McKenzie v. United States Tennis Association Incorporated, et al.
Plaintiff: Kylie McKenzie
Defendant: United States Tennis Association Incorporated, et al., United States Tennis Association Incorporated and USTA Player Development Incorporated
Not Classified By Court: Julie H. O'Kane
Case Number: 6:2022cv00615
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #120 Order to Show Cause, in light of Plaintiff's Response #130. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/13/2023. (MKH)
November 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ENDORSED ORDER granting #129 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Deposing Rafael Font de Mora. The discovery deadline is extended an additional 60 days for the limited purpose of completing the deposition of Rafael Font de Mora. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/12/2023. (ABP)
November 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #120 Order to show cause filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy)
November 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Email Correspondence)(Martin, Meagan)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ENDORSED ORDER granting #127 Motion to Strike. The Clerk is DIRECTED to strike #123 Reply & #124 Reply. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/8/2023. (ABP)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION to Strike Duplicate documents by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated (Martin, Meagan) Modified to change event type on 11/8/2023 (HAI).
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Judkins, Amy)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 REPLY to Response to Motion re #96 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 REPLY to Response to Motion re #96 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion re #98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ENDORSED ORDER granting #121 Joint Motion to Clarify Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order. The ten-page limit for the reply is inclusive of the signature block and certificate of service. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/6/2023. (ABP)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Clarify Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Martin, Meagan)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER to show cause as to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/3/2023. (SFC)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing SEALED DOCUMENT re #116 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Kylie McKenzie (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 108-1 JD Podcast, #2 Exhibit 108-2 JD Coaching Programs, #3 Exhibit 108-3 JD Mentorship PP, #4 Exhibit 108-4 JD Assistant)(Judkins, Amy).
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file exhibits as described in #116 Order by 5:00 P.M. today. Failure to comply will result in the issuance of an order to show cause as to why counsel should not be sanctioned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/3/2023. (SFC)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to Defendant's #96 Motion for Summary Judgment by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted version of Doc. No. 97-4)(Martin, Meagan) Modified text on 11/1/2023 (BD).
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER (and Direction to Clerk of Court) granting #115 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Exhibits to Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and to Substitute Redacted Version of Filed Exhibit. See PDF Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/30/2023. (MKH)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Seal Plaintiff's Exhibits to Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Substitute Redacted Version of Filed Exhibit by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Martin, Meagan)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by William Weber on behalf of USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated (Weber, William)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying without prejudice #111 Plaintiff's Amended Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The 5:00 p.m. on October 25, 2023 deadline for Defendants to move to seal the exhibits stands. See Doc. No. 109, at 3 & n.2. Otherwise, Plaintiff will be directed to immediately file the exhibits on the public docket. See PDF Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/24/2023. (MKH)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 RESPONSE to Motion re #98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Membership)(Shaughnessy, Kevin)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Amended Unopposed MOTION for leave to file DOCUMENT Exhibits 1 through 4 of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment under seal by Kylie McKenzie (Judkins, Amy).Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Plaintiff's SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re #108 Response in Opposition to Motion #109 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Kylie McKenzie (Judkins, Amy).
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part #107 Plaintiff's Motion to Redact and File Under Seal Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall file under seal an unredacted version of her response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by the end of the day today, October 23, 2023. See Doc. No. 64, at 8; Local Rule 3.01(c). It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a renewed motion to seal as it relates to "Exhibits 1 through 4" on or before 5:00 p.m. on October 25, 2023, in full compliance with Local Rule 1.11. See PDF Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/23/2023. (MKH)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #96 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Redacted filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sealed, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sealed, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sealed, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sealed, #5 Exhibit 5 - Shriver Dep., #6 Exhibit 6 - USTA Reporting Hotline Info., #7 Exhibit 7 - Rinaldi Dep., #8 Exhibit 8 - Blackman Email, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter from Congress to USTA, #10 Exhibit 10 - USTA Response to Congress, #11 Exhibit 11 - Spreadsheet of Reported Misconduct)(Judkins, Amy)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file RESPONSE to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment under seal by Kylie McKenzie (Judkins, Amy).Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ENDORSED ORDER granting #105 Joint Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Responses to Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. The parties' respective Responses shall not exceed twenty-five (25) pages, exclusive of case style, signature block, and certificate of service. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/23/2023. (REG)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Joint MOTION to File Excess Pages For Responses to Cross Motions for Summary Judgment by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Notice of Filing SEALED DOCUMENT re #102 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #98 Motion for Summary Judgment, #95 Stipulation by Kylie McKenzie (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 95-16, #2 Exhibit 95-17, #3 Exhibit 95-18, #4 Exhibit 98-9, #5 Exhibit 98-10)(Judkins, Amy).
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated re #100 Order on Motion to Compel (Martin, Meagan)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Second Amended Joint Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Motions for Summary Judgment Under Seal. On or before October 18, 2023, counsel for Plaintiff shall file under seal the exhibits at issue (Doc. Nos. 95-16, 95-17, 95-18, 98-9, 98-10). See PDF Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/11/2023. (MKH)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Joint Second Amended MOTION for leave to file DOCUMENT Exhibits to Motions For Summary Judgment under seal by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated (Shaughnessy, Kevin).Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #79 Motion to Compel Mark McKenzie's Deposition or to Exclude His Testimony at Trial. See PDF Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/4/2023. (MKH)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying without prejudice #94 Amended Joint Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Motions for Summary Judgment Under Seal. The parties shall file a renewed motion within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, which must address each of the issues outlined in this Order and must fully comply with Local Rule 1.11. Failure to file a renewed motion to seal by this deadline will result in an Order that the documents at issue be filed on the public docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/3/2023. (MKH)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) by Kylie McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Judkins, Amy)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated re #96 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Notice of Filing Additional Deposition Transcripts and Documents in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Depo transcript of Kathleen McKenzie, #2 Exhibit Depo transcript of Julia Markey, #3 Exhibit Depo transcript of Monica Applewhite, Ph.D., #4 Exhibit Depo transcript of Sandra Wurtele, Ph.D., #5 Exhibit Excerpts of depo transcript of Jessica Battaglia, #6 Exhibit Depo transcript of Lauren Tracy, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Lauren Tracy, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Heath Phillips)(Shaughnessy, Kevin)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION of Undisputed Facts by Kylie McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tracy Dep., #2 Exhibit 2 - USTA Membership Terms and Conditions, #3 Exhibit 3 - Blackman Dep., #4 Exhibit 4 - 2015 USTA Safe Play Policies, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2017 Safe Play Policies, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2018 Safe Sport Code, #7 Exhibit 7 - Otero Dep., #8 Exhibit 8 - Letter of Employment, #9 Exhibit 9 - Background Check Docs, #10 Exhibit 10 - Aranda SafeSport Training, #11 Exhibit 11 - Plaintiff Dep., #12 Exhibit 12 - Malmqvist Dep., #13 Exhibit 13 - K. Markey Dep., #14 Exhibit 14 - Aranda Suspension Letter, #15 Exhibit 15 -Plaintiff's Resp. RFAs, #16 Exhibit 16 - Jane Doe Dep (Placeholder), #17 Exhibit 17 - USTA Position Description (Placeholder), #18 Exhibit 18 - Doe Employment Information (Placeholder)(Judkins, Amy)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Amende Joint MOTION for leave to file DOCUMENT Exhibits to Summary Judgment Motions under seal by Kylie McKenzie (Judkins, Amy).Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. Modified on 10/3/2023 as to docket text (ARL).
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying without prejudice #92 Joint Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Motions for Summary Judgment Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/2/2023. (MKH)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Joint MOTION for leave to file MOTION For Summary Judgment under seal by Kylie McKenzie (Judkins, Amy).Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
October 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ENDORSED ORDER granting #90 Motion to File Excess Pages. The parties' motions for summary judgment shall not exceed thirty (30) pages, exclusive of the signature block and certificate of service. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/1/2023. (ABP)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Joint MOTION to File Excess Pages by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Compel Mark McKenzie's Deposition or to Exclude His Testimony at Trial filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ENDORSED ORDER to strike re: #87 Plaintiff's Supplemental Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Mark McKenzie's Deposition. The 19-page response does not comply with the Court's September 18, 2023 Order (Doc. No. 85) which afforded each side only 15 pages for the supplemental briefing. Plaintiff may refile a supplemental response that complies with the Court's September 18, 2023 Order by 5:00 p.m. today. This deadline will not be extended. The Court notes this is the second time Plaintiff has failed to comply with Court Orders (see Doc. No. 83). Any further failures to comply with all applicable Court Orders and Local Rules may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 9/29/2023. (ECJ)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Supplemental RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Compel Mark McKenzie's Deposition or to Exclude His Testimony at Trial filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy) Modified on 9/29/2023 (SPM).
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RESPONSE re #85 Order filed by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Mark McKenzie, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Kylie McKenzie, #3 Exhibit C - First Amendment to Pro Management Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Deposition of Dr. Elig)(Shaughnessy, Kevin)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER re #79 Defendants' Motion to Compel Mark McKenzie's Deposition or to Exclude His Testimony at Trial, #84 Amended Response in Opposition. See PDF Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 9/18/2023. (MKH)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Amended RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Compel Mark McKenzie's Deposition or to Exclude His Testimony at Trial filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Judkins, Amy) Modified on 9/18/2023 to edit docket text (AJS).
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ENDORSED ORDER to strike re: #82 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Mark McKenzie's Deposition or Exclude His Testimony at Trial. The Response fails to comply with the 500-word limit in the Standing Order on Discovery Motions. See Doc. No. 17 2. Attempts to evade the 500-word limit by providing short-form citations to cases is not well taken; the Court expects citations to conform with the Bluebook. Footnotes are also included in the 500-word limit. See id. Plaintiff shall refile the response in full compliance with all Local Rules and Court Orders on or before 5:00 p.m. on Monday September 18, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 9/15/2023. (MKH)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STRICKEN per 83 Order- RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Compel Mark McKenzie's Deposition or to Exclude His Testimony at Trial filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Judkins, Amy) Modified on 9/18/2023 to edit docket text (AJS).
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEDIATION report Hearing held on September 11, 2023. Hearing outcome: Impasse. (O'Kane, Julie)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ENDORSED ORDER granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Deposing Rafael Font de Mora. The discovery deadline is extended an additional 60 days for the limited purpose of completing the deposition of Rafael Font de Mora. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/14/2023. (ABP)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Compel Mark McKenzie's Deposition or to Exclude His Testimony at Trial by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition, #2 Exhibit Composite - Agreements, #3 Exhibit Email, #4 Exhibit Deposition of M. McKenzie)(Martin, Meagan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Deposing Rafael Font de Mora by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-Mail)(Martin, Meagan)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #75 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 8/25/2023. (MKH)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #65 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. See PDF Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 8/25/2023. (MKH)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy) Modified relief on 8/25/2023 (AJS).
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re #65 MOTION for Protective Order filed by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Excerpts of Plaintiff's Amended Initial Disclosure (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B. Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Notice of Depo 30(b)(6))(Shaughnessy, Kevin)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re #65 Defendants' MOTION for Protective Order, #68 Response in Opposition. It is ORDERED that on or before 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday August 22, 2023, Defendants shall file a reply brief, not to exceed seven (7) pages in length, addressing the issues raised by Plaintiff's response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 8/16/2023. (MKH)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SEALED DOCUMENT Deposition of Pam Shriver re #69 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Kylie McKenzie (Judkins, Amy).
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #70 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Deposition Transcript Under Seal. This is a duplicate motion. See Doc. No. 67. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 8/16/2023. (MKH)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for leave to file DOCUMENT Deposition Transcript under seal by Kylie McKenzie (Judkins, Amy). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. Modified text on 8/16/2023 (JK).
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #67 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Deposition Transcript Under Seal. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file the deposition transcript (or excerpts thereof) under seal no later than 5:00 p.m. on August 17, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 8/16/2023. (MKH)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Judkins, Amy)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file under seal by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy) Modified text and case event on 8/16/2023 (JK).
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re #65 Defendants' MOTION for Protective Order. The deposition is hereby SUSPENDED pending the Court's ruling on the merits of Defendants' motion, which will issue after Plaintiff's response to the motion is filed. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion as set forth in the Standing Order on Discovery Motions. See Doc. No. 17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 8/11/2023. (MKH)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Protective Order by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Plaintiff's Notice of Taking Deposition, #2 Exhibit B. Declaration of Staciellen Mischel)(Shaughnessy, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/15/2023. Dispositive motions due by 10/2/2023. Pretrial statement due by 1/16/2024. All other motions due by 1/23/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2024 at 03:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Jury Trial set for the March 2024 trial term commencing on 3/4/2024 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/18/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/27/2023. (KM)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #62 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Due to the Court's trial schedule, all respective deadlines will be extended, including the trial date. An amended CMSO is forthcoming. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/26/2023. (ABP)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Affidavit)(Martin, Meagan) Modified text on 7/26/2023 (BD).
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ENDORSED ORDER granting #60 Motion to Appear at Mediation Via Zoom. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/23/2023. (ABP)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to appear at mediation via zoom by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #34 Amended Complaint, by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated.(Martin, Meagan)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Extension of Time for the Parties to Disclose Experts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 4/28/2023. (MKH)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Second MOTION for Extension of Time for the Parties to Disclose Experts by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. Modified on 5/1/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #36 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/24/2023. (ABP)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATED Confidentiality Agreement re #54 Order on Motion to Compel by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration Regarding Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement)(Martin, Meagan) Modified on 4/24/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #46 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents. See PDF Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 4/7/2023. (MKH)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Joint STATUS report by Kylie McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Privilege Log)(Judkins, Amy) Modified on 3/20/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying without prejudice #51 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 3/3/2023. (MKH)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal and Motion to Strike #46 by Kylie McKenzie (Judkins, Amy).Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. Modified on 3/3/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re #46 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents filed by Kylie McKenzie. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, the parties shall meet and confer in person or via videoconference (email communications will not suffice), in a good faith effort to resolve the issues raised by Plaintiff's Motion. On or before expiration of the fourteen (14) day period, the parties shall file a joint status report, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages in length, which must address the requirements set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 3/3/2023. (MKH)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE to Motion re #46 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents filed by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.)(Martin, Meagan)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #47 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. The motion fails to comply with the Court's Order on Discovery Motions (Doc. No. 17). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 2/27/2023. (MKH)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Protective Order by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Appendix)(Martin, Meagan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents by Kylie McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit B - Original Privilege Log, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Privilege Log, #4 Exhibit D - Key Written Communications)(Judkins, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. Modified on 2/23/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 2/16/2023. (MKH)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Amended MOTION for Mark J. boskovich to appear pro hac vice by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. Modified on 2/15/2023to edit docket text(SRD).
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE to counsel Mark J. Boskovich Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Amy Lynn Judkins on behalf of Kylie McKenzie. Lead Counsel: Robert Allard. (Judkins, Amy)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kevin W. Shaughnessy on behalf of USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. Lead Counsel: Kevin W. Shaughnessy. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Local Rule to Plaintiff's and Defendants' counsel 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for the Parties to Disclose Experts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 2/2/2023. (MKH)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For the Parties to Disclose Experts by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy) Modified on 2/2/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Or, In the Alternative, Motion to Strike Certain Allegations and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Or, In the Alternative, Motion to Strike Certain Allegations and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The #34 Second Amended Complaint moots the motion. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/23/2022. (ABP)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Normand, Edmund) Related Document: AMENDED COMPLAINT #24 filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Normand, Edmund) Modified as to docket text and entry relationship on 9/26/2022 (JK).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. The Amended Complaint #24 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before October 5, 2022, Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint consistent with the directives of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/21/2022. (ABP)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #29 Motion to Bifurcate Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 8/18/2022. (ECJ)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss #24 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Certain Allegations filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Martin, Meagan)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's response is due on or before August 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/27/2022. (CHT)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/reset deadlines as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss #24 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Certain Allegations. Responses due by 8/9/2022 (RDO)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Kylie McKenzie. (Judkins, Amy)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss #24 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Certain Allegations by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Membership Terms & Conditions)(Shaughnessy, Kevin) Text modified on 7/6/2022 (RDO).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #22 Motion to Dismiss. See #24 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/22/2022. (CPH)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT & Demand for Jury Trial against USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated with Jury Demand. filed by Kylie McKenzie.(Normand, Edmund)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER for Robert Allard to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/2/2022. (GNB)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint Or, In the Alternative, Motion to Strike Certain Allegations by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Shaughnessy, Kevin) Modified on 6/1/2022 (RDO).
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 5/27/2022. (MKH)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Robert Allard to appear pro hac vice [Amended] by Kylie McKenzie. (Normand, Edmund) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Julie O'Kane appointed as mediator. (RDO)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Lynn Judkins on behalf of Kylie McKenzie (Judkins, Amy)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 2/7/2022. (MKH)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 8/25/2022 Discovery due by 8/1/2023 Dispositive motions due by 9/5/2023 Pretrial statement due by 12/18/2023 All other motions due by 12/26/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/3/2023 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/3/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2024 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron Jury Trial set for 2/5/2024 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/14/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/23/2022. (GNB)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying without prejudice #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 5/9/2022. (MKH)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Robert Allard to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19539670 for $150 by Kylie McKenzie. (Normand, Edmund) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Mark J. Boskovich to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19539649 for $150 by Kylie McKenzie. (Normand, Edmund) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Kylie McKenzie. (Normand, Edmund)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kylie McKenzie. Related case(s): No (Normand, Edmund)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Meagan Leigh Martin on behalf of USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated (Martin, Meagan)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by USTA Player Development Incorporated, United States Tennis Association Incorporated. Related case(s): No (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER of service returned executed on April 1, 2022 by Kylie McKenzie as to United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (Normand, Edmund)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER of service returned executed on April 1, 2022 by Kylie McKenzie as to USTA Player Development Incorporated. (Normand, Edmund)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to USTA Player Development Incorporated and United States Tennis Association Incorporated. (RDO)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/29/2022. (GNB) ctp
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:22-cv-0615-PGB-LHP. (SJB)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Tennis Association Incorporated, et al. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19391268) filed by Kylie McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to USTA Incorporated, #3 Proposed Summons as to USTA Player Development)(Normand, Edmund)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenzie v. United States Tennis Association Incorporated, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylie McKenzie
Represented By: Edmund A. Normand
Represented By: Amy Lynn Judkins
Represented By: Robert Allard
Represented By: Mark John Boskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Tennis Association Incorporated, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Tennis Association Incorporated
Represented By: Kevin W. Shaughnessy
Represented By: Meagan Leigh Martin
Represented By: Erin Michelle Sales
Represented By: William Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USTA Player Development Incorporated
Represented By: Kevin W. Shaughnessy
Represented By: Meagan Leigh Martin
Represented By: Erin Michelle Sales
Represented By: William Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Julie H. O'Kane
Represented By: Julie Hions O'Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?