Dodge et al v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Andrew S. Dodge and Danelle L. Dodge
Defendant: Laurel M. Lee, Ashley Moody and Lori Scott
Case Number: 6:2022cv00221
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Decision on Motions to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Schreiber, Charles)
March 8, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Andrew S. Dodge, Danelle L. Dodge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
March 8, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Andrew S. Dodge, Danelle L. Dodge. (BD)
March 3, 2022 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL Rule 3.01(g) Certification re #15 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Lori Scott. (Moskowitz, Deborah) Modified on 3/4/2022 (KNC).
March 2, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Laurel M. Lee. (Davis, Ashley)
March 1, 2022 Filing 15 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Lori Scott. (Moskowitz, Deborah)
February 25, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Lori Scott identifying Corporate Parent Brevard County Supervisor of Elections for Lori Scott. (Moskowitz, Deborah)
February 24, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Ashley Moody. (Schreiber, Charles)
February 24, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ashley Moody identifying Corporate Parent Lori Scott, Corporate Parent Ashley Moody, Corporate Parent Laurel M. Lee, Corporate Parent Andrew S. Dodge, Corporate Parent Danelle L. Dodge for Ashley Moody. (Schreiber, Charles)
February 24, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. F. Schreiber, Jr on behalf of Ashley Moody (Schreiber, Charles)
February 24, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Lynn Moskowitz on behalf of Lori Scott (Moskowitz, Deborah) Modified on 2/24/2022 (removed duplicate text) (KNC).
February 15, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 2/8/2022 as to Lori Scott. (KNC)
February 15, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 2/9/2022 as to Laurel M. Lee. (KNC)
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 2/9/2022 as to Ashley Moody. (KNC)
February 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley E. Davis on behalf of Laurel M. Lee (Davis, Ashley)
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ALL)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/9/2022. (ALL)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (LDJ)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Injunction against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ORL012239) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LDJ) Modified text on 2/4/2022 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodge et al v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew S. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danelle L. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel M. Lee
Represented By: Ashley E. Davis
Represented By: Charles J. F. Schreiber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Moody
Represented By: Charles J. F. Schreiber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Scott
Represented By: Deborah Lynn Moskowitz
Represented By: Maria S Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?