Medina v. Valdez
Plaintiff: Anthony Medina
Defendant: Jorge A. Valdez and Jorge Valdez
Other: Alan S. Apte
Case Number: 6:2024cv00727
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert M Norway
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2024 Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2024 Discovery due by 1/6/2025 Dispositive motions due by 2/3/2025 Pretrial statement due by 5/27/2025 All other motions due by 5/29/2025 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 10/1/2024 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/18/2024 Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2025 at 02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 6 C before Judge Julie S. Sneed Jury Trial set for 7/1/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 C before Judge Julie S. Sneed. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/16/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 5/30/2024. (GNB)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER STRIKING [21-1] stipulation. The parties may reach their own agreement regarding the designation of materials as "confidential" or "privileged." There is no need for the Court to endorse the confidentiality/protective agreement. The Court discourages unnecessary stipulated motions/orders for a protective order and will enforce stipulated and signed confidentiality/protective agreements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 5/24/2024. (JBS)
May 23, 2024 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dkt. 21-1 Fed. R. Civ. P 502 Clawback Order)(Yencarelli, Jennifer) Modified on 5/24/2024 [21-1] STRICKEN per 22 Order (JDR).
May 20, 2024 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case filed by Anthony Medina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bleakley, Justin)
May 16, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Justin McLeod Bleakley on behalf of Anthony Medina. Lead Counsel: Justin Bleakley. (Bleakley, Justin)
May 16, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jennifer N. Yenacrelli; Lovecia A. Oglesby of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
May 15, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jennifer Nicole Yencarelli on behalf of Jorge Valdez. Lead Counsel: Jennifer N. Yencarelli. (Yencarelli, Jennifer)
May 15, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #6 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue. Plaintiff may respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by May 20, 2024. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on May 15, 2024. (SC)
May 7, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Anthony Medina. (Bleakley, Justin)
May 7, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Anthony Medina. (Bleakley, Justin)
May 7, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Anthony Medina. (Bleakley, Justin)
May 2, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jorge Valdez. Related case(s): No (Yencarelli, Jennifer)
May 2, 2024 Filing 10 ***INCORRECT EVENT. COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION"***NOTICE by Jorge Valdez of Pendency of Other Actions (Yencarelli, Jennifer) Modified on 5/2/2024 (LSS).
April 30, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order dated April 23, 2024 by Jorge Valdez. (Yencarelli, Jennifer)
April 29, 2024 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Anthony Medina. (Bleakley, Justin)
April 25, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement by Jorge Valdez. (Yencarelli, Jennifer) . Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 4/25/2024 (ARL).
April 25, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Jorge Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dkt. 6-1 Valdez Declaration, #2 Exhibit Dkt. 6-2 JNY Declaration, #3 Exhibit Dkt. 6-3 TCR BMW Gutierrez, #4 Exhibit Dkt. 6-4 TCR ending 060, #5 Exhibit Dkt. 6-5 TCR Anthony Medina, #6 Exhibit Dkt. 6-6 Full TCR, #7 Exhibit Dkt. 6-7 TCR ending 948, #8 Exhibit Dkt. 6-8 TCR ending 061, #9 Exhibit Dkt. 6-9 TCR ending 409, #10 Exhibit Dkt. 6-10 TCR ending 872, #11 Exhibit Dkt. 6-11 TCR ending 873)(Yencarelli, Jennifer)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 4/23/2024. (GNB)
April 19, 2024 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jorge Valdez. (Yencarelli, Jennifer)
April 19, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Lovecia Holmes-Oglesby of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-727-JSS-RMN. (ARL)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circcuit of Osceola County, Florida, case number 2024CA000762AN filed in State Court on March 19, 2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22000366 filed by Jorge A. Valdez. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibits 2 to 16 to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yencarelli, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Medina
Represented By: Justin McLeod Bleakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge A. Valdez
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole Yencarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Valdez
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole Yencarelli
Represented By: Lovecia Antionette Holmes-Oglesby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Alan S. Apte
Represented By: Alan Scott Apte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?