Ruzsa v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Istvan Ruzsa
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2024cv00322
Filed: February 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
2 Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 4, 2024. (DAD)
March 18, 2024 Filing 22 Case Reassigned to District Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 6:24-cv-322-JSS-EJK. Judge Wendy W. Berger no longer assigned to the case. (RMF)
March 11, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing by Istvan Ruzsa. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AJS)
March 6, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively, motion for summary judgment for failure to exhaust administrative remedies by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosanna Mapp)(Smith, Rylan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
March 5, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE by Istvan Ruzsa (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(ARL)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/1/2024. (ADH)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/28/2024. (RMF)
February 22, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing by Istvan Ruzsa. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(ELM)
February 20, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing by Istvan Ruzsa (Attachments: #1 USDC DC docket sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope)(AJS)
February 20, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Istvan Ruzsa. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (Received in USDC, DC on 1/22/2024)(AJS)
February 20, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing by Istvan Ruzsa (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(Received in USDC, DC on 1/17/2024)(AJS)
February 20, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing by Istvan Ruzsa (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(Received in USDC, DC on 1/17/2024)(AJS)
February 20, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing by Istvan Ruzsa (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (Received in USDC, DC on 1/8/2024)(AJS)
February 13, 2024 Filing 9 TRANSFER IN from the District of Columbia. Case assigned to District Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embery J. Kidd. New Case Number: 6:24-cv-322-WWB-EJK. (RN)
February 13, 2024 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:23-cv-03552. File received electronically
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the USDC for the Middle District of Florida. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 1/7/2024. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 12/18/2023. (zrtw) [Transferred from dcd on 2/13/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystle S. McMullan on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (McMullan, Krystle) [Transferred from dcd on 2/13/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Order by ISTVAN RUZSA. (zdp) [Transferred from dcd on 2/13/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by ISTVAN RUZSA (zdp) [Transferred from dcd on 2/13/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 NEW Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by ISTVAN RUZSA (zdp) [Transferred from dcd on 2/13/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ISTVAN RUZSA. (zdp) [Transferred from dcd on 2/13/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY with Jury Demand filed by ISTVAN RUZSA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice and Consent, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(zdp) [Transferred from dcd on 2/13/2024.]
November 27, 2023 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/27/2023. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zdp) [Transferred from dcd on 2/13/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruzsa v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Istvan Ruzsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Krystle S. McMullan
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Rylan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?