Mescia-Donnelly v. Camp et al
Defendant: James D. Camp, Jr., James D. Camp, III and Nicholas Mescia, III
Petitioner: Valerie Mescia-Donnelly
Respondent: James D Camp, Jr, James D Camp, III, Lawrence Saul Blumberg and Nicholas III Mescia
Case Number: 6:2022cv01758
Filed: September 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to Show Cause as to Valerie Mescia-Donnelly. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE on or before December 5, 2022, why the Complaint against the Defendant(s) should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m). Failure to respond to this Order may result in dismissal of this case as to said Defendant(s) without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/21/2022. (RMF)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Compel ; denying #15 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/1/2022. (MKH)
October 31, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and Discovery Under Federal Rule 37, Rule 26(b)(1) for a Court Order to Probate Court Volusia County Release 378 Confidential Documents by Valerie Mescia-Donnelly. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KNC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
October 31, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Compel Discovery Upon All Defendants Under Local Rules 3.01, 3.03 Disclosure of Documents by Valerie Mescia-Donnelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 25, #25 Exhibit 26, #26 Exhibit 27, #27 Exhibit 28, #28 Exhibit 29, #29 Exhibit 30, #30 Exhibit 30 part 2, #31 Exhibit 30 part 3, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 33 part 2, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52)(KNC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
October 31, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Valerie Mescia-Donnelly.(KNC)
October 17, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE to the Court by Valerie Mescia-Donnelly (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(SRD)
October 6, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/6/2022. (RMF)
October 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE to the Court by Valerie Mescia-Donnelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(AET)
September 26, 2022 Filing 8 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New Case Number: 6:22-cv-1758-WWB-LHP. (RN)
September 26, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 3:22-cv-16589. File received electronically
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The magistrate judge's Report and Recommendation is adopted and incorporated by reference in this Order. The Clerk shall TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and close the case file. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 09/26/2022. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/26/2022.]
August 30, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. That the clerk TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. R&R flag set Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 08/30/2022. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/27/2022. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/26/2022.]
August 16, 2022 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/26/2022.]
August 16, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION to Change Venue, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/26/2022.]
August 15, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Change Venue by VALERIE MESCIA-DONNELLY. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/26/2022.]
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VALERIE MESCIA-DONNELLY. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/26/2022.]
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LAWRENCE SAUL BLUMBERG, JAMES D CAMP, III, JAMES D CAMP, JR, NICHOLAS III MESCIA, filed by VALERIE MESCIA-DONNELLY. (no service copies.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet.) (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 9/26/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mescia-Donnelly v. Camp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Valerie Mescia-Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James D Camp, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James D Camp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lawrence Saul Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nicholas III Mescia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Camp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Camp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Mescia, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?