Bragg et al v. Marriott International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carolina Bragg, Juan Perozo, Borislava Raynova, Catherine Throneburg and Ivan Millan
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2022cv00265
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #8 Order pdf by Ivan Millan. (Bolanovich, John)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #8 Order pdf by Borislava Raynova. (Bolanovich, John)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #8 Order pdf by Juan Perozo. (Bolanovich, John)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #8 Order pdf by Catherine Throneburg. (Bolanovich, John)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Court Interrogatories by Carolina Bragg re #8 Order pdf (Bolanovich, John) Modified on 4/6/2022 (matched text to pleading) (KNC).
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Set deadlines: Answer to court interrogatories due by 4/5/2022; Case management report due by 5/30/2022 (KNC)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/22/2022. (IRM)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Marriott International, Inc..(Jones, Cullan)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant may have until and through February 21, 2022, to respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/15/2022. (Kidd, Embry)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset deadlines: for Marriott International, Inc. Response to the Amended Complaint due 2/21/2022. (KNC)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Marriott International, Inc.. (Jones, Cullan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/10/2022. (ALL) ctp
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/9/2022. (ALL)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-0265-WWB-EJK. (SJB)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2022-CA-000163-O filed in State Court on January 6, 2022. (Filing Fee$ 402, Receipt #AFLMDC-19206771) filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Exhibit C - Defendant's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Cullan) Modified on 2/8/2022 to correct docket text(SJB). Modified on 2/8/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bragg et al v. Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Bragg
Represented By: John W. Bolanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Perozo
Represented By: John W. Bolanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Borislava Raynova
Represented By: John W. Bolanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Throneburg
Represented By: John W. Bolanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Millan
Represented By: John W. Bolanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn Siler-Nixon
Represented By: Cullan Edmiston Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?