Transamerica Life Insurance Company v. White et al
Plaintiff: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Lawrence E. White, Partnership Management Services Group, LLC and PMSG, LLC
Case Number: 6:2023cv00452
Filed: March 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
2 Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Agreed Second Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must respond to the Complaint by 5/17/2023. No further extension of this deadline should be sought absent extraordinary good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 5/11/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
May 9, 2023 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Partnership Management Services Group, LLC, Lawrence E. White. (D'Aniello, Phil) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
April 24, 2023 Filing 20 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Partnership Management Services Group, LLC, Lawrence E. White identifying Other Affiliate LWT96 Trust, Other Affiliate JHT96 Trust for Lawrence E. White, Partnership Management Services Group, LLC.. (D'Aniello, Phil)
April 24, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE by Transamerica Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, Partial Voluntary Dismissal (Lerner, Joshua)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). PARTIES PREVIOUSLY COMPLIED WITH DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS AND RELATED ACTION STATEMENTS REQUIREMENTS. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/17/2023. (KM)
April 17, 2023 Filing 17 Case Reassigned to Judge Anne C. Conway. New case number: 6:23-cv-452-ACC-DCI. Judge Carlos E. Mendoza no longer assigned to the case. (RPB) Modified on 4/18/2023 to edit docket text (BCB).
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER- It is ORDERED that this case is transferred to the Honorable Anne C. Conway, with her consent, for consideration with Case No. 6:20-cv-2258-ACC-GJK. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/17/2023. (MEH)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must respond to the Complaint by 5/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 4/11/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
April 7, 2023 Filing 14 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to May 12, 2023, to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Partnership Management Services Group, LLC, Lawrence E. White. (D'Aniello, Phil) Modified on 4/10/2023 (SPM).
April 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Partnership Management Services Group, LLC, Lawrence E. White. Related case(s): No (D'Aniello, Phil) Modified on 4/10/2023 (SPM).
April 7, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Partnership Management Services Group, LLC, Lawrence E. White. (D'Aniello, Phil)
April 7, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Phil A. D'Aniello on behalf of Partnership Management Services Group, LLC, Lawrence E. White (D'Aniello, Phil)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida is currently operating in a Judicial Emergency due to a judicial vacancy and the number of cases in the division. Accordingly, civil cases, and especially newly filed civil cases, will be the Court's lowest priority unless emergency issues are presented. Counsel and the parties are encouraged to consider consenting to the Magistrate Judge for the entire case or disposition of any dispositive motions in order to have their case considered on a more timely basis. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/3/2023. (MEH)
March 29, 2023 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement re #5 Order by Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AEGON N.V. for Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Kerbel, Jessica) Modified on 3/30/2023 (SPM).
March 29, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Kerbel, Jessica) Modified on 3/30/2023 (SPM).
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/15/2023. (MEH)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/15/2023. (MEH)
March 14, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (LMW)
March 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Joshua Dodek Lerner on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Joshua D. Lerner. (Lerner, Joshua)
March 13, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:23-cv-0452-CEM-DCI. (SJB)
March 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20604783) filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trust Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Substitution of Trustee, #3 Exhibit C - Letter dated January 22, 2020, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Judgment, #5 Proposed Summons to Lawrence E. White, #6 Proposed Summons to PMSG, LLC, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lerner, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transamerica Life Insurance Company v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Dodek Lerner
Represented By: Jessica S. Kerbel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence E. White
Represented By: Phil A. D'Aniello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partnership Management Services Group, LLC
Represented By: Phil A. D'Aniello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMSG, LLC
Represented By: Phil A. D'Aniello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?