Tampa Bay Buccaneers et al v. Keenan McCardell et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Buccaneers and National Football League Management Council
Defendant: Keenan McCardell and National Football League Players Association
Case Number: 8:2005cv01887
Filed: October 11, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0009 Motion to confirm arbitration award
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 4
ORDER granting re 3 Notice of Withdrawal of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award. The clerk is directed to CLOSE this case and terminate any pending motions. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 10/21/2005. (sas)
October 19, 2005 Filing 3
NOTICE by Tampa Bay Buccaneers, National Football League Management Council re 1 Complaint, Notice of Withdrawal (Matheney, Erik)
October 13, 2005 Filing 2
Summons issued as to Keenan McCardell, National Football League Players Association. Consent(s) issued. (jlh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tampa Bay Buccaneers et al v. Keenan McCardell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Buccaneers
Represented By: Erik R. Matheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Football League Management Council
Represented By: Erik R. Matheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keenan McCardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League Players Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?