United States of America v. Formoso et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Giacinto Formoso, Vita Formoso, Francesca Formoso, Point Cypress Townhomes Homeowner's Association, Inc., Kahama Holdings, LLC, RBC Bank, Del-Air Heating, Air Conditioning & Refrigeration, Inc. and J.C. Formoso
Case Number: 6:2022cv01639
Filed: September 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2022 Filing 16 Remark: Doc. #15 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/2/2022. (Rex, Jennifer)
October 31, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order pdf by Giacinto Formoso, Vita Formoso. (Phillips, A.)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER STRIKING Defendants' Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. #13) for noncompliance. Defendants are DIRECTED to file a complete document with all required sections. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/28/2022. (Rex, Jennifer)
October 27, 2022 Filing 13 (STRICKEN per Endorsed Order 14) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order pdf by Giacinto Formoso, Vita Formoso. (Phillips, A.) Modified text on 10/31/2022 (LDJ).
October 24, 2022 Filing 12 Remark: Doc. #11 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/24/2022. (Rex, Jennifer)
October 21, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order pdf by Francesca Formoso. (Greene, Charles)
October 21, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Francesca Formoso.(Greene, Charles)
October 21, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Giacinto Formoso, Vita Formoso.(Phillips, A.)
September 23, 2022 Filing 8 Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/22/2022. (Rex, Jennifer)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United States of America. (Brownell, Aaron)
September 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Brownell, Aaron)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/13/2022. (ALL)
September 12, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (SRD)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/12/2022. (PML)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-1639-RBD-EJK. (SJB)
September 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Brownell, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Formoso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Aaron Brownell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giacinto Formoso
Represented By: A. Brian Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vita Formoso
Represented By: A. Brian Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesca Formoso
Represented By: Charles M. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Point Cypress Townhomes Homeowner's Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kahama Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del-Air Heating, Air Conditioning & Refrigeration, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Formoso
Represented By: A. Brian Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?