Domingo v. Hilton Resorts Corporation
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Domingo
Defendant: Hilton Resorts Corporation, American Express Company, First American Title Insurance Company and Hilton Resorts Corporation doing business as Hilton Grand Vacations
Case Number: 6:2023cv00143
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant American Express Company. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk is directed to terminate American Express Company as a Defendant in this matter and amend the case style accordingly. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/7/2023. (RMF)
March 7, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Dismissal of Claims against Defendant American Express Company by Elizabeth A. Domingo (Howlette, Jordan) Modified on 3/7/2023 to edit docket text (KNC).
March 5, 2023 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 2/17/2023 by Elizabeth A. Domingo as to Hilton Resorts Corporation. (Howlette, Jordan)
March 5, 2023 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 1/31/2023 by Elizabeth A. Domingo as to American Express Company. (Howlette, Jordan)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Plaintiff's Notice Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant First American Title Insurance Company filed by Elizabeth A. Domingo. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk is directed to terminate First American Title Insurance Company as a Defendant in this matter and amend the case style accordingly. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/23/2023. (RMF)
February 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal of Claims against Defendant First American Title Insurance Company by Elizabeth A. Domingo (Howlette, Jordan) Modified on 2/14/2023 to edit docket text (KNC).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remove Filing at Docket No. 1-5 from ECF. The Clerk is directed to delete Doc. 1-5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/10/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
February 8, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Remove Dkt. No. 1-5 from ECF System by Elizabeth A. Domingo. (Howlette, Jordan)
February 8, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Elizabeth A. Domingo. (Howlette, Jordan)
February 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/8/2023. (RMF)
January 30, 2023 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Express Company, First American Title Insurance Company, Hilton Resorts Corporation with Jury Demand. filed by Elizabeth A. Domingo. (Attachments: #1 Timeshare Agreement, #2 Promissory Note, #3 HGV Form Cancellation Notice, #4 Domingo's Cancellation Notice, #5 AMEX Closure Notice, #6 Objection to Trustee Foreclosure)(Howlette, Jordan) Modified on 1/31/2023 to edit docket text (KNC).
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Amended Complaint #4 is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before February 13, 2023, to correct the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to timely file an amended pleading in compliance with this Order may result in dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/30/2023. (RMF)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
January 28, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Express Company, First American Title Insurance Company, Hilton Resorts Corporation with Jury Demand. filed by Elizabeth A. Domingo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Timeshare Agreement, #2 Exhibit Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit Email with Disclosure Documents, #4 Exhibit Cancellation Notice, #5 Exhibit Domingo's Cancellation Notice, #6 Exhibit AMEX Closure Notice, #7 Exhibit Notice of Trustee Foreclosure, #8 Exhibit Objection to Trustee Foreclosure)(Howlette, Jordan)
January 27, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (KNC)
January 27, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:23-cv-0143-WWB-DCI. (SJB)
January 27, 2023 REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number BFLMDC-20444698 refunded in the amount of $ $402.00 paid to Jordan Howlette.. (NLC)
January 27, 2023 REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-20444698 refunded in the amount of $402.00 paid to Jordan Howlette. Filing fee paid receipt AFLMDC-20444589. (JSR)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Express Company, First American Title Insurance Company, Hilton Resorts Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20444589) filed by Elizabeth A. Domingo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Defendant Hilton, #3 Proposed Summons for Defendant AMEX, #4 Proposed Summons for Defendant First American, # **removed per Order** (5) Exhibit Timeshare agreement, #6 Exhibit Promissory Note, #7 Exhibit Email with Disclosure Documents, #8 Exhibit Cancellation Notice, #9 Exhibit Domingo's Cancellation Notice, #10 Exhibit AMEX Closure Notice, #11 Exhibit Notice of Trustee Foreclosure, #12 Exhibit Objection to Trustee Foreclosure)(Howlette, Jordan) Modified on 1/27/2023 to edit docket text (KNC). Modified on 1/27/2023 to correct docket text (SJB). Modified on 2/10/2023 (KNC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Domingo v. Hilton Resorts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Domingo
Represented By: Jordan David Howlette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Resorts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Resorts Corporation doing business as Hilton Grand Vacations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?