Powers et al v. Health First Inc.
Plaintiff: Laura Powers and Christina Rosean
Defendant: Health First Inc. and Health First, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2023cv00375
Filed: March 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Paul G Byron
2 Judge: Robert M Norway
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0025 Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Nicholas Romanello to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/3/2023. (GNB)
March 30, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Nicholas Romanello of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD)
March 29, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER of service returned executed on 03/29/2023 by Laura Powers, Christina Rosean as to Health First, Inc. (Byrd, Tucker) Modified on 3/30/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
March 15, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Robert Stephen Berry on behalf of Laura Powers, Christina Rosean. Lead Counsel: Robert Stephen Berry. (Berry, Robert)
March 14, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Robert Stephen Berry and Ronald G. Meyer of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD)
March 14, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Laura Powers, Christina Rosean. (Berry, Robert)
March 9, 2023 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:23-cv-375-PGB-RMN. Magistrate Judge David A. Baker no longer assigned to the case. (RPB)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Provided, counsel shall register for and use the Court's electronic filing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/7/2023. (Baker, David)
March 6, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Robert Stephen Berry to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20578220 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Byrd, Tucker) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
March 6, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Laura Powers, Christina Rosean. Related case(s): Yes (Byrd, Tucker)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER re #6 Initial Order. The parties are DIRECTED to confer regarding deadlines pertinent to a motion for class certification and advise the Court of agreeable deadlines in their case management report. The deadlines should include a deadline for (1) disclosure of expert reports - class action, plaintiff and defendant; (2) discovery - class action; (3) motion for class certification; (4) response to motion for class certification; and (5) reply to motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/6/2023. (GNB)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/6/2023. (GNB)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/3/2023. (ECJ)
March 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Tucker H. Byrd of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD)
March 2, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Health First, Inc. (SRD)
March 1, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. New case number: 6:23-cv-0375-PGB-DAB. (SJB)
March 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Health First Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20561056) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Byrd, Tucker)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers et al v. Health First Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Powers
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Robert Stephen Berry
Represented By: Ronald G. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Rosean
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Robert Stephen Berry
Represented By: Ronald G. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health First Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health First, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Romanello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?