Hussain et al v. Stadelman et al
Plaintiff: Syed Ibrahim Hussain, Syed Muhammad Baqir Hussain, Syeda Sara Hussain, Brian Guex and Roselene Guex
Defendant: H. James Stadelman, Interval Title Services, Inc., Jonathan Bloom, Khalid Muneer, Jupiter Properties, inc., Jerry Ladelle Sessions, II, Prime International Properties, LLC, Prime International Properties Duval, LLC, Prime International Properties Clay, Inc., Family Medicine and Rehab, Inc. and Syed Sajid Hussain
Case Number: 6:2022cv01886
Filed: October 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying without prejudice #36 Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge Time to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 12/9/2022. (MKH)
December 9, 2022 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in support re #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint filed by Brian Guex, Roselene Guex, Syed Muhammad Baqir Hussain, Syed Ibrahim Hussain, Syeda Sara Hussain. (RPB)
December 9, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Brian Guex, Roselene Guex, Syed Muhammad Baqir Hussain, Syed Ibrahim Hussain, Syeda Sara Hussain. (RPB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying as moot #33 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/30/2022. (MEH)
November 28, 2022 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in support re #33 Motion to MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment as to dismissals filed by Brian Guex, Roselene Guex, Syed Muhammad Baqir Hussain, Syed Ibrahim Hussain, Syeda Sara Hussain. (RN)
November 28, 2022 Filing 33 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment as to dismissals re #30 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Ex Parte Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Brian Guex, Roselene Guex, Syed Muhammad Baqir Hussain, Syed Ibrahim Hussain, Syeda Sara Hussain. (RN)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #31 Emergency Ex-Parte Motion to Serve Court's Order on Emergency Ex-Parte Motion to Reconsider... by E-Service to Plaintiffs and Redirecting of Mailed Copy. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to lift the ex parte seal on the Motion and this Order. The Clerk of Court is further DIRECTED to reflect the address for Plaintiffs Syeda Sara Hussain, Syed Muhammed Baqir Hussain, and Syed Ibrahim Hussain on the public docket.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/22/2022. (ECJ) Modified to remove ex parte restriction on 11/23/2022 (SPM).
November 22, 2022 Filing 31 EXPARTE EMERGENCY MOTION to Serve Court's Order by E-Service to Plaintiffs by Syed Muhammad Baqir Hussain, Syed Ibrahim Hussain, Syeda Sara Hussain. (RN) Modified on 11/22/2022 (RN). Modified to remove ex parte restriction per #32 Order on 11/23/2022 (SPM).
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Dismiss; denying #21 Emergency EXPARTE MOTION to Reconsider Denial of Temporary Restraining Order and Effective Stay; granting #24 Motion to Dismiss. On or before December 9, 2022, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint that addresses the issues set forth in this Order. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. The Clerk is directed to lift the ex parte seal on all documents filed in this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/22/2022. (MEH) Modified to remove ex parte restriction per #30 Order on 11/22/2022. (SPM).
November 22, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Interval Title Services, Inc., H. James Stadelman. Related case(s): Yes (Thakrar, Sheena)
November 22, 2022 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement re #3 Order by H. James Stadelman. (Thakrar, Sheena) Modified on 11/22/2022 (SPM).
November 22, 2022 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement re #3 Order by Interval Title Services, Inc. (Thakrar, Sheena) Modified on 11/22/2022 (SPM).
November 22, 2022 Set deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 12/9/2022 (SPM)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE EX PARTE EMAIL COMMUNICATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/21/2022. (MKH)
November 18, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Extinguishment by Syed Muhammad Baqir Hussain. (RN)
November 18, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Interval Title Services, Inc., H. James Stadelman. (Thakrar, Sheena)
November 18, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheena A. Thakrar on behalf of Interval Title Services, Inc., H. James Stadelman (Thakrar, Sheena)
November 18, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard S. Marks on behalf of Interval Title Services, Inc., H. James Stadelman (Marks, Howard)
November 18, 2022 Filing 21 EMERGENCY EXPARTE MOTION to Reconsider Denial of Temporary Restraining Order and Effective Stay by Syed Ibrahim Hussain. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Attachment A, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(RN) Modified to remove ex parte restriction per #30 Order on 11/22/2022 (SPM).
November 17, 2022 Filing 20 EMERGENCY NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by Syed Ibrahim Hussain (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2a, #4 Exhibit 2b, #5 Exhibit 2c)(RN)
November 16, 2022 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement per Local Rule 3.03 by Roselene Guex. (RPB)
November 16, 2022 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement per Local Rule 3.03 by Brian Guex. (RPB)
November 16, 2022 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement per Local Rule 3.03 by Syeda Sara Hussain. (RPB)
November 16, 2022 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement per Local Rule 3.03 by Syed Muhammad Baqir Hussain. (RPB)
November 16, 2022 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement per Local Rule 3.03 by Syed Ibrahim Hussain. (RPB)
November 16, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Jonathan Bloom. (Gassler, Frank)
November 16, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jonathan Bloom. Related case(s): No by Jonathan Bloom (Gassler, Frank) Modified on 11/18/2022 (SPM).
November 16, 2022 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement per Local Rule 3.03 by Jonathan Bloom. (Gassler, Frank) Modified on 11/18/2022 (SPM).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Emergency Ex-Parte Motion for Doc. 8 to Be Either Posted on Pacer or Sent by Email to Plaintiffs, to the extent that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to email a copy of the Court's November 9, 2022 Order (Doc. No. 8) to Plaintiffs at the email addresses listed in the motion (Doc. No. 10). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/14/2022. (MKH) Modified to remove ex parte restriction per #30 Order on 11/22/2022 (SPM).
November 11, 2022 Filing 10 EMERGENCY EXPARTE MOTION for Doc. 8 to Be Either Posted on PCER or Sent by Email to Plaintiffs by Syed Muhammad Baqir Hussain, Syed Ibrahim Hussain, Syeda Sara Hussain. (RPB) Modified to remove ex parte restriction per #30 Order on 11/22/2022 (SPM).
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 EXPARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Show Cause, Stay of Execution on Writ of Possession, and Order to Rapidly Locate and Serve Mr. Sessions, #8 Order of Referral. The request for the United States Marshal to serve Defendant Sessions will be DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/10/2022. (MKH)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER referring in part and denying in part #7 Emergency EXPARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Show Cause, Stay of Execution on Writ of Possession, and Order to Rapidly Locate and Serve Mr. Sessions. To the extent the Motion requests that the U.S. Marshal serve Defendant Jerry Sessions, it is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for consideration. The Motion is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/9/2022. (MEH) Modified to remove ex parte restriction per #30 Order on 11/22/2022 (SPM).
November 9, 2022 Filing 7 Emergency EXPARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Show Cause, Stay of Execution on Writ of Possession, and Order to Rapidly Locate and Serve Mr. Sessions by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(RPB) Modified to remove ex parte restriction per #30 Order on 11/22/2022 (SPM).
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Initial Order Dated October 14, 2022, to the extent that Plaintiffs' deadline to comply with the Court's Initial Order re: Case Management and Deadlines (Doc. No. 3) is extended up to and including November 16, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/28/2022. (MKH)
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion to Extend Time to Comply with #3 Initial Order re: Case Management and Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SRD).
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/14/2022. (MEH)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/14/2022. (MEH)
October 14, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Jonathan Bloom, Family Medicine and Rehab, Inc., Syed Sajid Hussain, Interval Title Services, Inc., Jupiter Properties, inc., Khalid Muneer, Prime International Properties Clay, Inc., Prime International Properties Duval, LLC, Prime International Properties, LLC, Jerry Ladelle Sessions, III, H. James Stadelman. (SPM)
October 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand Filing fee $402, receipt number ORL105524 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SPM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussain et al v. Stadelman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syed Ibrahim Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syed Muhammad Baqir Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syeda Sara Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Guex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roselene Guex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. James Stadelman
Represented By: Howard S. Marks
Represented By: Sheena A. Thakrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interval Title Services, Inc.
Represented By: Howard S. Marks
Represented By: Sheena A. Thakrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Bloom
Represented By: Frank H. Gassler
Represented By: Lee Delton Gunn V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khalid Muneer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jupiter Properties, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Ladelle Sessions, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime International Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime International Properties Duval, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime International Properties Clay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Medicine and Rehab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syed Sajid Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?