Orlando Health, Inc. v. HKS Architects, Inc.
Plaintiff: Orlando Health, Inc.
Defendant: HKS ARCHITECTS, INC. and BBM Structural Engineers, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2024cv00693
Filed: April 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE re #10 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Orlando Health, Inc.. (Springhart, Jeremy)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against BBM Structural Engineers, Inc. filed by HKS Architects, Inc..(Burns, Jessica)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by HKS Architects, Inc.. (Burns, Jessica)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Defendant shall file a Disclosure Statement no later than May 28, 2024. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/21/2024. (EK)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by HKS Architects, Inc..(Hornreich, Michael)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed on 4/23/2024 by Orlando Health, Inc. as to HKS Architects, Inc. (Springhart, Jeremy) (Modified on 4/25/2024, to edit text) (BGR).
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to HKS Architects, Inc. (ELM)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 7 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/17/2024. (KLD)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Orlando Health, Inc.. (Springhart, Jeremy)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Orlando Health, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Orlando Health, Inc. for Orlando Health, Inc. (Springhart, Jeremy) Modified on 4/18/2024 to edit docket text (CRB).
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jeremy Trace Springhart on behalf of Orlando Health, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Jeremy Springhart. (Springhart, Jeremy)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-21977508 refunded in the amount of $ $405.00 paid to Jeremy Springhart.. (NLC)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jeremy Trace Springhart of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-693-JA-LHP. (ARL)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HKS Architects, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21977635) filed by Orlando Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Springhart, Jeremy) Modified to edit docket text on 4/15/2024 (EVK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orlando Health, Inc. v. HKS Architects, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Health, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Trace Springhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HKS ARCHITECTS, INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Hornreich
Represented By: Jessica Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBM Structural Engineers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?