Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company et al v. Triton Management LLC
Plaintiff: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2100289
Defendant: Triton Management, LLC
Case Number: 6:2024cv00003
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Robert M Norway
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice provided counsel shall register for and use the Court's electronic filing system. Counsel can register for a CM/ECF login password through the website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under "CM/ECF." Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 2/29/2024. (JBS)
February 29, 2024 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Michail Z. Hack to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21818589 for $150 by Triton Management, LLC. (Dabdoub, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway.
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice provided counsel shall register for and use the Court's electronic filing system. Counsel can register for a CM/ECF login password through the website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under "CM/ECF." Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 2/29/2024. (JBS)
February 28, 2024 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Evan S. Schwartz to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21816284 for $150 by Triton Management, LLC. (Dabdoub, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway.
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #13 and #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motions fail to comply with Local Rule 2.01(c)'s requirement to list each case in state or federal court in Florida in which the lawyer has initially appeared in the last thirty-six months and Local Rule 1.08's typography requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 2/28/2024. (JBS)
February 28, 2024 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Michail Z. Hack to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21814829 for $150 by Triton Management, LLC. (Dabdoub, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway.
February 28, 2024 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Evan S. Schwartz to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21814771 for $150 by Triton Management, LLC. (Dabdoub, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway.
February 23, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2100289, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company of Acceptance of Service by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Confirmation)(Dmiszewicki, Aaron)
February 21, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Philip Dabdoub on behalf of Triton Management, LLC (Dabdoub, Edward)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2100289, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Related case(s): No (Dmiszewicki, Aaron)
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2100289, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Dmiszewicki, Aaron) Modified on 1/12/2024 to edit text (ELM).
January 4, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Triton Management, LLC. (JTM)
January 4, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Aaron Michael Dmiszewicki on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2100289, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Lead Counsel: Charles S. Davant. (Dmiszewicki, Aaron)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida is currently operating in a Judicial Emergency due to a judicial vacancy and the number of cases in the division. Accordingly, civil cases, and especially newly filed civil cases, will be the Court's lowest priority unless emergency issues are presented. Counsel and the parties are encouraged to consider consenting to the Magistrate Judge for the entire case or disposition of any dispositive motions in order to have their case considered on a more timely basis. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/4/2024. (MEH)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/4/2024. (MEH)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/4/2024. (MEH)
January 2, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-00003-CEM-RMN. (TRF)
January 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Triton Management LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21613519) filed by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2100289. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Report of Marine Casualty, #3 Exhibit Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit Claim Notification, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davant, Charles) Modified docket on 1/4/2024 (JTM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company et al v. Triton Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Aaron Michael Dmiszewicki
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2100289
Represented By: Aaron Michael Dmiszewicki
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triton Management, LLC
Represented By: Edward Philip Dabdoub
Represented By: Evan S. Schwartz
Represented By: Michail Z. Hack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?