Riley et al v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Tom Riley, Heather Shrum, Gary Ambrose and Sherry Kilburn
Defendant: General Motors LLC and General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 6:2022cv00499
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case-Management Report by General Motors, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
April 28, 2022 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19515292 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney W. Lewis Garrison, Jr.. (Fraxedas, Jason)
April 28, 2022 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19515536 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Taylor C. Bartlett. (Fraxedas, Jason)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/27/2022. (YG)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 and #18 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/19/2022. (CB)
April 18, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Fraxedas, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
April 18, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Taylor C. Bartlett to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Fraxedas, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
April 16, 2022 Filing 16 Remark: Doc. #12 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/11/2022. (EP)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/12/2022. (CB)
April 11, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for John Nadolenco to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19444728 for $150 by General Motors, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
April 9, 2022 Filing 13 Remark: Doc. #9 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/7/2022. (EP)
April 8, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Gary Ambrose, Sherry Kilburn, Tom Riley, Heather Shrum. (Fraxedas, Jason)
April 7, 2022 Reset deadline for General Motors, LLC. Answer due by 6/3/2022. (LDJ)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant may have until and through June 3, 2022, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/7/2022. (Kidd, Embry)
April 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE to counsel John Nadolenco Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ)
April 6, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by General Motors, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by General Motors, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 3/29/22 by Gary Ambrose, Sherry Kilburn, Tom Riley, Heather Shrum as to General Motors, LLC (Fraxedas, Jason) Modified text on 4/6/2022 (LDJ).
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to General Motors, LLC. (RDO)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED Summons by All Plaintiffs. (Fraxedas, Jason) Modified on 3/24/2022 (RDO).
March 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsels Steve Jackson, Taylor C. Bartlett and W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/10/2022. (PML) ctp
March 9, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-0499-RBD-EJK. (SJB)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19320634) filed by Tom Riley, Sherry Kilburn, Gary Ambrose, Heather Shrum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mokwa, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley et al v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Riley
Represented By: Matthew S. Mokwa
Represented By: Jason Richard Fraxedas
Represented By: Steve Jackson
Represented By: Taylor C. Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Shrum
Represented By: Matthew S. Mokwa
Represented By: Jason Richard Fraxedas
Represented By: Steve Jackson
Represented By: Taylor C. Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ambrose
Represented By: Matthew S. Mokwa
Represented By: Jason Richard Fraxedas
Represented By: Steve Jackson
Represented By: Taylor C. Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Kilburn
Represented By: Matthew S. Mokwa
Represented By: Jason Richard Fraxedas
Represented By: Steve Jackson
Represented By: Taylor C. Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: John Nadolenco, I
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?