Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation v. RxCrossroads, LLC
Plaintiff: Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation
Defendant: RxCrossroads, LLC a foreign corporation doing business as CoverMyMeds, LLC
Case Number: 6:2022cv00880
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Julie O'Kane as mediator by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation. (Downs, Mayanne)
July 7, 2022 Filing 18 AMENDED CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by RxCrossroads, LLC. (Hampton, Caycee) Text modified on 7/8/2022 (RDO).
June 27, 2022 Filing 17 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Julie O'Kane appointed as mediator. (RDO)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 2/7/2022. (BAB)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 8/26/2022 Discovery due by 7/3/2023 Dispositive motions due by 8/1/2023 Pretrial statement due by 11/20/2023 All other motions due by 11/27/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 5/1/2023 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 6/1/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2023 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron Bench Trial set for 1/2/2024 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/17/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/24/2022. (GNB)
June 22, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #11 Amended Complaint by RxCrossroads, LLC.(Hampton, Caycee) Modified on 6/22/2022 (KNC).
June 21, 2022 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Downs, Mayanne)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See #11 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/9/2022. (AH)
June 8, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against RxCrossroads, LLC filed by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation.(Downs, Mayanne) Modified on 6/8/2022 (RDO).
June 2, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Order by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation. (Downs, Mayanne) Modified on 6/3/2022 (RDO).
June 2, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation. Related case(s): No (Downs, Mayanne)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by RxCrossroads, LLC. Related case(s): No (McLeroy, Kathleen)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/19/2022. (GNB)
May 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit 1 by RxCrossroads, LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hampton, Caycee) Text modified on 5/19/2022 (RDO).
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by RxCrossroads, LLC. (McLeroy, Kathleen)
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:22-cv-0880-PGB-LHP. (SJB)
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by RxCrossroads, LLC identifying Corporate Parent McKesson Corporation for RxCrossroads, LLC. (McLeroy, Kathleen) Modified on 5/11/2022 to correct docket text (BD).
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kathleen Schin McLeroy on behalf of RxCrossroads, LLC. Lead Counsel: Kathleen S. McLeroy. (McLeroy, Kathleen) Modified on 5/11/2022 to correct docket text (BD).
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2022-ca-003273 filed in State Court on 04/14/2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19558293 filed by RxCrossroads, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 State Court Record, #4 Exhibit 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(McLeroy, Kathleen) Modified on 5/11/2022 (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation v. RxCrossroads, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Jason Alec Zimmerman
Represented By: Mayanne Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RxCrossroads, LLC a foreign corporation doing business as CoverMyMeds, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Schin McLeroy
Represented By: Caycee Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?