Rembert v. Dunmar Estates et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Rembert
Defendant: City of Winter Springs, Florida, Dunmar Estates, Dunmar Estates Homeowners Association, Inc., Empire Management Group, Inc., Ferdinandsen Enterprises, Inc., Dunmar Homeowners Association, Ferdinandsen Enterprises, Inc. doing business as World of Homes, City of Winter Springs and City of Winter Springs Code Enforcement Board
Case Number: 6:2022cv00544
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 17 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #16 Notice of Appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (KNC)
May 3, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order dismissing case by Lisa Rembert. Filing fee not paid. (Ford, Roderick)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER directing the Clerk to terminate #8 Motion for Reconsideration in light of #14 Withdrawal of Motion. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/28/2022. (KMS)
April 23, 2022 Filing 14 Corrective NOTICE by Lisa Rembert re #8 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 60 Fed. R. Civ. P. re 4 Order, #5 Order dismissing case, #7 Order on Motion to Reopen Case and MOTION to Vacate 4 Order, #5 Order dismissing case, #7 Order on Motion to Reopen Case , #10 Motion Hearing, #5 Order dismissing case, #7 Order on Motion to Reopen Case (Ford, Roderick) Modified on 4/25/2022 (SPM).
April 23, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of filing Withdrawal of Document #12 Notice of withdrawal of motion by Lisa Rembert. (Ford, Roderick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. Modified on 4/27/2022 (SPM).
April 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Lisa Rembert re #8 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 60 Fed. R. Civ. P. re 4 Order, #5 Order dismissing case, #7 Order on Motion to Reopen Case and MOTION to Vacate 4 Order, #5 Order dismissing case, #7 Order on Motion to Reopen Case filed by Lisa Rembert (Ford, Roderick)
April 14, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #10 Motion Hearing filed by Lisa Rembert. (Ford, Roderick)
April 11, 2022 Filing 10 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza: Motion Hearing held on 4/11/2022 re #8 Motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 60 Fed. R. Civ. P. re 4 Order, #5 Order dismissing case, #7 Order on Motion to Reopen Case and Motion to Vacate 4 Order, #5 Order dismissing case, #7 Order on Motion to Reopen Case filed by Lisa Rembert. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (MEH)
April 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #8 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 60 Fed. R. Civ. P. and MOTION to Vacate. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2022 at 09:45 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. The parties shall call 866-434-5269 five minutes before the hearing is scheduled to begin. Access Code: 4420602. Security Code: 041122. (ALL)
April 7, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 60 Fed. R. Civ. P. re 4 Order , #5 Order dismissing case, #7 Order on Motion to Reopen Case and , MOTION to Vacate 4 Order, #5 Order dismissing case, #7 Order on Motion to Reopen Case by Lisa Rembert. (Ford, Roderick) Modified on 4/8/2022 (SPM).
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Reopen Case. To the extent the Motion requests clarification of the Court's April 6th Order, the Motion is GRANTED. The Motion is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/7/2022. (MEH)
April 6, 2022 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to Reopen Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60 by Lisa Rembert. (Ford, Roderick) Modified on 4/7/2022 (SPM).
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/6/2022. (MEH) ctp
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/18/2022. (MEH) ctp
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/18/2022. (MEH) ctp
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:22-cv-0544-CEM-LHP. (SJB)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19348476) filed by Lisa Rembert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ford, Roderick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rembert v. Dunmar Estates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Rembert
Represented By: Roderick O. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Winter Springs, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunmar Estates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunmar Estates Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Management Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferdinandsen Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunmar Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferdinandsen Enterprises, Inc. doing business as World of Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Winter Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Winter Springs Code Enforcement Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?