Wilson v. Tupperware Brands Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Sean Wilson
Defendant: Tupperware Brands Corp., Miguel Fernandez, Cassandra Harris, Mariela Matute, Susan M. Cameron, Meg Crofton, Deborah G. Ellinger, James H. Fordyce, Richard Gouis, Pamela J. Harbour, Timothy Minges, Christopher D. O'Leary, Richard T. Riley and M. Anne Szostak
Case Number: 6:2024cv00109
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
2 Judge: Embry J Kidd
3 Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Motion to Stay. The matter is STAYED until the close of discovery in Edge v. Tupperware (6:22-cv-1518) currently scheduled for October 31, 2024. At that time, the parties shall have 14 days to notify the Court as to whether the Stay should be lifted or extended. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/11/2024. (Dalton, Jr., Roy)
March 8, 2024 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Stay And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law by Susan M. Cameron, Meg Crofton, Deborah G. Ellinger, Miguel Fernandez, James H. Fordyce, Richard Gouis, Pamela J. Harbour, Cassandra Harris, Mariela Matute, Timothy Minges, Christopher D. O'Leary, Richard T. Riley, M. Anne Szostak, Tupperware Brands Corp. (Ross, Ian) Modified on 3/11/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
February 29, 2024 Filing 32 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-109-RBD-LHP. Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd no longer assigned to the case. (RPB)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable Leslie Hoffman Price for all further proceedings, pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a)(2)(A). Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/28/2024. (RMN)
February 26, 2024 Filing 30 Remark: Doc. #28 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/26/2024. (JWG)
February 23, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Susan M. Cameron, Meg Crofton, Deborah G. Ellinger, Miguel Fernandez, James H. Fordyce, Richard Gouis, Pamela J. Harbour, Cassandra Harris, Mariela Matute, Timothy Minges, Christopher D. O'Leary, Richard T. Riley, M. Anne Szostak, Tupperware Brands Corp.. Related case(s): Yes (Ross, Ian)
February 23, 2024 Filing 28 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Susan M. Cameron, Meg Crofton, Deborah G. Ellinger, Miguel Fernandez, James H. Fordyce, Richard Gouis, Pamela J. Harbour, Cassandra Harris, Mariela Matute, Timothy Minges, Christopher D. O'Leary, Richard T. Riley, M. Anne Szostak, Tupperware Brands Corp.. (Ross, Ian)
February 23, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian M. Ross on behalf of Susan M. Cameron, Meg Crofton, Deborah G. Ellinger, Miguel Fernandez, James H. Fordyce, Richard Gouis, Pamela J. Harbour, Cassandra Harris, Mariela Matute, Timothy Minges, Christopher D. O'Leary, Richard T. Riley, M. Anne Szostak, Tupperware Brands Corp. (Ross, Ian)
February 22, 2024 Filing 26 Remark: Doc. #25 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/22/2024. (JWG)
February 21, 2024 Filing 25 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sean Wilson. (Cook, William)
February 21, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sean Wilson. Related case(s): Yes (Cook, William)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Special Admission of Justin Kuehn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/20/2024. (RMN)
February 14, 2024 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Justin A. Kuehn to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21769509 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Cook, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that on or before February 26, 2024, the Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement and a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions to comply with the Court's Order (Doc. #6). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/12/2024. (ALL)
February 2, 2024 Filing 20 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to Tupperware Brands Corp.. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 19 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to Timothy Minges. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 18 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to Susan M. Cameron. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 17 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to Richard T. Riley. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 16 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to Richard Gouis. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 15 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to Pamela J. Harbour. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to Miguel Fernandez. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to Meg Crofton. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to Mariela Matute. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to M. Anne Szostak. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to James H. Fordyce. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to Deborah G. Ellinger. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to Christopher D. O'Leary. (Cook, William)
February 2, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/23/2024 by Sean Wilson as to Cassandra Harris. (Cook, William)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/25/2024. (ALL)
January 23, 2024 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. New case number: 6:24-cv-109-RBD-EJK. Judge Anne C. Conway no longer assigned to the case. (RN)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable District Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a)(2)(A). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/23/2024. (KLD)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/19/2024. (JOR)
January 18, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-109-ACC-EJK. (RLK)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21670581) filed by Sean Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cook, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Tupperware Brands Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Wilson
Represented By: William J. Cook
Represented By: Justin Aaron Kuehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tupperware Brands Corp.
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Fernandez
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Harris
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariela Matute
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. Cameron
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meg Crofton
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah G. Ellinger
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Fordyce
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gouis
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela J. Harbour
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Minges
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. O'Leary
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard T. Riley
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Anne Szostak
Represented By: Ian M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?