Dopson-Troutt et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 8:2006cv01708
Filed: September 15, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 276 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. The ruling on this motion was entered on the record in open court on April 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 4/11/2014. (GMS)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting 219 Motion to Take Deposition of Dr. Arthur Feldman. Plaintiffs shall take the de bene esse deposition by February 24, 2014.Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 2/3/2014. (GMS)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 143 Defendant's Omnibus Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 9/23/2013. (GMS)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and deferring in part 144 Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 9/20/2013. (GMS)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting Defendant's 165 Motion to Enforce the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 9/16/2013. (GMS)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 159 Motion to Quash Subpoenas of Diane Young andJoanne Machalaba; granting 160 Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' "30(B)(6)" Trial Subpoena. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 9/13/2013. (GMS)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 141 Motion to Strike.. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 8/2/2013. (GMS)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 114 Motion for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Apply New Jersey Law To Plaintiffs' Punitive Damages Demand and To Preclude Punitive Damages. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 7/22/2013. (GMS)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 4/3/2013. (GMS)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Daubert Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 4/2/2013. (GMS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dopson-Troutt et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?