Doe v. VGW Malta Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: VGW MALTA LTD, VGW LUCKYLAND, INC. and VGW Malta Ltd.
Case Number: 6:2023cv01360
Filed: July 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Deceptive Trade Practices
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Unopposed Motion to Accept Corrected Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/11/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Correct #32 Reply to Response to Motion and replace with attached corrected Reply by VGW Luckyland, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Reply, #2 Affidavit Corrected declaration) (Pittenger, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 Amended MOTION to Set Aside Judgment partial default judgment by state court filed by VGW Luckyland, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of VGW (support of set-aside))(Pittenger, Thomas) Modified on 8/30/2023 to edit the docket text (RPB).
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 Amended MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd. (Pittenger, Thomas) Modified on 8/30/2023 to edit the docket text (RPB).
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of VGW)(Pittenger, Thomas)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically To Be Allowed To Appear In Case Anonymously Under Pseudonym filed by VGW Luckyland, Inc. (Pittenger, Thomas)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Reply; granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Reply. On or before 8/30/2023, Defendants may file five page replies in support of the #14 Motion to Set Aside Partial Default Entered by State Court and #15 Amended Motion to Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Claims and Stay Proceedings, or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/25/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of #15 Motion to Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Claims and Stay Proceedings, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss VGW Malta Ltd. by VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd.. (Pittenger, Thomas) Modified text on 8/25/2023 (BD).
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Reply in Support of #14 Amended Motion to Set Aside Partial Default Entered by State Court by VGW Luckyland, Inc.. (Pittenger, Thomas) Modified text on 8/24/2023 (BD).
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 Amended MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Luckyland, #2 Exhibit B - Part of Chumba, #3 Exhibit B - Part of Chumba, #4 Exhibit C - Table, #5 Exhibit D - Table)(Wells, Dennis) (Modified on 8/24/2023 to edit docket text) (JDR).
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Amended MOTION to Set Aside partial default by state court filed by John Doe. (Wells, Dennis) (Modified on 8/23/2023 to edit docket text) (JDR).
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails, Letters, Fed Ex Confirm, #2 Exhibit Copy - Ch 74-382)(Wells, Dennis)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #20 Order to show cause, filed by John Doe. (Wells, Dennis) Modified to edit docket text on 8/18/2023 (HAI).
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically To Be Allowed To Appear In Case Anonymously Under Pseudonym by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of "John Doe", #2 Exhibit A - C)(Wells, Dennis) Modified on 8/15/2023 (CTR).
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before August 17, 2023, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why he should not be required to file an amended pleading using his full name in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 10(a). Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/11/2023. (RMF)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for Clarification and Renewed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the pending motions (Docs. #14 and #15) is 8/23/2023. If a party seeks an extended deadline, it must state the date of the existing deadline and the proposed extended deadline. A failure to do so will result in the denial of the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/7/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
August 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response To Defendants' Motions (Doc. 14, 15) by John Doe. (Wells, Dennis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report. The Motion does not state good cause or a legal basis to stay indefinitely the deadline at issue, in effect providing a total stay of this case and discovery. The deadline to file the Case Management Report is extended 45 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/4/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report and Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions [ECF Docs. 14, 15] (Joined in by Plaintiff and Defendants) by All Defendants. (Pittenger, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Amended MOTION to Compel Arbitration by VGW LUCKYLAND, INC., VGW MALTA LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. of M. Thunder in support of compelling arbitration)(Pittenger, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Amended MOTION to Set Aside Judgment partial default judgment by state court by VGW LUCKYLAND, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Affidavit Decl. of M. Thunder in Support of Mot. to Set Aside)(Pittenger, Thomas) Modified on 7/27/2023 as to docket text (ARL).
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment partial default judgment by state court by VGW LUCKYLAND, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Affidavit Decl. of M. Thunder in Support of Mot. to Set Aside)(Pittenger, Thomas) Modified on 7/27/2023 as to docket text (ARL).
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Claims and Stay Proceedings, or, in the alternative, to Dismiss VGW Malta Ltd. by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Thunder in Support of Arbitration)(Pittenger, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/26/2023. (RMF)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Gregory D. Beaman and Behnam Dayanim are granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/24/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Behnam Dayanim to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21071777 for $150 by All Defendants. (Pittenger, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Gregory D. Beaman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21071691 for $150 by All Defendants. (Pittenger, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by VGW LUCKYLAND, INC., VGW MALTA LTD. Related case(s): No (Pittenger, Thomas)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by VGW LUCKYLAND, INC., VGW MALTA LTD. (Pittenger, Thomas)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Thomas Todd Pittenger on behalf of VGW LUCKYLAND, INC., VGW MALTA LTD. Lead Counsel: T. Todd Pittenger. (Pittenger, Thomas)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:23-cv-1360-WWB-DCI. (ARC)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL with consent of all defendants from Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, Seminole County, case number 2023CA002760 filed in State Court on 05/03/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21058201 filed by VGW LUCKYLAND, INC., VGW MALTA LTD. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Removal)(Pittenger, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. VGW Malta Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Dennis F. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW MALTA LTD
Represented By: Thomas Todd Pittenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW LUCKYLAND, INC.
Represented By: Thomas Todd Pittenger
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Represented By: Gregory D. Beaman
Represented By: Kelly J. H. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Malta Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas Todd Pittenger
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Represented By: Gregory D. Beaman
Represented By: Kelly J. H. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?