Hopkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dignorah Hopkins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2023cv02257
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. To facilitate the prompt disposition of this case by the Court, the parties are ORDERED to prepare and file any Brief as contemplated by Rules 6, 7, and 8 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) in the format as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 1/19/2024. (MKH)
January 19, 2024 Filing 12 SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix)(King, Katauna)
January 19, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Commissioner of Social Security. Related case(s): No (King, Katauna)
January 19, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Commissioner of Social Security. (King, Katauna)
January 19, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Katauna King on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Lead Counsel: Katauna J. King. (King, Katauna)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dignorah Hopkins. (Boyd, Bradley)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Dignorah Hopkins. Related case(s): No (Boyd, Bradley)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/28/2023. (MKH)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE: Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) became effective on December 1, 2022. The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules also apply to this proceeding except to the extent they are inconsistent with the supplemental rules. The Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases entered on December 7, 2021, no longer applies. The parties must review the supplemental rules to determine the governing deadlines, including the deadline to file the plaintiff's brief, the Commissioner's brief, and the plaintiff's reply brief. (CTR)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:23-cv-02257-LHP. (TRF)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bradley K. Boyd on behalf of Dignorah Hopkins. Lead Counsel: Bradley K Boyd. (Boyd, Bradley)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Dignorah Hopkins. (Boyd, Bradley)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. The plaintiff CONSENTS to jurisdiction of the United States magistrate judge filed by Dignorah Hopkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyd, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dignorah Hopkins
Represented By: Bradley K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Katauna King
Represented By: Nadine DeLuca Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?