Southern Oak Insurance Company v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Southern Oak Insurance Company
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Government Employees Insurance Company and Government Employees' Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2022cv01478
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2022 Filing 19 Defendant, Ford Motor Company, ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #17 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(McDonald, Francis)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 11/16/2022 Discovery due by 5/3/2024 Dispositive motions due by 6/4/2024 Pretrial statement due by 10/7/2024 All other motions due by 9/4/2024 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 9/28/2023 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/30/2023 Trial Status Conference set for 10/8/2024 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger Jury Trial set for the November 2024 trial term commencing on 11/4/2024 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/17/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/7/2022. (RMF)
October 2, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company with Jury Demand. filed by Southern Oak Insurance Company.(Barker, Stephen)
September 15, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Government Employees' Insurance Company. (Knapp, David) Modified on 9/16/2022 to edit docket text (KNC).
September 13, 2022 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (McDonald, Francis)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice Government Employees' Insurance Company's (GEICO) #13 Motion to Dismiss for failure to comply with the January 13, 2021 Standing Order, which can be found at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/standing-order-judge-berger-revised-local-rules. GEICO may file an amended motion on or before September 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/12/2022. (ETW)
September 9, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Government Employees' Insurance Company. (Knapp, David)
August 30, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Southern Oak Insurance Company. (Barker, Stephen)
August 30, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Southern Oak Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Barker, Stephen)
August 29, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 4 Order no pdf by Government Employees' Insurance Company. (Knapp, David)
August 29, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Government Employees' Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Knapp, David)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/29/2022. (PML)
August 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ford Motor Company. Related case(s): No (McDonald, Francis)
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ford Motor Company. (McDonald, Francis)
August 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/23/2022. (RMF)
August 19, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(McDonald, Francis) Modified text on 8/22/2022 (SRD).
August 19, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-1478-WWB-EJK. (SJB)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Court for the 9th Judicial Court in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2022-CA-5430-O filed in State Court on 6/15/2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number BFLMDC-19902993 filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - GEICO's Consent to Removal, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 State Court COMPLAINT , #6 State Court Docket Sheet , #7 State Court Other Documents , #8 Civil Cover Sheet (McDonald, Francis) Modified text on 8/22/2022 (SRD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Oak Insurance Company v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Oak Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen L. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Sarah Anne Long
Represented By: Tiffany Marie Ward
Represented By: Francis Morton McDonald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees' Insurance Company
Represented By: David Cyril Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?