Padowitz v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Pierce Padowitz
Defendant: United States of America and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2024cv00715
Filed: April 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan I. Rotstein of Documents Filed by Pierce Padowitz. (Rotstein, Jonathan)
June 10, 2024 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan I. Rotstein by Pierce Padowitz. (Rotstein, Jonathan)
June 10, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration by Pierce Padowitz. (Rotstein, Jonathan)
June 10, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) Related case(s): No by Pierce Padowitz (Rotstein, Jonathan) Modified text on 6/10/2024 (HAI).
June 10, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Pierce Padowitz. (Rotstein, Jonathan)
May 29, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Any motion for reconsideration must be filed within fourteen days of this order, comply with all Local Rules, and include the following: a certification that the lead attorney has personally read the Court's Initial Order and the Local Rules cited therein; an explanation for why the deadline was missed; and as separate docket entries, all missing filings. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/28/2024. (MEH)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
April 18, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America. (ARL)
April 18, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jonathan Isaac Rotstein on behalf of Pierce Padowitz. Lead Counsel: Jonathan I. Rotstein. (Rotstein, Jonathan)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/18/2024. (MEH)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/18/2024. (MEH)
April 17, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jonathan Isaac Rotstein of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
April 17, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-715-CEM-DCI. (AJS)
April 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21990514) filed by Pierce Padowitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit Notice of Claim, #4 Proposed Summons Atty General, #5 Proposed Summons National Tort, #6 Proposed Summons US Attorney)(Rotstein, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padowitz v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierce Padowitz
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?