Anderson Place Construction, LLC v. Regions Bank et al
Plaintiff: Anderson Place Construction, LLC
Defendant: Regions Bank and Primes Construction, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Bradford D. Kimbro
Case Number: 6:2023cv02346
Filed: December 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 9/5/24 09:00 before Bradford D. Kimbro.(Rubinstein, Craig)
January 31, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Regions Bank. (Hatchette, Mya)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2024. Discovery due by 12/2/2024. Dispositive motions due by 1/6/2025. Pretrial statement due by 4/21/2025. All other motions due by 4/28/2025. Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 10/1/2024. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 11/1/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2025 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Jury Trial set for the trial term commencing on 6/2/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/16/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/19/2024. (KM)
January 16, 2024 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rubinstein, Craig)
January 9, 2024 Filing 22 SUMMONS issued as to Primes Construction, LLC. (BGR)
January 9, 2024 Filing 21 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Anderson Place Construction, LLC. (Rubinstein, Craig)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Regions Bank may have until and through January 31, 2024, to respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/8/2024. (Kidd, Embry)
January 8, 2024 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #17 Amended Complaint by Regions Bank. (Hatchette, Mya) (Modified on 1/9/2024, to edit text) (BGR).
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss. See #17 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/3/2024. (ABP)
January 3, 2024 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Anderson Place Construction, LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal . (Rubinstein, Craig) Modified text on 1/3/2024 (LSS).
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Regions Bank. Related case(s): Yes (Hatchette, Mya)
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Anderson Place Construction, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Rubinstein, Craig)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Regions Bank. (Hatchette, Mya)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Regions Bank. (Hatchette, Mya)
December 19, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Anderson Place Construction, LLC. (Rubinstein, Craig)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Regions Bank. Related case(s): Yes (Hatchette, Mya) Modified text on 12/18/2023 (KME).
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Craig Alan Rubinstein on behalf of Anderson Place Construction, LLC. Lead Counsel: Craig A. Rubinstein. (Rubinstein, Craig)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/12/2023. (JOR)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Mya M. Hatchette on behalf of Regions Bank. Lead Counsel: MYA M. HATCHETTE. (Hatchette, Mya)
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Civil Cover Sheet & Docket from Orange Circuit Court, case number 2023-CA-016405-O filed in State Court on 11/16/2023. filed by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet)(Hatchette, Mya) Modified on 12/11/2023 (CTR).
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Mya M. Hatchette and Craig Alan Rubinstein of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Mya M. Hatchette of Local Rule 1.06(b), which requires a copy of the state court docket sheet. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Mya M. Hatchette that Form JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet is required for the Clerk of Court to initiate a civil docket sheet. File the Civil Cover Sheet in this action using the Notice (Other) event. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/8/2023. (KM)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:23-cv-2346-PGB-EJK. (ARC)
December 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 9th Judicial Circuit, Orange County, FL, case number 2023-CA-016405-O filed in State Court on October 30, 2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21540432 filed by Regions Bank.(Hatchette, Mya) Modified on 12/8/2023 to edit docket text (AJS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson Place Construction, LLC v. Regions Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anderson Place Construction, LLC
Represented By: Craig Alan Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: Mya M. Hatchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primes Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Bradford D. Kimbro
Represented By: Bradford D. Kimbro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?