Jones v. Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cheryl Jones
Defendant: Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. doing business as GE Appliances
Case Number: 6:2022cv00409
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Clarification and/or Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by both parties. (Blanco, Carolina) Modified on 4/22/2022 (RDO).
April 22, 2022 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of New York by both parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Blanco, Carolina) Modified on 4/22/2022 (RDO).
April 22, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO #12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Blanco, Carolina) Modified on 4/22/2022 (RDO).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER denying #20 Motion to Stay. The possibility of the parties filing a motion to transfer is not good cause to stay a case. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/21/2022. (AH)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying without prejudice #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 4/20/2022. (MKH)
April 19, 2022 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Final Transfer Decision by both parties. (Judge, William) Modified on 4/20/2022 (RDO).
April 19, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Harper T. Segui to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19475415 for $150 by Cheryl Jones. (Soffin, Rachel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 4/18/2022. (MKH)
April 18, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolina Yvonne Blanco on behalf of Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. (Blanco, Carolina)
April 18, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Marissa S. Ronk to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19471957 for $150 by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Judge, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
April 18, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Judge, William)
April 18, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Initial Case Order by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Haier US Appliance Holdings Inc. for Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Judge, William) Modified on 4/19/2022 (RDO).
April 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Judge, Jr on behalf of Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. (Judge, William)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. Defendant has failed to comply with the Court's Order #5. Defendant shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/8/2022. (GNB)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Harper Segui and Marissa Ronk to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/1/2022. (GNB) ctp
March 11, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE to counsel Marissa S. Ronk Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KNC) ctp
March 10, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 3/10/2022 by Cheryl Jones as to Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Soffin, Rachel)
March 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action; Related Cases: Yes by Cheryl Jones re #5 Order (Soffin, Rachel) Modified on 3/11/2022 (KNC).
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order by Cheryl Jones. (Soffin, Rachel)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to confer regarding deadlines pertinent to a motion for class certification and advise the Court of agreeable deadlines in their case management report. The deadlines should include a deadline for (1) disclosure of expert reports - class action, plaintiff and defendant; (2) discovery - class action; (3) motion for class certification; (4) response to motion for class certification; and (5) reply to motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/25/2022. (GNB) ctp
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/25/2022. (GNB) ctp
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. (BD)
February 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Harper T. Segui of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:22-cv-00409-PGB-LHP. (APV)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19268977) filed by Cheryl Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Soffin, Rachel) Modified on 2/24/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Jones
Represented By: Jonathan Betten Cohen
Represented By: Rachel Soffin
Represented By: Harper T. Segui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. doing business as GE Appliances
Represented By: William J. Judge, Jr.
Represented By: Carolina Yvonne Blanco
Represented By: Marissa S. Ronk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?