Bonilla et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carlos Bonilla and Claribel Figueroa
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Julie Walbroel
Case Number: 6:2023cv02289
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 2/7/2022. (MKH)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2024 Joinder of Parties due by 3/20/2024 Discovery due by 11/29/2024 Dispositive motions due by 12/31/2024 Pretrial statement due by 5/5/2025 All other motions due by 5/5/2025 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 10/1/2024 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/31/2024 Trial Status Conference set for 5/15/2025 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza Jury Trial set for the June 2025 trial term in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/13/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/19/2024. (MEH)
December 22, 2023 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rodriguez, Melissa)
December 14, 2023 Filing 15 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Keller, Thomas) Modified text on 12/14/2023 (GL).
December 8, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Thomas A. Keller on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Thomas A. Keller. (Keller, Thomas)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Marie Rodriguez on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Company (Rodriguez, Melissa)
December 5, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Order by Carlos Bonilla, Claribel Figueroa. (Thompson, Kai)
December 5, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Carlos Bonilla, Claribel Figueroa. Related case(s): Yes (Thompson, Kai)
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kai Phillip Thompson on behalf of Carlos Bonilla, Claribel Figueroa (Thompson, Kai)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida is currently operating in a Judicial Emergency due to a judicial vacancy and the number of cases in the division. Accordingly, civil cases, and especially newly filed civil cases, will be the Court's lowest priority unless emergency issues are presented. Counsel and the parties are encouraged to consider consenting to the Magistrate Judge for the entire case or disposition of any dispositive motions in order to have their case considered on a more timely basis. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/5/2023. (MEH)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/5/2023. (MEH)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/5/2023. (MEH)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended up to and including December 18, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 12/5/2023. (MKH)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal (to Plaintiff's Complaint) by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Keller, Thomas)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Keller, Thomas)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Keller, Thomas)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:23-cv-02289-CEM-LHP. (AM)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit, case number 2023-CA-016593-O filed in State Court on 11/6/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21508174 filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Composite Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonilla et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Bonilla
Represented By: Julianna Layne Weiss
Represented By: Kai Phillip Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claribel Figueroa
Represented By: Julianna Layne Weiss
Represented By: Kai Phillip Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas A. Keller
Represented By: Melissa Marie Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Julie Walbroel
Represented By: Julie E. Walbroel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?