Willoughby et al v. Oppenheimer & Co., Inc.
Petitioner: Jerry Willoughby, Victor Hooper, John Disosway, Sylvia Majani, Robyn Roberts and Kelly Hooper
Respondent: Oppenheimer & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 6:2023cv00850
Filed: May 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0009 Motion to confirm arbitration award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close this case re #25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/14/2023. (MEH)
June 7, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by John Disosway, Kelly Hooper, Victor Hooper, Sylvia Majani, Robyn Roberts, Jerry Willoughby (Kuglar, Craig)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- The parties shall SHOW CAUSE as to why these cases should not be consolidated pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). Show Cause Response is due on or before June 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/6/2023. (MEH)
June 2, 2023 Filing 23 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested Persons Order, by John Disosway, Kelly Hooper, Victor Hooper, Sylvia Majani, Robyn Roberts, Jerry Willoughby. (Kuglar, Craig) Modified on 6/2/2023 (SPM).
June 1, 2023 Set deadlines as to #2 Corrected MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award . Responses due by 6/13/2023 (SPM)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #1 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award in light of #2 Corrected Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/1/2023. (VLC)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant may have until and through June 13, 2023, to files its response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/1/2023. (Kidd, Embry)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida is currently operating in a Judicial Emergency due to a judicial vacancy and the number of cases in the division. Accordingly, civil cases, and especially newly filed civil cases, will be the Court's lowest priority unless emergency issues are presented. Counsel and the parties are encouraged to consider consenting to the Magistrate Judge for the entire case or disposition of any dispositive motions in order to have their case considered on a more timely basis. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/1/2023. (MEH)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/1/2023. (MEH)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/1/2023. (MEH)
May 30, 2023 Filing 17 Case Reassigned to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. New case number: 6:23-cv-850-CEM-EJK. Judge John Antoon II no longer assigned to the case. (RPB)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable District Judge Carlos E. Mendoza, with his consent, for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/30/2023. (KM)
May 28, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Oppenheimer & Co., Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Roldan Cora, Javier) Modified on 5/30/2023 to edit docket text (BCB).
May 28, 2023 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Corrected) by Oppenheimer & Co., Inc. (Roldan Cora, Javier) Modified on 5/30/2023 to edit docket text (BCB).
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/19/2023. (AS)
May 18, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested Persons Order, by John Disosway, Kelly Hooper, Victor Hooper, Sylvia Majani, Robyn Roberts, Jerry Willoughby. (Wolper, Matthew)
May 18, 2023 Filing 11 PROOF of service by John Disosway, Kelly Hooper, Victor Hooper, Sylvia Majani, Robyn Roberts, Jerry Willoughby (Wolper, Matthew)
May 18, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by John Disosway, Kelly Hooper, Victor Hooper, Sylvia Majani, Robyn Roberts, Jerry Willoughby. Related case(s): Yes (Wolper, Matthew)
May 18, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Craig H. Kuglar to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20850243 for $150 by John Disosway, Kelly Hooper, Victor Hooper, Sylvia Majani, Robyn Roberts, Jerry Willoughby. (Wolper, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
May 10, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Oppenheimer & Co., Inc. (BCB)
May 10, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Matthew E. Wolper, Craig H. Kuglar of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCB)
May 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Craig H. Kuglar Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCB)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/10/2023. (KM)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/10/2023. (JOR)
May 9, 2023 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:23-cv-850-JA-EJK. (ARC)
May 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Corrected) by John Disosway, Kelly Hooper, Victor Hooper, Sylvia Majani, Robyn Roberts, Jerry Willoughby. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Brief in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolper, Matthew)
May 8, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Kelly Hooper, Jerry Willoughby, Sylvia Majani, John Disosway, Victor Hooper, Robyn Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Brief in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Wolper, Matthew) Modified on 5/10/2023 to edit docket text (BCB). Modified on 5/18/2023 to edit docket text (BCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willoughby et al v. Oppenheimer & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerry Willoughby
Represented By: Matthew Wolper
Represented By: Craig H. Kuglar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor Hooper
Represented By: Matthew Wolper
Represented By: Craig H. Kuglar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Disosway
Represented By: Matthew Wolper
Represented By: Craig H. Kuglar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sylvia Majani
Represented By: Matthew Wolper
Represented By: Craig H. Kuglar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robyn Roberts
Represented By: Matthew Wolper
Represented By: Craig H. Kuglar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kelly Hooper
Represented By: Matthew Wolper
Represented By: Craig H. Kuglar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Oppenheimer & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?