Kotis et al v. Deslin Hotels, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs allege that they were minors when they participated in a sexually-explicit contest during Spring Break. Plaintiffs allege that defendants (1) organized, arranged and conducted the contest; (2) persuaded, induced, and enticed Plaintiffs to participate in the contests and to engage in sexually-explicit conduct, (3) videotaped the Plaintiffs' participation in the contests, and (4) produced and distributed videos depicting Plaintiff engaged in sexually-explicit conduct.

Plaintiff: Heather Marie Kotis and Rachel Christine Mill
Defendant: Deslin Hotels, Inc., Irene L. Devlin, Dennis B. Devlin, BV & BK Productions, LLLP, Chad W Ciani, MRA Holdings, LLC, AMX Productions, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc., Joseph R. Francis and Svothi, Inc.
Cross Claimant: Svothi, Inc.
Cross Defendant: AMX Productions, LLC
Case Number: 8:2007cv00447
Filed: March 12, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Osceola
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Jenkins
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605 Federal Communications Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying without prejudice 67 Defendants' Motion to Substitute Attorney. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 4/9/2009. (ACS)
April 8, 2009 Filing 67 MOTION to substitute attorney by BV & BK Productions, LLLP, Chad W Ciani. (Ell, Karen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
April 6, 2009 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad M. Pilon on behalf of BV & BK Productions, LLLP, Chad W Ciani (Pilon, Chad) Modified on 4/7/2009 (JLH).
April 6, 2009 Filing 65 ** INCORRECT EVENT CODE USED; COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE** NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BV & BK Productions, LLLP, Chad W Ciani of Counsel (Ell, Karen) Modified on 4/7/2009 (JLH).
April 6, 2009 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen E. Ell on behalf of BV & BK Productions, LLLP, Chad W Ciani (Ell, Karen) Modified on 4/7/2009 (JLH).
February 23, 2009 Filing 63 NOTICE by Deslin Hotels, Inc., Irene L. Devlin, Dennis B. Devlin re 62 Order on motion to dismissOrder on motion to stay of RESOLUTION OF APPELLATE PROCEEDINGS IN COMPANION CASE (Weston, Kathryn)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay 60 is GRANTED. This matter is STAYED until further notice. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to notify the Court when the appellate proceedings in the companion case of Tilton v. Playboy Entertainment Group, et al., Case No. 8:05-cv-692-T-30TGW are resolved. The Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case and to terminate the pending Motions to Dismiss Complaint 27 30 . Said Motions shall be reactivated by the Clerk when and if the case is reopened. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 10/15/2007. (len)
October 15, 2007 Filing 61 CANCELLATION NOTICE: The oral argument scheduled for Tuesday, 10-16-07, at 8:45 a.m. is CANCELLED per the Judge's instructions. (len)
October 12, 2007 Filing 60 MOTION to stay Any Further Proceedings in This Matter by Heather Marie Kotis, Rachel Christine Mill. (Wester, J.)
October 12, 2007 Filing 59 RETURN of service executed on 07/27/07 by Heather Marie Kotis, Rachel Christine Mill as to MRA Holdings, LLC. (Busch, Wendolyn)
October 12, 2007 Filing 58 RETURN of service executed on 07/25/07 by Heather Marie Kotis, Rachel Christine Mill as to AMX Productions, LLC. (Busch, Wendolyn)
August 21, 2007 Filing 57 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion to Dismiss Complaint 27 as to Count One; on Motion to Dismiss Complaint 30 as to Count Five. Motion Hearing RESCHEDULED for TUESDAY, 10/16/2007 at 8:45 AM in Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Time reserved: 30 minutes. (len)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ENDORSED ORDER granting 55 Unopposed MOTION to continue Hearing set on 8-23-07 on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 8/20/2007. (len)
August 17, 2007 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION to continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss by Heather Marie Kotis. (Wester, J.)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 9/26/2008. Dispositive motions due by 11/25/2008. Pretrial Conference set for TUESDAY, 3/3/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. *** JURY TRIAL SET FOR APRIL 2009 *** Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 8/7/2007. (len)
August 6, 2007 Filing 53 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Wester, J.)
August 3, 2007 Filing 52 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint by Joseph R. Francis.(McCrea, Richard)
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ENDORSED ORDER denying 50 Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to file response or motion to strike. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 8/2/2007. (len)
August 1, 2007 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Response to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Strike by all plaintiffs. (Busch, Wendolyn)
July 27, 2007 Filing 49 NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion to Dismiss Complaint 27 as to Count One; on Motion to Dismiss Complaint 30 as to Count Five. Motion Hearing set for THURSDAY, 8/23/2007 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Time reserved: 30 minutes. (len)
July 19, 2007 Filing 48 ALIAS Summons issued as to AMX Productions, LLC. (jlh, )
July 19, 2007 Filing 47 RETURN of service unexecuted by Heather Marie Kotis, Rachel Christine Mill as to AMX Productions, LLC. (jlh, )
July 19, 2007 Filing 46 RETURN of service unexecuted by Heather Marie Kotis as to AMX Productions, LLC. (Wester, J.)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ENDORSED ORDER granting 40 Motion to extend time for service of Complaint. Extension granted through August 6, 2007. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 7/19/2007. (len)
July 18, 2007 Filing 44 ALIAS Summons issued as to MRA Holdings, LLC. (jlh, )
July 17, 2007 Filing 43 NOTICE by Heather Marie Kotis re 4 Summons issued, to MRA Holdings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Lost Summons)(Wester, J.)
July 17, 2007 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Meredith Wester on behalf of Heather Marie Kotis (Wester, J.)
July 17, 2007 Filing 41 RETURN of service executed on 5-02-07 by Heather Marie Kotis as to Joseph R. Francis. (Wester, J.)
July 9, 2007 Filing 40 MOTION to extend time to Serve Complaint on MRA Holdings, LLC, AMX Productions, LLC and Joseph Francis by all plaintiffs. (Shankman, Richard)
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER granting 36 Motion to withdraw as Plaintiffs' counsel. Attorneys Mark Howard, Stanford Solomon and Thomas DeBerg are terminated. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 6/26/2007. (len)
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER approving 37 Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant JUCCO HOLDINGS, INC. only. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 6/26/2007. (len)
June 25, 2007 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Heather Marie Kotis (Shankman, Richard)
June 21, 2007 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiffs by all plaintiffs. (Howard, Mark)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 28 Defendant Mantra Films, Inc.'s Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. See order for details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 6/14/2007. (ACS)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER granting 29 motion to appear pro hac vice as to WILLIAM DELGADO. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 6/14/2007. (len)
June 11, 2007 Filing 33 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint by BV & BK Productions, LLLP.(Godwin, Camille)
June 11, 2007 Filing 32 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint by Chad W Ciani.(Godwin, Camille)
June 11, 2007 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in support re 30 Motion to dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by BV & BK Productions, LLLP, Chad W Ciani. (Godwin, Camille)
June 11, 2007 Filing 30 MOTION to dismiss Complaint by BV & BK Productions, LLLP, Chad W Ciani. (Godwin, Camille)
June 11, 2007 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for William A. Delgado to appear pro hac vice by Jucco Holdings, Inc.. (Flint, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
June 8, 2007 Filing 28 MOTION to substitute attorney Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel by Mantra Films, Inc.. (Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
June 7, 2007 Filing 27 MOTION to dismiss Complaint by Deslin Hotels, Inc., Irene L. Devlin, Dennis B. Devlin. (Weston, Kathryn)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Defendant's Motion for extension of time to answer or respond. Jucco Holdings's answer due 6/28/2007. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 6/6/2007. (len)
June 1, 2007 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Lauro on behalf of Jucco Holdings, Inc. (Lauro, John)
June 1, 2007 Filing 24 APPEARANCE of non-resident counsel and designation of local counsel by Scott J. Flint on behalf of Jucco Holdings, Inc.. Local Counsel: John F. Lauro. Non-Resident Counsel: William A. Delgado. (Flint, Scott)
June 1, 2007 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott J. Flint on behalf of Jucco Holdings, Inc. (Flint, Scott)
May 31, 2007 Filing 22 MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead re 1 Complaint, by Jucco Holdings, Inc.. (jlh, ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
May 29, 2007 Filing 21 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint, CROSSCLAIM against AMX Productions, LLC by Svothi, Inc..(Edinger, Gary)
May 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Deslin Hotel's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint: Response due by 6/7/2007. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 5/23/2007. (len)
May 22, 2007 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint with Jury Demand by Mantra Films, Inc..(Richard, Barry)
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Defendants BV & BK Productions and Chad Ciani's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Responses due by 6/11/2007. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 5/22/2007. (len)
May 22, 2007 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Deslin Hotels, Inc.. (Weston, Kathryn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
May 21, 2007 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint by BV & BK Productions, LLLP, Chad W Ciani. (Godwin, Camille) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins.
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER approving 7 Stipulation to Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Counts of the Complaint Against GOLDRUSH DISC JOCKEYS, INC. and DAVID BARTON and to Tolling of the Statute of Limitations. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 5/18/2007. (len)
May 17, 2007 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on May 3, 2007 by Heather Marie Kotis as to Deslin Hotels, Inc.. (Howard, Mark)
May 17, 2007 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on May 7, 2007 by Heather Marie Kotis as to Svothi, Inc.. (Howard, Mark)
May 16, 2007 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on May 2, 2007 by Heather Marie Kotis as to Mantra Films, Inc.. (Howard, Mark)
May 16, 2007 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on May 2, 2007 by Heather Marie Kotis as to Goldrush Disc Jockeys, Inc.. (Howard, Mark)
May 16, 2007 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on May 2, 2007 by Heather Marie Kotis as to Chad W Ciani. (Howard, Mark)
May 16, 2007 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on May 2, 2007 by Heather Marie Kotis as to David L. Barton. (Howard, Mark)
May 16, 2007 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Diane Weston on behalf of Deslin Hotels, Inc., Irene L. Devlin, Dennis B. Devlin (Weston, Kathryn)
May 16, 2007 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Counts of the Complaint Againt GoldRush Disc Jockeys, Inc. and David Barton and to Tolling the Statute of Limitations by Goldrush Disc Jockeys, Inc., David L. Barton, Heather Marie Kotis, Rachel Christine Mill. (Howard, Mark)
May 16, 2007 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Wallace Cichon on behalf of Deslin Hotels, Inc., Irene L. Devlin, Dennis B. Devlin (Cichon, Scott)
May 16, 2007 Filing 5 *DOCUMENT TERMINATED* NOTICE by Heather Marie Kotis of Filing Returns of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Barton Return of Service# 2 Exhibit Ciani Return of Service# 3 Exhibit Goldrush Return of Service# 4 Exhibit Mantra Return of Service)(Howard, Mark) REFILED PROPERLY BY COUNSEL. SEE 9 , 10 , 11 AND 12 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Modified on 5/17/2007 (cda).
April 23, 2007 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Deslin Hotels, Inc., Irene L. Devlin, Dennis B. Devlin, Goldrush Disc Jockeys, Inc., David L. Barton, BV & BK Productions, LLLP, Chad W Ciani, MRA Holdings, LLC, AMX Productions, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc., Joseph R. Francis, Svothi, Inc., Jucco Holdings, Inc.. (jlh, )
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER granting 2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Order Allowing Parties to Maintain Possession of Video Materials and Prohibiting Filing Other Than Under Seal. Signed by Judge James S. Moody Jr. on 4/17/2007. (len)
March 20, 2007 Filing 2 MOTION Entry of Order Allowing Parties to Maintain Possession of Video Materials and Prohibiting Filing Other Than Under Seal by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBerg, Thomas)
March 12, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deslin Hotels, Inc., Irene L. Devlin, Dennis B. Devlin, Goldrush Disc Jockeys, Inc., David L. Barton, BV & BK Productions, LLLP, Chad W Ciani, MRA Holdings, LLC, AMX Productions, LLC, Mantra Films, Inc., Joseph R. Francis, Svothi, Inc., Jucco Holdings, Inc. ; jury demand (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number T040825) filed by Heather Marie Kotis, Rachel Christine Mill.(jlh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kotis et al v. Deslin Hotels, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Marie Kotis
Represented By: J. Meredith Wester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Christine Mill
Represented By: Richard Stuart Shankman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deslin Hotels, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Diane Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene L. Devlin
Represented By: Kathryn Diane Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis B. Devlin
Represented By: Kathryn Diane Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BV & BK Productions, LLLP
Represented By: Camille Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad W Ciani
Represented By: Camille Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRA Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMX Productions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mantra Films, Inc.
Represented By: David Barnett Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Francis
Represented By: Richard C. McCrea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Svothi, Inc.
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Svothi, Inc.
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: AMX Productions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?