Wesley Financial Group, LLC v. Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Financial Group, LLC
Defendant: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC and Diamond Resorts Management, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2023cv02361
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2024 Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bennett, John)
February 2, 2024 Filing 30 REQUEST for oral argument re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Polidora, Roxane)
February 2, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION to Stay re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Pending the Court's Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Polidora, Roxane) Modified docket text on 2/5/2024 (JTM).
February 2, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Polidora, Roxane)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Stacie O. Kinser and Roxanne A. Polidora are granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/19/2024. (Irick, Daniel)
January 18, 2024 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Roxane A. Polidora to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. BFLMDC-21673325 for $150 by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 18, 2024 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Stacie O. Kinser to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21672504 for $150 by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Patrick A. Bradford is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/16/2024. (Irick, Daniel)
January 12, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Patrick A. Bradford to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21654216 for $150 by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (Mascia, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 10, 2024 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Wesley Financial Group, LLC.(Bennett, John)
January 2, 2024 Filing 21 RETURN of service executed on 12/13/2023 by Wesley Financial Group, LLC as to Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Bennett, John)
January 2, 2024 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on 12/13/2023 by Wesley Financial Group, LLC as to Diamond Resorts Management, Inc. (Bennett, John)
January 2, 2024 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on 12/13/2023 by Wesley Financial Group, LLC as to Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC. (Bennett, John)
January 2, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Susana Cristina Garcia on behalf of Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC (Garcia, Susana)
December 29, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Aaron Backman on behalf of Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC (Backman, Jeffrey)
December 28, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Epstein on behalf of Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC (Epstein, Richard)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by 1/10/2024. Defendants must respond to the amended complaint by 2/9/2024. In the meantime, Defendants' obligation to respond to the original complaint is stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/28/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
December 28, 2023 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due by 1/10/2024. Defendant's Answer to Amended Complaint due by 2/9/2024. (JTM).
December 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Taub, Roy)
December 27, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Order by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company, Other Affiliate Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. for Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC; Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Management & Exchange Holding Company, Other Affiliate Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. for Diamond Resorts Management, Inc.. (Taub, Roy)
December 27, 2023 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines -- (1) Plaintiff's deadline to file an amended complaint; (2) Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint pending the filing of the amended complaint; and (3) Defendants' time to respond to the forthcoming amended complaint by All Defendants by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Taub, Roy)
December 27, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (Bennett, John)
December 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. Related case(s): No (Bennett, John)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida is currently operating in a Judicial Emergency due to a judicial vacancy and the number of cases in the division. Accordingly, civil cases, and especially newly filed civil cases, will be the Court's lowest priority unless emergency issues are presented. Counsel and the parties are encouraged to consider consenting to the Magistrate Judge for the entire case or disposition of any dispositive motions in order to have their case considered on a more timely basis. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/13/2023. (MEH)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/13/2023. (MEH)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/13/2023. (MEH)
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John Joseph Bennett on behalf of Wesley Financial Group, LLC. Lead Counsel: John J. Bennett. (Bennett, John)
December 12, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (KME)
December 12, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO Plaintiff counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KME)
December 11, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:23-cv-2361-CEM-DCI. (AA)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Management, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21545280) filed by Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bennett, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesley Financial Group, LLC v. Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Bennett
Represented By: Patrick A. Bradford
Represented By: Paul Nicholas Mascia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Roy Taub
Represented By: Susana Cristina Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Roxane A Polidora
Represented By: Stacie O Kinser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Roy Taub
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Susana Cristina Garcia
Represented By: Roxane A Polidora
Represented By: Stacie O Kinser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Management, Inc.
Represented By: Susana Cristina Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Roy Taub
Represented By: Roxane A Polidora
Represented By: Stacie O Kinser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?