Larosiere v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Larosiere
Defendant: DIOSKOUROI LLC, Defense Distributed, Cody Rutledge Wilson and Defcad, Inc.
Counter-Claimant: DIOSKOUROI LLC, Defense Distributed, Cody Rutledge Wilson and Defcad, Inc.
Counter-Defendant: MAF Corp., Matthew Larosiere, Alexander Holladay, John Elik, Josh Kiel Stroke, The Gatalog, John Lettman, Peter Celentano and The Gatalog Foundation
Cross-Plaintiff: DIOSKOUROI LLC, Defense Distributed, Cody Rutledge Wilson and Defcad, Inc.
Cross-Defendant: MAF Corp., Matthew Larosiere, John Lettman, Alexander Holladay, John Elik, Josh Kiel Stroke, The Gatalog, Peter Celentano and The Gatalog Foundation
Case Number: 6:2024cv01629
Filed: September 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Leslie Hoffman Price
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2025 Filing 52 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff Larosiere's #43 Amended Complaint , Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT of Defense Distributed against MAF Corp., The Gatalog, Alexander Holladay, John Lettman, Josh Kiel Stroke, Peter Celentano, John Elik, Amended COUNTERCLAIM of Defense Distributed against Matthew Larosiere by Cody Rutledge Wilson, Defense Distributed, Defcad, Inc., Dioskouroi LLC. (Flores, Charles (Chad))
January 3, 2025 Filing 51 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Reynal, Federico)
December 27, 2024 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant-Counterplaintiff Defense Distributed's Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 29) filed by Defense Distributed. (Flores, Charles (Chad))
December 27, 2024 Filing 49 First Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #43 Amended Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against MAF Corp., John Lettman, Matthew Larosiere, Peter Celentano, The Gatalog, Josh Kiel Stroke, John Elik, The Gatalog Foundation, Alexander Holladay, COUNTERCLAIM against Matthew Larosiere by Cody Rutledge Wilson, Defense Distributed, Defcad, Inc., Dioskouroi LLC. (Flores, Charles (Chad)) Modified text on 12/30/2024 (GL).
December 26, 2024 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction all claims against Defendant Dioskouroi LLC, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts 5 & 6 by All Defendants. (Flores, Charles (Chad))
December 16, 2024 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant-Counter plaintiff Defense Distributed's Counterclaims (Dkt. No. #29) by John Elik, Josh Kiel Stroke, John Lettman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Elik, #2 Affidavit of Joshua Kiel Stroke, #3 Affidavit of John Lettman)(Larosiere, Matthew) Modified on 12/18/2024 to edit docket text (JDR).
December 16, 2024 Filing 46 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Matthew Larosiere and Zachary Z. Zermay of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
December 16, 2024 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Larosiere on behalf of John Elik, Josh Kiel Stroke, John Lettman (Larosiere, Matthew)
December 12, 2024 Filing 44 Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint) (LD)
December 11, 2024 Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Matthew Larosiere.(Zermay, Zachary)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #41 Joint Motion for Extension for Time and to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the proposed amended complaint (Doc. No. 41-1) as a separate docket entry on or before December 13, 2024. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B), (2). The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' current counterclaims, to the extent appropriate, is extended up to and including December 30, 2024. The remaining requests are DENIED. See PDF Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 12/11/2024. (MKH)
December 10, 2024 Filing 41 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Amend the complaint by Matthew Larosiere. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Zermay, Zachary) Modified text on 12/11/2024 (AM).
December 9, 2024 Filing 40 SUMMONS issued as to The Gatalog Foundation. (RN) (Main Document 40 replaced on 12/9/2024) (MGB). (Modified on 12/9/2024 to flatten PDF) (MGB).
December 5, 2024 Filing 39 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Defense Distributed. (Gingras, David)
December 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: is it ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #28 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 12/3/2024. (RMF)
November 27, 2024 Filing 37 SUMMONS issued as to MAF Corp. (MCB)
November 25, 2024 Filing 36 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Defcad, Inc., Defense Distributed. (Gingras, David)
November 21, 2024 Filing 35 SUMMONS issued as to Peter Celentano, John Elik, Alexander Holladay, John Lettman, Josh Kiel Stroke. (GL)
November 20, 2024 Filing 34 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Defcad, Inc., Defense Distributed. (Gingras, David) (Main Document 34 replaced on 11/21/2024) (GL). Modified on 11/21/2024 to flatten pdf (GL).
November 20, 2024 Filing 33 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Defcad, Inc., Defense Distributed. (Gingras, David) (Main Document 33 replaced on 11/21/2024) (GL). Modified on 11/21/2024 to flatten pdf (GL).
November 20, 2024 Filing 32 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Defcad, Inc., Defense Distributed. (Gingras, David) (Main Document 32 replaced on 11/21/2024) (GL). Modified on 11/21/2024 to flatten pdf (GL).
November 20, 2024 Filing 31 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Defcad, Inc., Defense Distributed. (Gingras, David) (Main Document 31 replaced on 11/21/2024) (GL). Modified on 11/21/2024 to flatten pdf (GL).
November 20, 2024 Filing 30 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Defcad, Inc., Defense Distributed. (Gingras, David) (Main Document 30 replaced on 11/21/2024) (GL). Modified on 11/21/2024 to flatten pdf (GL).
November 19, 2024 Filing 29 Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM of Defense Distributed against Matthew Larosiere, The Gatalog, John Elik, Alexander Holladay, Peter Celentano, Josh Kiel Stroke, John Lettman, The Gatalog Foundation, MAF Corp. by Defense Distributed, Defcad, Inc., Cody Rutledge Wilson, Dioskouroi LLC.(Flores, Charles (Chad))
November 19, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defcad, Inc., Defense Distributed, Dioskouroi LLC, Cody Rutledge Wilson. (Flores, Charles (Chad))
November 19, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Federico Andino Reynal on behalf of Defcad, Inc., Defense Distributed, Dioskouroi LLC, Cody Rutledge Wilson (Reynal, Federico)
November 12, 2024 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES PAID (Receipt Number ORL113365 for $150) by attorney David S. Gingras, appearing on behalf of Defcad, Inc., Defense Distributed, Dioskouroi LLC, Cody Rutledge Wilson. Related document: #14 MOTION for David S. Gingras to appear pro hac vice. (EAM)
November 7, 2024 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Dioskouroi LLC. (Flores, Charles (Chad))
November 7, 2024 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Cody Rutledge Wilson. (Flores, Charles (Chad))
November 7, 2024 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Defcad, Inc.. (Flores, Charles (Chad))
November 7, 2024 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Defense Distributed. (Flores, Charles (Chad))
November 7, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Appearance by Charles (Chad) Flores on behalf of Defcad, Inc., Defense Distributed, Dioskouroi LLC, Cody Rutledge Wilson (Flores, Charles (Chad))
October 23, 2024 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES PAID (Receipt Number ORL113199 for $150.00) by attorney Chad Flores, appearing on behalf of Defcad, Inc., Defense Distributed, Dioskouroi LLC, Cody Rutledge Wilson. Related document: #11 MOTION for Chad Flores to appear pro hac vice. (TRF)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission. Federico Andino Reynal, Esq., may specially appear in this case as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/21/2024. (MKH)
October 21, 2024 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES PAID (Receipt Number 37521 for $150) by attorney Federico Andino Reynal, appearing on behalf of Defcad, Inc., Defense Distributed, Dioskouroi LLC, Cody Rutledge Wilson. Related document: #19 MOTION for Federico Andino Reynal to appear pro hac vice. (ELA)
October 16, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Federico Andino Reynal Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RN)
October 16, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Federico Andino Reynal to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (e-portal) (RN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Deadline Extension. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint is extended up to and including November 19, 2024. Counsel is cautioned, however, that future motions that fail to comply with all applicable Local Rules (the present motion fails to comply with Local Rule 3.01(a)) may be stricken or summarily denied without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/15/2024. (MKH)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission. David S. Gingras, Esq., may specially appear in this case as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/15/2024. (MKH)
October 11, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (e-portal) (ARL) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
October 8, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David S. Gingras Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
October 8, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for David S. Gingras to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (e-portal) (ARL) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission. Charles ("Chad") Flores, Esq., may specially appear in this case as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/8/2024. (MKH)
October 8, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Chad Flores Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
October 7, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Chad Flores to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (e-portal) (ARL) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price.
September 25, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/24/2024 by Matthew Larosiere as to Dioskouroi LLC. (Zermay, Zachary)
September 25, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/24/2024 by Matthew Larosiere as to Cody Rutledge Wilson. (Zermay, Zachary)
September 20, 2024 Filing 8 PROOF of service by Matthew Larosiere (Zermay, Zachary)
September 20, 2024 Filing 7 PROOF of service by Matthew Larosiere (Zermay, Zachary)
September 10, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective April 1, 2024, and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued a Standing Order, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/10/2024. (RMF)
September 9, 2024 Filing 4 Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (HAI)
September 9, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (HAI)
September 6, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-1629-WWB-LHP. (AA)
September 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number BFLMDC-22487885) filed by Matthew Larosiere. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Zermay, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larosiere v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIOSKOUROI LLC
Represented By: Federico Andino Reynal
Represented By: David S. Gingras
Represented By: Charles (Chad) Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Distributed
Represented By: Federico Andino Reynal
Represented By: David S. Gingras
Represented By: Charles (Chad) Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Rutledge Wilson
Represented By: Federico Andino Reynal
Represented By: David S. Gingras
Represented By: Charles (Chad) Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defcad, Inc.
Represented By: Federico Andino Reynal
Represented By: David S. Gingras
Represented By: Charles (Chad) Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Zachary Z. Zermay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: DIOSKOUROI LLC
Represented By: Federico Andino Reynal
Represented By: David S. Gingras
Represented By: Charles (Chad) Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Defense Distributed
Represented By: Federico Andino Reynal
Represented By: David S. Gingras
Represented By: Charles (Chad) Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Cody Rutledge Wilson
Represented By: Federico Andino Reynal
Represented By: David S. Gingras
Represented By: Charles (Chad) Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Defcad, Inc.
Represented By: Federico Andino Reynal
Represented By: David S. Gingras
Represented By: Charles (Chad) Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: MAF Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Zachary Z. Zermay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Alexander Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: John Elik
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Josh Kiel Stroke
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: The Gatalog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: John Lettman
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Peter Celentano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: The Gatalog Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-plaintiff: DIOSKOUROI LLC
Represented By: Federico Andino Reynal
Represented By: David S. Gingras
Represented By: Charles (Chad) Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-plaintiff: Defense Distributed
Represented By: Federico Andino Reynal
Represented By: David S. Gingras
Represented By: Charles (Chad) Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-plaintiff: Cody Rutledge Wilson
Represented By: Federico Andino Reynal
Represented By: David S. Gingras
Represented By: Charles (Chad) Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-plaintiff: Defcad, Inc.
Represented By: Federico Andino Reynal
Represented By: David S. Gingras
Represented By: Charles (Chad) Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: MAF Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Zachary Z. Zermay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: John Lettman
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Alexander Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: John Elik
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Josh Kiel Stroke
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: The Gatalog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Peter Celentano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: The Gatalog Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?