Campbell v. Mid-Florida Pathology, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Shericia Campbell
Defendant: Mid-Florida Pathology, LLC., Strategic Business Outsourcing, LLC. and Oleksandr Onushko
Case Number: 6:2023cv02362
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: By 2/16/2024 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 4/5/2024 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 3/8/2024; Settlement Report due by 4/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 1/26/2024. (MKH)
January 26, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Kristine Jones on behalf of Mid-Florida Pathology, LLC., Oleksandr Onushko, Strategic Business Outsourcing, LLC. (Jones, Megan)
January 22, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of consent to join by Shericia Campbell of Opt-in Plaintiff Sky Bettridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Sky Bettridge)(Storch, Noah)
January 22, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of consent to join by Shericia Campbell of Opt-in Plaintiff Mireya Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Mireya Smith)(Storch, Noah)
January 22, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of consent to join by Shericia Campbell of Opt-in Plaintiff April Vistad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff April Vistad)(Storch, Noah)
January 22, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of consent to join by Shericia Campbell of Opt-inPlaintiff Tiffany Backhus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join of Opt-in Plaintiff Tiffany Backhus)(Storch, Noah)
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on December 15, 2023 by Shericia Campbell as to Strategic Business Outsourcing, LLC.. (Storch, Noah)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on December 15, 2023 by Shericia Campbell as to Mid-Florida Pathology, LLC.. (Storch, Noah)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on December 15, 2023 by Shericia Campbell as to Oleksandr Onushko. (Storch, Noah)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Shericia Campbell. Related case(s): Yes (Storch, Noah)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FLSA ORDER OF REFERENCE- This case is hereby referred to the Magistrate Judge for issuance of the FLSA Scheduling Order and management of the deadlines set forth therein. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/13/2023. (MEH)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida is currently operating in a Judicial Emergency due to a judicial vacancy and the number of cases in the division. Accordingly, civil cases, and especially newly filed civil cases, will be the Court's lowest priority unless emergency issues are presented. Counsel and the parties are encouraged to consider consenting to the Magistrate Judge for the entire case or disposition of any dispositive motions in order to have their case considered on a more timely basis. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/13/2023. (MEH)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/13/2023. (MEH)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/13/2023. (MEH) (MEH).
December 11, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Oleksandr Onushko. (BGR)
December 11, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Strategic Business Outsourcing, LLC. (BGR)
December 11, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Mid-Florida Pathology, LLC. (BGR)
December 11, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:23-cv-02362-CEM-LHP. (AM)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21545330) filed by Shericia Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Storch, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Mid-Florida Pathology, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shericia Campbell
Represented By: Noah E. Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Florida Pathology, LLC.
Represented By: Megan Kristine Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Business Outsourcing, LLC.
Represented By: Megan Kristine Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oleksandr Onushko
Represented By: Megan Kristine Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?