Loveira v. Plaisted
Plaintiff: Francisco Javier Loveira
Defendant: Mitchel Alan Plaisted
Other: Gregory P Miles
Case Number: 6:2024cv00719
Filed: April 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to strike re: #17 Defendant Mitchel Alan Plaisted's Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/29/2024. (ADH)
May 28, 2024 Filing 17 STRICKEN PER ORDER 18. NOTICE by Mitchel Alan Plaisted Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Kessenich, John) Modified on 5/30/2024 (HAI).
May 21, 2024 Filing 16 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Greg Miles appointed as mediator. (AKC)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2024 ; Joinder of Parties due by 9/11/2024 ; Discovery due by 6/23/2025 ; Dispositive motions due by 8/1/2025 ; Pretrial statement due by 10/15/2025 ; All other motions due by 11/14/2025; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 4/1/2025; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 5/1/2025 ; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2025 at 01:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Jury Trial set for the trial term which commences on for 1/5/2026 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/2/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/21/2024. (AKC)
May 20, 2024 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Snure, Tyler)
May 17, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Mitchel Alan Plaisted.(Kessenich, John)
May 6, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested Persons Order by Francisco Javier Loveira. (Snure, Tyler)
May 6, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Francisco Javier Loveira. Related case(s): Yes (Snure, Tyler)
May 6, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Clarke Snure on behalf of Francisco Javier Loveira (Snure, Tyler)
May 6, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
May 3, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Mitchel Alan Plaisted. Related case(s): Yes. (Kessenich, John) Modified text on 5/6/2024 (GL).
May 3, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Mitchel Alan Plaisted. (Kessenich, John)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Shana Manuel to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within 30 days. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/19/2024. (AKC)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CASE ORDER for both Plaintiff and Defendant. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement and Notice of Pendency of Other Actions due within 14 days. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/19/2024. (AKC)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/19/2024. (JOR)
April 18, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Shana Manuel of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RLK)
April 18, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-719-GAP-EJK. (RLK)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2024-CA-002193-O filed in State Court on 3/13/24. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21997543 filed by Mitchel Alan Plaisted. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit 1 - Summons, Complaint, Return of Service & State Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit 2 - Seaman v. CVS, #7 Exhibit 3 - Martinez-Lopez v. Bowden, #8 Exhibit 4 - Owenby v. Maynard)(Kessenich, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loveira v. Plaisted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Javier Loveira
Represented By: Tyler Clarke Snure
Represented By: Shana Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchel Alan Plaisted
Represented By: Andrew Jarrad Hensch
Represented By: John Norman Kessenich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Gregory P Miles
Represented By: Gregory Palmer Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?