Thomas v. Thomas
Plaintiff: Antoine-Jacques Thomas
Defendant: Antoine Jacques Thomas
Case Number: 6:2022cv00153
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 JUDGMENT against Plaintiff Antoine-Jacques Thomas (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (KNC)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing case as frivolous. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/22/2022. (LAM)
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Antoine-Jacques Thomas. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(TNP)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #2 Order by Antoine-Jacques Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(TNP)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/28/2022. (DS)
January 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antoine Jacques Thomas filed by Antoine-Jacques Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(TNP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine-Jacques Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoine Jacques Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?