Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. v. US Department of Education
Plaintiff: Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.
Defendant: US Department of Education
Case Number: 6:2023cv01695
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint or, Alternatively, to Transfer Case filed by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Astor, Martha)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #14 Motion for Extension of Time, in light of the #15 Notice of Withdrawal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 10/24/2023. (Kidd, Embry)
October 24, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of motion re #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Replyfiled by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. (Astor, Martha)
October 22, 2023 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint or, Alternatively, to Transfer Case by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.. (Astor, Martha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
October 11, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint or, Alternatively, to Transfer Case by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Sowell, Robert)
October 11, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Martha Astor on behalf of Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. Lead Counsel: Martha A. Astor. (Astor, Martha) Modified on 10/11/2023 (CTR).
September 18, 2023 Filing 11 PROOF of service as to US Department of Education by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(Astor, Martha) Modified text on 9/25/2023 (LNR).
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/11/2023. (ALL)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Special Admission of Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/6/2023. (RMN)
September 6, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to US Department of Education. (ABC)
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 Remark: Doc. #5 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/6/2023. (JWG)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/6/2023. (JOR)
September 5, 2023 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. for Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc... (Astor, Martha)
September 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Astor, Martha)
September 5, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21217009 for $150 by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.. (Astor, Martha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
September 5, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:23-cv-1695-RBD-EJK. (ARC)
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21213759) filed by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibits A-1 through B-4)(Astor, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. v. US Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.
Represented By: Martha Astor
Represented By: Donald Albert Daugherty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Education
Represented By: Robert Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?