Perez v. Margaritas V&P, Inc.
Plaintiff: Juan Perez
Defendant: Margaritas V&P, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2022cv01133
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Margaritas V&P, Inc. by Juan Perez. (Arcadier, Mauricio) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order. The Order at Doc.#12 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/1/2022. (YG)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (VACATED BY #13 ORDER) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/26/2022. (YG) Modified on 8/2/2022 (RDO).
July 25, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on July 23, 2022 by Juan Perez as to Margaritas V&P, Inc.. (Wood, Joseph)
July 12, 2022 Filing 10 Remark: Docs. #7 and #9 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/12/2022. (EP)
July 11, 2022 Filing 9 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Juan Perez. (Wood, Joseph) Modified text on 7/12/2022 (LDJ).
July 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Juan Perez. Related case(s): No (Wood, Joseph)
July 11, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Juan Perez. (Wood, Joseph)
July 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Juan Perez. Related case(s): No (Wood, Joseph) (BLANK PDF. REFILED AT DOC #8) Modified text on 7/12/2022 (LDJ).
July 1, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Margaritas V&P, Inc. (LDJ)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/1/2022. (YG)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 7/1/2022. (PML)
June 30, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-1133-RBD-EJK. (SJB)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Margaritas V&P, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19725809) filed by Juan Perez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Margaritas V&P, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Perez
Represented By: Joseph C. Wood
Represented By: Mauricio Arcadier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaritas V&P, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?