Securities and Exchange Commission v. Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Synergy Settlement Services, Inc., Foundation for Those With Special Needs, Inc., Special Needs Law Firm, PLLC, Jason D. Lazarus and Anthony F. Prieto, Jr.
Case Number: 6:2022cv00820
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kevin Snell, appearing on behalf of Foundation for Those With Special Needs, Inc., Jason D. Lazarus, Anthony F. Prieto, Jr., Special Needs Law Firm, PLLC, Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL103841.) Modified on 6/10/2022 (LMF).
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement under Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 by Foundation for Those With Special Needs, Inc., Jason D. Lazarus, Anthony F. Prieto, Jr., Special Needs Law Firm, PLLC, Synergy Settlement Services, Inc.. (Bondi, Bradley)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order reset deadlines/hearings: for All Defendants. Responses to Amended Complaint due 8/5/2022. (KNC)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file a response to the Amended Complaint on or before August 5, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/1/2022. (JEB)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kevin Snell, Esq. is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/1/2022. (JEB)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Bondi, Bradley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Kevin Snell to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Thanasides, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Thanasides on behalf of Foundation for Those With Special Needs, Inc., Jason D. Lazarus, Anthony F. Prieto, Jr., Special Needs Law Firm, PLLC, Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (Thanasides, Paul)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Vitaliy Kats on behalf of Foundation for Those With Special Needs, Inc., Jason D. Lazarus, Anthony F. Prieto, Jr., Special Needs Law Firm, PLLC, Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (Kats, Vitaliy)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Bondi on behalf of Foundation for Those With Special Needs, Inc., Jason D. Lazarus, Anthony F. Prieto, Jr., Special Needs Law Firm, PLLC, Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (Bondi, Bradley)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on 05/25/2022 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Anthony F. Prieto, Jr.. (Levenson, Robert)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 05/25/2022 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Jason D. Lazarus. (Levenson, Robert)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 05/25/2022 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Special Needs Law Firm, PLLC. (Levenson, Robert)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on 05/25/2022 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Foundation for Those With Special Needs, Inc.. (Levenson, Robert)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 05/25/2022 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Synergy Settlement Services, Inc.. (Levenson, Robert)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/5/2022. (RMF)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Foundation for Those With Special Needs, Inc., Jason D. Lazarus, Anthony F. Prieto, Jr., Special Needs Law Firm, PLLC, Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (BD)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Levenson, Robert)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 Disclosure Statement by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Levenson, Robert)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:22-cv-0820-WWB-DCI. (SJB)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Levenson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Alice K. Sum
Represented By: Robert K. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Settlement Services, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley J. Bondi
Represented By: Kevin Snell
Represented By: Paul B. Thanasides
Represented By: Vitaliy Kats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation for Those With Special Needs, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley J. Bondi
Represented By: Kevin Snell
Represented By: Paul B. Thanasides
Represented By: Vitaliy Kats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Needs Law Firm, PLLC
Represented By: Bradley J. Bondi
Represented By: Kevin Snell
Represented By: Paul B. Thanasides
Represented By: Vitaliy Kats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason D. Lazarus
Represented By: Bradley J. Bondi
Represented By: Kevin Snell
Represented By: Paul B. Thanasides
Represented By: Vitaliy Kats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony F. Prieto, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley J. Bondi
Represented By: Kevin Snell
Represented By: Paul B. Thanasides
Represented By: Vitaliy Kats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?