
Represented By: Richard Milton Elias
Represented By: Todd R. Friedman
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Schimming
Represented By: Richard Milton Elias
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Represented By: Scott J Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Gerald Mielke
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Represented By: Scott J Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Craig
Represented By: Bradley Jerome Moore
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Represented By: Richard Milton Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Pederson
Represented By: Bradley Jerome Moore
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Becker
Represented By: Bradley Jerome Moore
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Represented By: Richard Milton Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Colella
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Represented By: Thomas A. Virgulto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Tonge
Represented By: James Robert Bell
Represented By: Joseph A. Osborne
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Represented By: Richard Milton Elias
Represented By: Todd R. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Lally
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Davis
Represented By: Brian A. Buchanan
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Burke
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Represented By: Richard Milton Elias
Represented By: Shawn Daniels
Represented By: Todd R. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Miller
Represented By: Christopher Carl Oxx
Represented By: Harrison Macy Biggs
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Pinson
Represented By: Raymond C. Silverman
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Riley
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Represented By: Todd R. Friedman
Represented By: Richard Milton Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Represented By: Andrew L. Reissaus
Represented By: Angela Elsperger Lord
Represented By: Bradford C. Berge
Represented By: Caitlin A. Mitchell
Represented By: Charles J. Swartwout
Represented By: Charlotte J.S. Rusch
Represented By: Christopher R. Drury
Represented By: Donald R. McMinn
Represented By: Grant Hollingsworth
Represented By: Grant Wagner Hollingsworth
Represented By: Jennifer Campbell
Represented By: Jessica L. Lu
Represented By: John C. Anderson
Represented By: Julia Broggi
Represented By: Kathryn L. Hood
Represented By: Kelly Jones Howell
Represented By: Jacqueline A.R. Root
Represented By: Kelly Brooks Jones
Represented By: Laura Pearn
Represented By: Lauren DeWeil Brooks
Represented By: Marguerite S. Willis
Represented By: Marina Plotkin
Represented By: Mark Kean Ostrowski
Represented By: Michael J. Thomas
Represented By: Rebecca Dawn Hattabaugh
Represented By: Robert E. Johnston
Represented By: Ronald D. Harrison
Represented By: Sarah E. Dlugoszewski
Represented By: Susan P. McWilliams
Represented By: Tamar B. Kelber
Represented By: Victor Lawrence Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?