SFR Services L.L.C. v. Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: SFR Services L.L.C.
Defendant: Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2024cv00783
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Robert M Norway
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Allison, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway.
May 24, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Co-Counsel Appearance by Erin Hyde on behalf of Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community) (Hyde, Erin)
May 24, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community), Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(individually). (Allison, Thomas)
May 24, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Lead Counsel by Thomas Charles Allison on behalf of Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community), Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(individually) (Allison, Thomas) Modified on 5/28/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
May 20, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/20/2024. (RMF)
May 14, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/14/2024 by SFR Services L.L.C. as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Supplement-Additional Defendant's Waiver)(Alper, Joshua)
April 29, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by SFR Services L.L.C. Related case(s): Yes (Alper, Joshua) Modified text on 4/30/2024 (AM).
April 29, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Joshua Bryan Alper on behalf of SFR Services L.L.C. Lead Counsel: Joshua B. Alper, Esq. (Alper, Joshua)
April 29, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by SFR Services L.L.C. (Alper, Joshua) Modified text on 4/30/2024 (AM).
April 29, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Bradley Pepper, Joshua Bryan Alper of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK)
April 29, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (EVK)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-783-WWB-RMN. (AA)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(on behalf of all Owners of Units Located in the Dockside at Ventura Condominium Community), Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.(Individually) with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22028733) filed by SFR Services L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wind Claim Roofing Contract, #2 Exhibit B - November Wind Claim Exterior and Interior Estimate, #3 Exhibit C - Wind Claim LOP, #4 Exhibit D - Re-Roof Invoice, #5 Exhibit E - Wind Claim LOP Cancellation, #6 Exhibit F - Claim of Lien, #7 Exhibit G - Correspondence with Enclosures, #8 Exhibit H - Correspondence with Enclosures, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons to Dockside, Individually, #11 Proposed Summons to Dockside, obo Unit Owners)(Alper, Joshua) Modified to edit docket text on 4/29/2024 (EVK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SFR Services L.L.C. v. Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SFR Services L.L.C.
Represented By: Bradley Pepper
Represented By: Joshua Bryan Alper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dockside at Ventura Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Charles Allison
Represented By: Erin Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?