Secure Mi Vote Committee et al v. Let the Voters Decide, LLC
Plaintiff: SECURE MI VOTE COMMITTEE LIBERTY INITIATIVE FUND, Secure Mi Vote Committee and Liberty Initiative Fund
Defendant: LET THE VOTERS DECIDE, LLC and Let the Voters Decide, LLC.
Not Classified By Court: Jeffrey Colbath
Case Number: 6:2023cv00612
Filed: April 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re #51 Joint Notice of Settlement. All pending motions are denied as moot and all deadlines and hearings are terminated. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/12/2023. (ALL)
September 11, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of settlement by Liberty Initiative Fund, Secure Mi Vote Committee (Shaw, Jonathan)
July 18, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Liberty Initiative Fund, Secure Mi Vote Committee. Related case(s): No (Shaw, Jonathan) (Modified on 7/19/2023, to edit text) (BGR).
July 17, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on March 18, 2024 at 9 a.m. before Judge Jeffrey Colbath. (Shaw, Jonathan)
July 17, 2023 Filing 48 ***COUNSEL: PLEASE REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT "NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION"*** NOTICE by Liberty Initiative Fund, Secure Mi Vote Committee re #47 Notice of lis pendens amended (Shaw, Jonathan) Modified text on 7/18/2023 (KME).
July 17, 2023 Filing 47 ***COUNSEL: PLEASE REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT "NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION"*** NOTICE of lis pendens by Liberty Initiative Fund, Secure Mi Vote Committee (Shaw, Jonathan) Modified text on 7/18/2023 (KME).
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that on or before July 28, 2023, the Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions to comply with the Court's Order (Doc. #8). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/14/2023. (ALL)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING Defendant's motion to file a reply (Doc. #44). The Court requires no further briefing at this time. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/14/2023. (EP)
July 13, 2023 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Brief by Let the Voters Decide, LLC. (Shepherd, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. Modified on 7/14/2023 to edit text(ABC).
July 10, 2023 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Liberty Initiative Fund, Secure Mi Vote Committee. (Shaw, Jonathan)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 2/7/2022. (MKH)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED ORDER granting #38 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to the motion to dismiss is extended up to and including July 10, 2023. Counsel is reminded that Local Rule 3.01(a) applies to all motions (with a few noted exceptions). Any future motions that do not comply with all applicable rules will be summarily denied and/or stricken. Moreover, any future requests for extensions of deadlines must provide good cause, merely stating that "there is no prejudice" will not suffice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 6/21/2023. (ECJ)
June 20, 2023 Filing 39 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Mediator: Jeffrey Colbath (KNC)
June 20, 2023 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Liberty Initiative Fund, Secure Mi Vote Committee. (Sarelson, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/18/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 8/18/2023. Discovery due by 3/4/2024. Dispositive motions due by 4/3/2024. Pretrial statement due by 8/8/2024. All other motions due by 7/25/2024. Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 1/3/2024. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/2/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for 9/3/2024 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/18/2024. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/16/2023. (RPB)
June 5, 2023 Filing 36 Unopposed REQUEST for oral argument re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Let the Voters Decide, LLC.. (Shepherd, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
June 5, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Let the Voters Decide, LLC. (Shepherd, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. Modified on 6/6/2023 to edit docket text (KNC).
June 5, 2023 Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Shaw, Jonathan)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 6/1/2023. (MKH)
June 1, 2023 Filing 32 **ENTERED IN ERROR** NOTICE TO COUNSEL Anna Hayes Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KNC) Modified on 6/1/2023 to edit docket text (KNC).
May 31, 2023 Filing 31 Remark: Doc. #27 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/31/2023. (EP)
May 31, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Hayes on behalf of Let the Voters Decide, LLC. (Hayes, Anna)
May 31, 2023 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for David C. Kully to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20891704 for $150 by Let the Voters Decide, LLC. (Shepherd, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. Modified on 6/1/2023 to edit docket text (KNC).
May 31, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by William Newton Shepherd on behalf of Let the Voters Decide, LLC. Lead Counsel: William N. Shepherd. (Shepherd, William) Modified on 6/1/2023 to edit docket text (KNC).
May 30, 2023 Filing 27 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Let the Voters Decide, LLC. (Shepherd, William) Modified on 5/31/2023 to edit docket text (KNC).
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 It is ORDERED that attorney Josiah Contarino is DIRECTED to register for CM/ECF no later than Wednesday, May 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/3/2023. (ALL)
May 3, 2023 Filing 25 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Let the Voters Decide, LLC. with Jury Demand. filed by Secure Mi Vote Committee, Liberty Initiative Fund.(Sarelson, Matthew) Modified on 5/3/2023 to edit docket text (KNC).
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file the proposed second amended complaint as a separate docket entry on or before May 9, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 5/2/2023. (MKH)
May 2, 2023 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Amend First Amended Complaint by Liberty Initiative Fund, Secure Mi Vote Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shaw, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
April 24, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by William Newton Shepherd on behalf of Let the Voters Decide, LLC. (Shepherd, William)
April 24, 2023 Filing 20 WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/24/2023 by Let the Voters Decide, LLC. as to Let the Voters Decide, LLC.. (Shepherd, William)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 4/24/2023. (MKH)
April 19, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Josiah Contarino to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20742900 for $150 by Liberty Initiative Fund, Secure Mi Vote Committee. (Shaw, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
April 19, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Michael A. Columbo to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20742866 for $150 by Liberty Initiative Fund, Secure Mi Vote Committee. (Shaw, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
April 14, 2023 Filing 14 Remark: Doc. #12 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/13/2023. (EP)
April 12, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Let the Voters Decide, LLC. with Jury Demand. filed by Secure Mi Vote Committee, Liberty Initiative Fund.(Sarelson, Matthew)
April 12, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Liberty Initiative Fund, Secure Mi Vote Committee. (Sarelson, Matthew)
April 12, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew Seth Sarelson on behalf of Liberty Initiative Fund, Secure Mi Vote Committee. Lead Counsel: Jonathan M. Shaw. (Sarelson, Matthew)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Monday, April 24, 2023, Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint correcting the deficiencies identified in this Order. Failure to timely file will result in this action being closed without further notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/10/2023. (ALL)
April 10, 2023 Set deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 4/24/2023 (KNC)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 4/6/2023. (MKH)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/5/2023. (ALL)
April 5, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Jonathan M. Shaw to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20693427 for $150 by Liberty Initiative Fund, Secure Mi Vote Committee. (Sarelson, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
April 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Mathew S. Sarelson, Jacob William Roth, Jonathan M. Shaw, Michael A. Columbo, Josiah Contarino of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LMW)
April 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jonathan M. Shaw, Michael A. Columbo, Josiah Contarino Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LMW)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER TO STRIKE Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 Disclosure Statement (Doc. 2). The filing fails to comply with the amended disclosure form, which went into effect December 1, 2022. https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/forms/all/civil-forms. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove Doc. 2 from the docket and Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a compliant form by Wednesday, April 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/5/2023. (EP)
April 4, 2023 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:23-cv-00612-RBD-LHP. (ER)
April 3, 2023 Filing 2 ****DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER 4***CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Secure Mi Vote Committee and Liberty Initiative Fund. (Sarelson, Matthew) Modified on 4/5/2023 to remove and strike the entry (RPB). Modified on 4/5/2023 to edit docket text(LMW).
April 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Let the Voters Decide, LLC. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20683157) filed by Secure Mi Vote Committee and Liberty Initiative Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sarelson, Matthew) Modified on 4/5/2023 to edit docket text(LMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Secure Mi Vote Committee et al v. Let the Voters Decide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURE MI VOTE COMMITTEE LIBERTY INITIATIVE FUND
Represented By: Matthew Seth Sarelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secure Mi Vote Committee
Represented By: Jonathan Mark Shaw
Represented By: Jacob Roth
Represented By: Josiah Contarino
Represented By: Michael A. Columbo
Represented By: Matthew Seth Sarelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Initiative Fund
Represented By: Matthew Seth Sarelson
Represented By: Jonathan Mark Shaw
Represented By: Jacob Roth
Represented By: Josiah Contarino
Represented By: Michael A. Columbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LET THE VOTERS DECIDE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Let the Voters Decide, LLC.
Represented By: Anna Hayes
Represented By: William Newton Shepherd
Represented By: David C. Kully
Represented By: Jeffrey Schacknow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jeffrey Colbath
Represented By: Jeffrey Colbath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?