Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. v. US Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education and The White House Office of Management and Budget
Case Number: 6:2023cv01515
Filed: August 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Filing 25 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The White House Office of Management and Budget, U.S. Department of Education.(Sowell, Robert)
October 4, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Martha Astor of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
October 4, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Martha Astor on behalf of Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. Lead Counsel: Martha A. Astor. (Astor, Martha)
October 4, 2023 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Answer due by 10/5/2023. (ARL)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants may have until and through October 5, 2023, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 10/3/2023. (Kidd, Embry)
September 29, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Martha Astor and Donald Albert Daugherty, Jr. of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
September 28, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by The White House Office of Management and Budget, U.S. Department of Education. Related case(s): Yes. (Sowell, Robert) Modified text on 9/29/2023 (GL).
September 28, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The White House Office of Management and Budget, U.S. Department of Education. (Sowell, Robert) Modified text on 9/29/2023 (GL).
September 20, 2023 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Sowell, Robert)
September 8, 2023 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 8/17/2023 by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. as to U.S. Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Mailing)(Astor, Martha) Modified on 9/8/2023 (SPM).
August 24, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. Related case(s): No (Astor, Martha) Modified text on 8/24/2023 (MCB).
August 24, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. for Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. (Astor, Martha) Modified text on 8/24/2023 (MCB).
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Special Admission of Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/17/2023. (RMN)
August 16, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of motion re #7 Motion to Appearfiled by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. (Astor, Martha)
August 16, 2023 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. (Astor, Martha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Amended Motion for Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying as moot #7 Motion for Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court expects attorneys seeking admission to practice before it to be familiar with and to follow all of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules. See Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(D). Despite certifying his knowledge of these rules, Attorney Daugherty's Motion does not comply with the signature requirements set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(a). Additionally, counsel should review Local Rule 1.08 for the Court's formatting requirements for motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/16/2023. (RMN)
August 15, 2023 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.. (Astor, Martha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 15, 2023 Filing 7 First MOTION for Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21148431 for $150 by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. (Astor, Martha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/10/2023. (JOR)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/10/2023. (KM)
August 10, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to The White House Office of Management and Budget, U.S. Department of Education. (RLK)
August 9, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JG)
August 9, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:23-cv-01515-PGB-EJK. (JG)
August 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21129445) filed by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 All Exhibits)(Astor, Martha) Modified to edit docket text on 8/10/2023 (RLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. v. US Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Albert Daugherty, Jr.
Represented By: Martha Astor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Represented By: Robert Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The White House Office of Management and Budget
Represented By: Robert Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?